South Carolina Advance Sheet
(12/27/2023)
No Advance Sheet will be posted this week.
Greenville Homeless Court Program
(12/19/2023)
Greenville Homeless Court Program
Retired Chief Justice Jean Toal to Preside Over Richard Murdaugh Motion for New Trial
Anderson County Mental Health Court Program
(12/12/2023)
I FIND that the South Carolina legislature, recognizing the continuing need for and benefits of a Mental Health Court (MHC) program to divert mentally ill persons from jails, enacted the MHC Program Act on June 1, 2015. The Act establishes a MHC Program to be administered by circuit solicitors and provides that the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court of South Carolina shall appoint all MHC judges operating pursuant to the Act.
IT IS ORDERED that the judges of the magisterial courts listed below be designated as Chief Judge or Associate Chief Judge for Administrative Purposes of the Summary Courts in the counties in which they hold office.
Revised Proof of ADR Forms—Circuit and Family Courts
(12/05/2023)
Revised Proof of ADR Forms—Circuit and Family Courts
South Carolina Courts Observe Adoption Day
(11/30/2023)
South Carolina Courts Observe Adoption Day
In the Matter of Cory Howerton Fleming
(11/30/2023)
In the Matter of Cory Howerton Fleming
South Carolina Advance Sheet
(11/28/2023)
No Advance Sheet will be posted this week.
Request for Written Comments
(11/15/2023)
The Supreme Court is accepting written comments concerning a proposed amendment to the South Carolina Rules of Civil Procedure
The Supreme Court has amended Rule 402, SCACR, to increase the number of members on the Committee on Character and Fitness.
South Carolina Chief Justice Declares November 20 Adoption Day
Judicial Branch Hosted Statewide Mental Health Summit
Posted Results of the July Bar Examination
(10/20/2023)
The results of the July Uniform Bar Examination administered in South Carolina were posted on this page at 4:00 p.m. on Friday, October 20, 2023. Additionally, a letter notifying each bar applicant of his or her score was uploaded into each examinee's account on the Bar Admissions web page. Telephonic requests for information about these results will not be accepted until 9:00 a.m. on Monday, October 23, 2023. The Office of Bar Admissions accepts calls on weekdays between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 2:00 p.m.
Results of the July 2023 Uniform Bar Examination
(10/17/2023)
The results of the July 2023 Uniform Bar Examination will be posted on the Bar Admissions page at 4:00 p.m. on Friday, October 20, 2023.
The Supreme Court of South Carolina will hear oral arguments at Furman University’s McAlister Auditorium on Tuesday, Oct. 24 and Wednesday, Oct. 25, starting at 10 a.m. each day. Furman’s Riley Institute, which is hosting the event, invites students, alumni, the legal community, and members of the public to observe the proceedings.
Amendments to South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
(10/11/2023)
These amendments reduce the number of copies required to be filed in lawyer and judicial disciplinary matters, certification for summary court judges, and for various applications for admission.
COLUMBIA, S.C. (September 29, 2023) – Recognizing the importance of ensuring access to justice and with increased funding from the South Carolina Legislature, the South Carolina Judicial Branch is expanding and enhancing its court interpreting program for limited English proficient (LEP) individuals and those who rely upon American Sign Language. Persons interested in pursuing certification as an LEP interpreter via the South Carolina Court Interpreter Certification Program (SCCICP) are invited to register for the next two-day workshop being held virtually October 21-22, 2023. According to the 2020 Census, 7.5% of South Carolinians speak a language other than English at home or consider English to be their second language. That’s up from 6.6% percent in 2011, increasing the need for interpreters in the courts.
State v. Jeroid J. Price
(09/06/2023)
The Supreme Court has issued an opinion in State v. Jeroid J. Price.
Hurricane Idalia
(08/30/2023)
South Carolina Governor Henry McMaster has issued Executive Order 2023-29, declaring a State of Emergency in preparation for the potential effects from Hurricane Idalia.
Amendments to South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
(08/30/2023)
At the request of the South Carolina Bar, the Supreme Court has amended Rule 410(j), SCACR, to increase the annual license fees paid by members of the South Carolina Bar.
This Administrative order establishes the Specialized Caseload Sanctions and Incentives Pilot Program (SWIFT)
Inclement Weather – Tropical Storm Idalia
(08/28/2023)
The National Hurricane Center predicts that Idalia will bring excessive rain and tropical storm-force winds that are expected to impact some areas of South Carolina this week.
Fraudulent E-mail Regarding CLE Suspensions
(08/25/2023)
Please be advised spoof e-mails with a subject line of: "Compliance Notice: CLE suspension” are being sent to members of the South Carolina Bar and contain the Judicial Branch logo and seal. The messages claim they are from “SC Court Administration”. This is a scam message. Should you receive one of these emails, please do not click any links contained therein.
The Supreme Court has issued an opinion in Planned Parenthood South Atlantic, et al. v. State of South Carolina, et al.
Limited Technical Failure of the E-filing System
(08/16/2023)
The South Carolina Judicial Branch has announced a Limited Technical Failure of the E-Filing System for Richland County only for August 14 and 15, 2023, in accordance with Section 9(b) of the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines. This Technical Failure only affects E-Filings that require payment. E-Filers may utilize the provisions of Section 9(d) or (e) of the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines to submit filings or serve documents through available alternative procedures with respect to any document that was required to be filed or served August 14 or 15, 2023.
The Honorable Joseph M. Strickland, Petitioner, v. Richland County Legislative Delegation, et al.
(08/11/2023)
The Supreme Court has issued an order in this matter.
Amended Business Court Program
(07/17/2023)
Amended Business Court Program
Certificate of Good Standing Requests and New Bar Admissions Webpage
Statutory provisions for the distribution of revenue generated by the circuit courts, and family courts; fees and related charges of the registers of deeds
Fee Memorandum - County Treasurers
(06/30/2023)
Statutory provisions for the distribution of revenue generated by the circuit courts, family courts, magistrates courts and municipal courts; fees and related charges of the registers of deeds
Statutory provisions for the distribution of revenue generated by the magistrate courts and municipal courts
Oral arguments were held in this matter on June 27, 2023. A video recording of the arguments can be accessed by using this link or by visiting the Supreme Court Archived Video page.
The Supreme Court has issued an order in this case.
General Sessions Docket Management Order
(05/24/2023)
The Supreme Court has issued a General Sessions Docket Management Order. This Order is effective July 3, 2023.
Update to Court Interpreter Cancellation Policy
(05/18/2023)
IT IS ORDERED that any party requesting a foreign language or American Sign Language (ASL) court interpreter for a party, witness, or victim for a legal proceeding before a court of the Unified Judicial System shall make such a request to the clerk’s office in writing via Form SCCA 261 - Request for Court Interpreter.
2023 Mandatory Bond Court Program for Magistrates and Municipal Judges
Posted Results of the February Bar Examination
(04/28/2023)
The results of the February Uniform Bar Examination administered in South Carolina were posted on this page at 4:00 p.m. on Friday, April 28, 2023. Additionally, a letter notifying each bar applicant of his or her score was uploaded into each examinee's account on the Bar Admissions web page. Telephonic requests for information about these results will not be accepted until 9:00 a.m. on Monday, May 1, 2023. The Office of Bar Admissions accepts calls on weekdays between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 2:00 p.m.
Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Comply with Continuing Legal Education Requirements
(04/27/2023)
Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Comply with Continuing Legal Education Requirements
State v. Jeroid John Price (Order)
(04/26/2023)
The Supreme Court has issued an order in this matter.
State v. Jeroid John Price Oral Arguments Video
(04/26/2023)
Oral arguments were held in this matter on April 26, 2023. A video recording of the arguments can be accessed by using this link or by visiting the Supreme Court Archived Video page.
State v. Jeroid John Price Oral Arguments
(04/26/2023)
Oral arguments are scheduled in this matter on April 26, 2023, at 12:00 p.m. A video recording of the arguments will be posted on the Supreme Court Archived Video page.
The Supreme Court has amended Rule 1.15(e) of the Rules of Professional Conduct to create a procedure permitting lawyers to resolve competing claims over funds held in trust by the lawyer.
Results of the February 2023 Uniform Bar Examination
(04/25/2023)
The results of the February 2023 Uniform Bar Examination will be posted on the Bar Admissions page at 4:00 p.m. on Friday, April 28, 2023.
Medley Serves & Investigations Ordered to Cease and Desist Use of Deceptive Door Tags in Process Serving
(04/21/2023)
COLUMBIA, S.C. (April 20, 2023) – Supreme Court of South Carolina Chief Justice Donald W. Beatty has issued an Order to Cease and Desist to Medley Serves & Investigations with regard to its use of deceptive door tags in connection with attempts at service of process in South Carolina. Medley, a Tennessee company using South Carolina process servers, is leaving deceptive, inaccurate, and intimidating signage bearing the Seal of the Supreme Court of South Carolina at the doors of defendants. The cases primarily involve plaintiff OneMain Financial Group, LLC, and similarly named plaintiffs.
State v. Jeroid John Price
(04/20/2023)
The Supreme Court has issued an order in State v. Jeroid John Price.
Order for Destruction of Arrest Records in General Sessions (SCCA 223A1)
Re: SCCA 261 Form – Request for Court Interpreter
(03/28/2023)
IT IS ORDERED that the implementation of my prior Order, dated March 7, 2023, approving the use of SCCA Form 261, Request for Court Interpreter, shall be held in abeyance until May 3, 2023.
Technical Failure of the E-Filing System
(03/28/2023)
Due to a technical issue, the South Carolina Judicial Branch has announced a Technical Failure of the E-Filing System for March 27 2023, in accordance with Section 9(b) of the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines. E-Filers may utilize the provisions of Section 9(d) or (e) of the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines to submit filings or serve documents through available alternative procedures with respect to any document that was required to be filed or served on March 27, 2023.
Revised SCCA Form 800, Transcript Request Form
(03/21/2023)
IT IS ORDERED that SCCA Form 800 Transcript Request Form, bearing a date of 03/2023, is amended and shall be used in accordance with Rules 207 and 607, SCACR.
Request for Court Interpreter
(03/20/2023)
261 Form - Request for Court Interpreter
The Supreme Court has amended Rule 607, SCACR, with respect to fees for mailed and emailed transcripts, to update certain language based on new technology, and to clarify the time a court reporter must retain recordings.
The Supreme Court has amended Comment 4 to Rule 5.5 of the Rules of Professional Conduct with respect to lawyers licensed in other jurisdictions who work remotely in South Carolina.
Electronic Devices in Courthouses
(03/10/2023)
This Administrative order governs the use of Electronic Devices in South Carolina Courthouses
Appointment of Qualified Court Interpreters for Non-English-Speaking Persons and Payment for their Services
(03/10/2023)
Appointment of Qualified Court Interpreters for Non-English-Speaking Persons and Payment for their Services
Appointment of Qualified Court Interpreters for Deaf Persons and Payment for their Services
(03/10/2023)
Appointment of Qualified Court Interpreters for Deaf Persons and Payment for their Services
Rock Hill Homeless Court Program
(03/07/2023)
Rock Hill Homeless Court Program
The Supreme Court has issued an administrative order suspending lawyers under Rule 419 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules for failing to pay their license fees
The Supreme Court of South Carolina Access to Justice Commission, the South Carolina Bar, and the Nelson Mullins Center on Professionalism at the University of South Carolina School of Law on Tuesday unveiled the findings of the state’s first civil legal needs assessment.
Appointment of Qualified Court Interpreters for Deaf Persons and Payment for their Services
(02/22/2023)
Appointment of Qualified Court Interpreters for Deaf Persons and Payment for their Services
Appointment of Qualified Court Interpreters for Non-English-Speaking Persons and Payment for their Services
(02/22/2023)
Appointment of Qualified Court Interpreters for Non-English-Speaking Persons and Payment for their Services
South Carolina Advance Sheet
(02/21/2023)
No Advance Sheet will be posted this week.
Judicial Elections
(02/09/2023)
Judicial elections were held February 8, 2023. Congratulations to the following judges who were elected by the South Carolina General Assembly
The Supreme Court has amended Rule 411(b), SCACR, to increase the number of members on the Lawyers' Fund for Client Protection Committee.
Charleston Housing Court Expanded Statewide
(01/26/2023)
The Supreme Court has issued an order expanding the existing Charleston Housing Court Pilot Project to Magistrate Courts statewide.
The Supreme Court has issued an opinion in Freddie Eugene Owens, et al. v. Bryan P. Stirling, et al.
The Supreme Court has issued an opinion in Planned Parenthood South Atlantic, et al. v. State of South Carolina, et al.
Interest Rate on Money Decrees and Judgments
(01/04/2023)
Order issued regarding legal rate of interest on money decrees and judgments