Supreme Court Seal
Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
Judicial Branch
Court News ...

South Carolina Advance Sheet
(Date posted: 02/26/2020)

No South Carolina Advance Sheet will be Posted this Week.

Richland County Family Court Update, Feb. 25, 2020
(Date posted: 02/25/2020)

Due to flooding, Richland County Family Court is temporarily operating on a limited basis. There is no court scheduled this week. Cases that were scheduled for court during the week of Feb. 24 – 28 are being rescheduled. Court will resume on Monday, March 2. The Family Court Administrative Offices are open, answering the phones, and accepting pleadings and other paperwork. Emergencies will be heard in Richland County Family Court on Wednesday, Feb. 26, Thursday, Feb. 27, and Friday, Feb. 28 at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 3F.

Richland County Family Court Hearings
(Date posted: 02/24/2020)

Due to flooding in a portion of the courthouse building, Richland County Family Court will be unable to hold hearings this week. However, emergency matters will be heard. Richland County Family Court will resume accepting filings tomorrow in the Clerk of Court’s Office. Please contact the Richland County Clerk of Court’s office at (803) 576-3326, (803) 576-3361, or (803) 576-1947 with any questions.

Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Pay License Fees Required by Rule 410 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules (SCACR)
(Date posted: 02/21/2020)

Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Pay License Fees Required by Rule 410 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules (SCACR)

Inclement Weather
(Date posted: 02/06/2020)

Inclement Weather

Judicial elections were held February 5, 2020
(Date posted: 02/05/2020)

Judicial elections were held February 5, 2020. Congratulations to the following judges who were elected by the South Carolina General Assembly

Rule Changes Submitted to the General Assembly
(Date posted: 01/30/2020)

Pursuant to Article V, § 4A of the South Carolina Constitution, the following rule changes were submitted to the South Carolina General Assembly on January 30, 2020.

Request for Written Comments
(Date posted: 01/22/2020)

The Supreme Court is accepting written comments concerning proposed amendments to Rule 9 of the South Carolina Court-Annexed Alternative Dispute Resolution Rules.

Interest Rate on Money Decrees and Judgments
(Date posted: 01/06/2020)

Order issued regarding legal rate of interest on money decrees and judgments.