Supreme Court Seal
Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
Judicial Branch
Court of Appeals - Roster of Cases for Hearing

   

The summary below each case is prepared to offer lawyers and the public a general overview of what issues are included in a case which will be argued. The summary is not a limit on what issues a party to a case may present at oral argument.

Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Court Room I
 10:00 a.m. (Time Limits: 15-10-10-5)  
2018-000794    South Carolina Public Interest Foundation, Edward D. Sloan, Jr., and William B. Depass, Jr., individually, and on behalf of others similarly situated, Appellants, v. Richland County, Respondent, And Central Midlands Regional Transit Authority, Intervenor/Respondent.

James G. Carpenter, of Carpenter Law Firm, PC, of Greenville, for Appellants. Elizabeth Van Doren Gray, Robert E. Tyson, Jr., and Benjamin Rogers Gooding, all of Robinson Gray Stepp & Laffitte, LLC, of Columbia, for Respondent Central Midlands Regional Transit Authority. Andrew F. Lindemann of Lindemann & Davis, P.A. of Columbia, for Respondent Richland County. Dana Robert Krajack, Jason Phillip Luther, and Adam J. Neil, all of Columbia, for Amicus Curiae South Carolina Department of Revenue. William Grayson Lambert, of Burr & Forman LLP, of Columbia; Henrietta U. Golding, of Burr & Forman LLP, of Myrtle Beach; and James Keith Gilliam, of Burr & Forman LLP, of Greenville, all for Amicus Curiae Transportation Association of South Carolina.

This appeal concerns a challenge to Richland County's "penny tax" ordinance. Appellants dispute a circuit court order dismissing their claims against the County for failure to prosecute. Appellants also dispute a summary judgment that held the County could use penny tax revenues for administrative and operating costs associated with the County's mass transit system.

Monday, April 5, 2021
Virtual Courtroom I
 10:00 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2018-001305    John McPartland, Appellant, v. South Carolina Department of Motor Vehicles, Respondent.

Thomas Micah Leddy, of The Leddy Law Firm, LLC, of Columbia, for Appellant. Brandy Anne Duncan, of Blythewood, for Respondent.

John McPartland brought an action against the South Carolina Department of Motor Vehicles (SCDMV) to reinstate his South Carolina driver's license. The SCDMV suspended his license after a background check revealed New York had suspended McPartland's driving privileges. He appeals the circuit court's determination that he failed to exhaust his administrative remedies in New York.

 10:40 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2018-001598    Johnathan Mart, on behalf of himself and others similarly situated, Respondent, v. Great Southern Homes, Inc., Appellant.

Warren C. Powell, Jr. and Chelsea Jaqueline Clark, both of Bruner Powell Wall & Mullins, LLC, of Columbia, for Appellant. Charles Harry McDonald, of Belser & Belser, PA, of Columbia; Beth B. Richardson, of Robinson Gray Stepp & Laffitte, LLC, of Columbia; Brady Ryan Thomas, of Richardson, Thomas, Haltiwanger, Moore & Lewis, of Columbia; Terry E. Richardson, Jr., of Rogers, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, of Barnwell; and Matthew Anderson Nickles, of Rogers, Patrick, Westbrook & Brickman, LLC, of Columbia, all for Respondent.

Great Southern Homes, Inc. (GSH) appeals the circuit court's order denying its motion to dismiss and compel arbitration against Jonathan Mart. Specifically, GSH avers the circuit court erred because (1) GSH did not draft, sign, or issue the StrucSure Home Warranty (the Warranty) and therefore, it should not be construed as incorporated into the contract for sale (the Contract) for the purposes of interpreting the arbitration clauses; (2) GSH and Mart did not intend for the Contract and the Warranty to be interpreted together as demonstrated by the merger clauses; (3) the Warranty did not apply to Mart's causes of action because Mart never filed a claim through the Warranty based on his causes of action; and (4) the Contract did not expressly incorporate the Warranty into its terms.

Tuesday, April 6, 2021
Virtual Courtroom I
 10:00 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2017-001753    The State, Respondent, v. Bradford Hester Williams, Appellant.

Kathrine Haggard Hudgins, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson, Senior Assistant Deputy Attorney General Melody Jane Brown, and William Joseph Maye, all of Columbia, for Respondent.

 10:40 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2018-001635    Charles Willis Gardner, Appellant, v. Taylor Reuben Adams, Respondent.

Bryan Andrew Raymond, of Mt. Pleasant, for Appellant. Terry A. Finger, of Finger, Melnick & Brooks, P.A., of Hilton Head Island, for Respondent.

Charles Willis Gardner appeals the circuit court's order granting partial summary judgment in favor of Taylor Reuben Adams. On appeal, Gardner argues the circuit court erred because (1) Adams failed to show he was the successor in interest to John Howard's property; (2) a prior quiet title order did not confer title to the road and the boat landing to Adams; (3) a question of material fact existed as to the ownership of the road and boat landing; (4) Adams failed to meet the burden to prove trespass to try title; and (5) the property-line dispute was a question of fact for a jury to decide.

Tuesday, April 13, 2021
Virtual Courtroom I
 10:00 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2018-001684    The State, Respondent, v. Michael Cliff Eubanks, Appellant.

E. Charles Grose, Jr., of Grose Law Firm, of Greenwood, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson and Senior Assistant Deputy Attorney General William M. Blitch, Jr., both of Columbia, for Respondent.

Michael Cliff Eubanks appeals his convictions for first degree, second degree, and third degree criminal sexual conduct with a minor (CSC). Eubanks argues the circuit court erred in: (1) allowing two experts to testify that Victim suffered from trauma; (2) admitting evidence of Victim's PTSD; (3) allowing the State to question Victim on re-direct about Eubanks's pornography collection; (4) allowing the State to cross-examine Eubanks about his internet searches; (5) allowing the State to call Eubanks from the stand for a courtroom demonstration; (6) declining to continue the trial so an expert could examine Eubanks's damaged phone when the State was unable to extract data; (7) declining to continue the trial so Eubanks could call his physician to testify; (8) refusing to exclude a juror when it was revealed he previously sold a house to Victim's family member; (9) declining to grant a new trial after Eubanks learned a juror was Facebook friends with the grandmother a witness and an investigator; and (10) declining to charge the jury with second degree assault and battery as a lesser included offense to third degree CSC. Eubanks further contends he is entitled to a new trial because the State's closing arguments were highly prejudicial and due to the cumulative errors committed at trial. Last, Eubanks asks this court to issue guidance on the proper procedure for when the court reporter assigned to the trial accepts employment with one of the parties prior to completing the trial transcript.

 10:40 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2017-002632    Travis Hines, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

Clarence Rauch Wise, of Greenwood, for Petitioner. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson and Brianna Lynn Schill, both of Columbia, for Respondent.

In this post-conviction relief (PCR) action, Travis Hines (Petitioner) appeals the denial of his PCR application as to his guilty plea for distribution of heroin, third offense. He contends he did not waive his right to counsel with a full understanding of his rights and the consequences of self-representation. He also maintains the PCR court erroneously found the State "turned over all evidence as [it] received it" because the State did not allow Petitioner to view video evidence that allegedly depicted him involved in a controlled drug purchase.

 11:20 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2018-001605    In the Matter of the Estate of Harriet Kathleen Henry Tims, Decedent, Samuel H. Tims, individually and as a Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Harriet Kathleen Tims, Petitioner, v. Michael Tims, individually and as Co-Personal Representative of the Estate of Harriet Kathleen Tims, Respondent, And Deborah T. Krane, individually and as Co-Representative of the Estate of Harriet Kathleen Tims, Appellant.

Peter Brandt Shelbourne, of Shelbourne Law Firm, of Summerville; and Eric Matthew Campbell, of Trask & Howell, LLC, of Mount Pleasant, both for Appellant. Mills Lane Morrison, Jr., of Law Office of Darrell Thomas Johnson Jr., LLC, of Hardeeville, for Respondent.

In this estate dispute, the decedent, Harriet Tims, died intestate having certain real property titled in her name. The decedent's three children, Samuel Tims, Michael Tims, and Appellant Deborah T. Krane, disagree as to whether this property was an asset of the estate or a trust in favor of Michael. Samuel filed a declaratory action arguing the property should be held in trust until Michael fulfills the obligation of an existing land exchange agreement (LEA). Appellant filed a motion for summary judgment, arguing the action was time barred under section 62-3-803 of the South Carolina Code (). The circuit court ruled the nonclaim statute did not apply because the action was a dispute involving title to real property. On appeal, Appellant argues the circuit court erred by finding that: (1) the claim was not barred by the nonclaim statute; (2) the LEA created a resulting trust for Michael Tims; and (3) Appellant was not entitled to a jury trial.

Thursday, April 15, 2021
Virtual Courtroom I
 10:00 a.m. (Time Limits: 15-15-5)  
2018-000939    Calvin Felder, Claimant, v. Central Masonry Inc. & Arnold Construction Co., Employer, and AmGuard Insurance Co./Old Republic Insurance Co., and South Carolina Uninsured Employers Fund, Carriers, Defendants, Of which AmGuard Insurance Co. is the Appellant and Central Masonry Inc. and South Carolina Uninsured Employers Fund are the Respondents.

George D. Gallagher, of Speed, Seta, Martin, Trivett & Stubley, LLC, of Columbia, for Appellant. Jonathan R. Hendrix, of Hendrix & Steigner of Cayce, for Respondent Central Masonry. Lisa C. Glover, of Columbia, for Respondent South Carolina Uninsured Employers Fund.

This is an appeal from the Workers' Compensation Commission. The commission found equitable estoppel prevented Amguard Insurance from denying coverage to Central Masonry for Calvin Felder's work-related injury. Amguard argues this was error.

 10:40 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2018-001680    Elizabeth Murray as Personal Representative of the Estate of Minnie H. Murray and Elizabeth Stylesetters, Appellants, v. The Estate of William E. Murray, Respondent.

Oana Dobrescu Johnson, of Oana D. Johnson, Attorney at Law, of Charleston; George J. Kefalos, of George J. Kefalos, PA, of Charleston; Barry I. Baker, of Baker & Varner, LLC, of Charleston; and Stephen Michael Slotchiver, of Slotchiver & Slotchiver, LLP, of Mount Pleasant, all for Appellants. Robert H. Hood and Mary Agnes Hood Craig, both of Hood Law Firm, LLC, of Charleston; Deborah Harrison Sheffield, of Columbia; and Jean Marie Jennings, of Charleston, all for Respondent.

Appellants appeal the circuit court's order affirming the probate court's grant of summary judgment in favor of the Estate of William E. Murray, arguing the circuit court erred by finding that Minnie Murray's Estate lacked standing and was barred by the statute of limitations and the doctrine of laches, and that Stylesetters' claim was barred by judicial estoppel.

 11:20 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2018-001590    Andrew Waldo; Jane Zheng; and SC Coast Properties, LLC d/b/a Keller Williams Realty, Respondents, v. Michael Cousins; Founders Five, LLC d/b/a Sperry Van Ness Founders Group; and South Carolina Association of REALTORS, Appellants.

Lawrence Sidney Connor, IV, of Kelaher Connell & Connor, PC, of Surfside Beach, for Appellants Michael Cousins and Founders Five, LLC d/b/a Sperry Van Ness Founders Group. Marcus Angelo Manos, of Nexsen Pruet, LLC, of Columbia; and Christopher Randall Hampton, of Winston-Salem, both for Appellant South Carolina Association of Realtors. Douglas Michael Zayicek and Holly Michelle Lusk, both of Bellamy, Rutenberg, Copeland, Epps, Gravely & Bowers, P.A., of Myrtle Beach, for Respondents. Elizabeth Van Doren Gray and Vordman Carlisle Traywick, III, both of Robinson Gray Stepp & Laffitte, LLC, of Columbia, for Amicus Curiae National Association of Realtors.

Thursday, April 15, 2021
Virtual Courtroom II
 10:40 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2018-001667    The State, Respondent, v. William C. (Billy) Sellers, Appellant.

Chief Appellate Defender Robert Michael Dudek, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson, Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Zelenka, Senior Assistant Deputy Attorney General Melody Jane Brown, and Caroline M. Scrantom, all of Columbia, for Respondent.

William C. Sellers appeals his conviction for murder. On appeal, he argues the trial court erred in (1) violating his due process rights by instructing the jury that malice "is the intentional doing of a wrongful act without just cause or excuse" because it shifted the State's burden of proof to him to show he had a justification for his acts; (2) instructing the jury on accomplice liability because the evidence did not support giving this instruction; and (3) admitting witness Phillip Griffin's sentencing sheets because they were not probative of whether Griffin received consideration from the State for his testimony.

 
 11:20 a.m. (Time Limits: 10-10-5)  
2018-001766    Charleston Development Company, LLC, Charleston Housing Company, LLC and NotSo Hostel, LLC, Appellants, v. Younesse Alami, Simon M. Adell, Matthew Anderson, Matthew Asher, Daniel Baker, Marie Baker, Matthew and Christina Bare, Andre Bauer, Peter Bierce, Brandon Blount, Barbara Brass, Richard T. Brewer, Sigrid Anne Eilertson, Reginald P. Brown IV, Mary Cahill, Ryan Cockrell, Kevin and Virginia Conlon, Anne Marie Crevar, Christina Cross, Darryl J. Damico, Labar Daniel, Stephen Darwak, Lindsay Davenport, Mary Dickerson, Maxwell Streeter, Kathleen Dougherty, David Dressman, Anna Dressman, Michael Elder, Christopher Scott Farley, Michele Ghastin, Timnah Giller, Virginia Geller, Ryan Gilreath, Sonya Gilreath, Kimberly Glenn, Shaun Halsor, Josephine Rex, Arthur Halvorson, Andrew Halvorson, Linda Hancock, Laura Hyatt, Mike Hartel, Nathan Herring, James Hicks, Jr., Laurie Hicks, Preston G. Hipp, Colin Jones, Matthew F. Jones, Robert C. Jones, Robin Joseph, Molly Keeler, John Kenny, Mandi walters, Abigail King, Aaron Kless, Laurie Kramer, Robert Kramer, Allison Kreutzer, Benjamin Levitt, Richard Levitt, Jesse Lutz, Nikou Manouchehri, Thomas Naselaris, Zoe Naselaris, Beau O'Steen, Cori O'Steen, Lance Parr, Brandon Perdue, Amanda Lee Raymer, Hadassah Rothenberg, Daniel Ryan, Kimberly Bowlin, Kevin Schnittker, Ginger Scofield, Inderjit Singh, Avtar Singh, Alecia Stevens, Lee Stevens, Justin Swan, Merrick Teichman, John Van Vlack, Jr., William Waterhouse, Jennifer Waterhouse, Anne Wohlfeil, Bryan Young, AJB Trust, Anthony & Jacqueline Bradley, Trustees, Hartshorn Family Trust, Helene Kenny / Bridget Kenny Revocable Trust, Wilhelmina M. Wieters Life Estate Childrens Trust, 33 Bogard Street LLC, 249 Cumming, LLC, 253 Coming Street LLC, 259 East Bay LLC, 259 East Bay 10 B LLC, 272 D Coming St. LLC, CafĂ© International, Inc., Corner At Old Canton, LLC, Geer Interests LLC, Kit Properties LLC, Lambert-Weiss LLC, The Naws LLC, New Lease Capital LLC, One Henrietta LLC, Periwinkle Partners, LLC, Porch Properties LLC, Westbury Properties, LLC, and Westendorff Hardware LLC, Defendants, Of whom Younesse Alami, Simon M. Adell, Matthew Anderson, Matthew Asher, Andre Bauer, Peter Bierce, Brandon Blount, Reginald P. Brown IV, Mary Cahill, Ryan Cockrell, Kevin and Virginia Conlon, Anne Marie Crevar, Darryl J. Damico, Stephen Darwak, Lindsay Davenport, Kathleen Dougherty, David Dressman, Anna Dressman, Michael Elder, Christopher Scott Farley, Michele Ghastin, Ryan Gilreath, Sonya Gilreath, Shaun Halsor, Josephine Rex, Laura Hyatt, Nathan Herring, James Hicks, Jr., Laurie Hicks, Preston G. Hipp, Colin Jones, Matthew F. Jones, Robert C. Jones, Robin Joseph, Molly Keeler, John Kenny, Abigail King, Aaron Kless, Laurie Kramer, Robert Kramer, Allison Kreutzer, Jesse Lutz, Thomas Naselaris, Zoe Naselaris, Beau O'Steen, Cori O'Steen, Lance Parr, Brandon Perdue, Hadassah Rothenberg, Daniel Ryan, Kimberly Bowlin, Kevin Schnittker, Ginger Scofield, Alecia Stevens, Justin Swan, Merrick Teichman, John Van Vlack, Jr., William Waterhouse, Jennifer Waterhouse, Anne Wohlfeil, Bryan Young, Helene Kenny / Bridget Kenny Revocable Trust, 259 East Bay LLC, 259 East Bay 10 B LLC, Corner At Old Canton, LLC, Kit Properties LLC, The Naws LLC, One Henrietta LLC, Periwinkle Partners, LLC, Porch Properties LLC, Westbury Properties, LLC, and Westendorff Hardware LLC, are the Respondents.

Sean Kevin Trundy, of Sean Kevin Trundy, LLC, of Charleston, for Appellants. Stafford John McQuillin, III, of Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd, PA, of Charleston, for Respondents William Waterhouse and Jennifer Waterhouse. Christopher L. Murphy, of Murphy Law Offices, LLC, of Charleston, for Respondents Younesse Alami, Mary Cahill, Darryl J. Damico, Lindsay Davenport, David Dressman, Anna Dressman, 249 Cumming, LLC, Corner At Old Canton,LLC, Periwinkle Partners, LLC, Zoe Naselaris, Lance Parr, Justin Swan, John Van Vlack, Jr., Andre Bauer, Westbury Properties, LLC, Laurie Hicks, Colin Jones, John Kenny, Mandy Walters, Aaron Kless, Thomas Naselaris, Christopher Scott Farley, Michele Ghastin, Shaun Halsor, Josephine Rex, Nathan Herring, and James Hicks, Jr. Gregory Kenneth Voigt, of Voigt Murphy, LLC, of Charleston, for Respondents 259 East Bay LLC, 259 East Bay 10 B LLC, Robert C. Jones, Matthew F. Jones, Daniel Ryan, Kimberly Bowlin, and 259 East Bay LLC. Daniel Carson Boles, of Charleston, for Respondents Abigail King and KIT Properties, LLC. David B. Marvel, of Charleston, for Respondents Matthew Asher, Anna Marie Crevar, Stephen Darwak, and Ann Wohlfeil. Mallary Lauren Scheer, of Mallary L. Scheer, Attorney at Law, LLC, of Charleston, for Respondent Reginald P. Brown. Michael Ashley Whitsitt, of The Whitsitt Law Firm, of Mount Pleasant, for Respondent Merrick Teichman. Lucy Clark Sanders, of Bloodgood & Sanders, LLC, of Mt. Pleasant, for Respondents Matthew Anderson and Simon M. Adell. Nancy Bloodgood, of Bloodgood & Sanders, LLC, of Mt. Pleasant and Mary Lee Briggs of North Charleston, for Respondents Matthew Anderson, Reginald P. Brown, Peter Bierce, Brandon Blount, Ryan Cockrell, Kevin Conlon, Simon M. Adell, Hadassah Rothenberg, Kevin Schnittker, Ginger Scofield, Bryan Young, The Naws, LLC, Westendorff Hardware LLC, Preston G. Hipp, Robin Joseph, Molly Keeler, Helene Kenny/ Bridget Denny Revocable Trust, One Henrietta LLC, Brandon Perdue, Virginia Conlon, Kathleen Dougherty, Michael Elder, Ryan Gilreath, Sonya Gilreath, Hartshorn Family Trust,

This appeal arises from lawsuits against approximately 115 defendants made up of property owners, alleging the defendants' illegal short-term rental businesses in Charleston damaged the legal short-term rental businesses of Charleston Development Company, LLC, Charleston Housing Company, LLC, and NotSoHostel, LLC, (collectively, Appellants). Appellants appeal from the trial court's grant of summary judgment to all defendants (most of whom are Respondents), arguing the trial court erred in granting summary judgment against their (1) claim under City of Charleston Ordinance 54-905; (2) claim for violation of the Unfair Trade Practices Act (UTPA); and (3) nuisance claim. They also argue they are entitled to the video-taped depositions of Respondents.

 
Cases to be Submitted Without Oral Argument
2018-002095    Jeanne Knollinger, Appellant, v. Ryan Noel Oliver, Respondent.

2018-000552    The State, Respondent, v. Robert Louis Garrett, Jr., Appellant.

2018-000402    The State, Respondent, v. Jody Lynn Ward, Appellant.

2018-000911    The State, Respondent, v. Gregory Sanders, Appellant.

2018-002131    The State, Respondent, v. Jeremy Renard Webb, Appellant.

2018-000182    Mack Washington, Jr., Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

2018-002061    Anderson Brothers Bank, Respondent, v. Dazarhea Monique Parson, a/k/a Dazarhea D. Parson, a/k/a Dazarhea Monique Daniels Parson, A. Tyrone Parson, Jr. a/k/a Arnold Tyrone Parson, Jr., South Carolina Department of Revenue and South Carolina Department of Motor Vehicles, Defendants, Of whom Dazarhea Monique Parson, a/k/a Dazarhea D. Parson, a/k/a Dazarhea Monique Daniels Parson and A. Tyrone Parson, Jr. a/k/a Arnold Tyrone Parson, Jr. are the Appellants.

2019-001785    The State, Respondent, v. Risheen Gervais Rich, Appellant.

2018-002139    Jeffrey McCoy, #355188, Appellant, v. South Carolina Department of Corrections, Respondent.

2019-000046    Elvia Stoppiello and Gilberto Garcia, Appellants, v. William D. Turner and Charter Communications, LLC, Respondents.

2018-002026    Latoria R. Cooks, Appellant, v. Pearlz Vista, Inc., d/b/a Pearlz Oyster Bar, Carolina Ale House Operating Company, LLC, d/b/a Carolina Ale House, and Art Bar, Inc., Respondents.

2018-002040    The State, Respondent, v. Steven Deontae Hoover, Appellant.

2019-001267    The State, Respondent, v. Miranda Kay Taylor, Appellant.

2019-001999    Tirrell Boyd, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

2020-000265    Ar'Quivius McClee, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

2018-002232    The State, Respondent, v. Frederick Calvin Jones, Appellant.

2018-000849    Chazmonte Brown, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

2019-002092    Yusuf Karim Aquil, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

2018-001215    The State, Respondent, v. Abin Lee Lowman, Appellant.

2018-002201    The State, Respondent, v. Daniel Lee Fludd, Appellant.

2019-000493    The State, Respondent, v. Aaron Benjamin Beach, Appellant.

2019-000561    The State, Respondent, v. Nikki Giovanni Echols, Appellant.

2018-001981    Damon Brown, #357300, Appellant, v. South Carolina Department of Corrections, Respondent.

2018-002064    The State, Respondent, v. Leonard E. Scruggs, III, Appellant.

2018-001892    The State, Respondent, v. Darrell Eugene Blackwell, Appellant.

2019-000121    The State, Respondent, v. Sharkee Alejandro Mitchell, Appellant.

2019-001990    Roosevelt Sabb, Jr, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

2018-000543    Anthony Wilson, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

2018-002148    The State, Respondent, v. Roy Gene Sutherland, Appellant.

2018-001797    Nicholas L. Pettit, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles A. Pettit, deceased, Appellant, v. Audrey E. Volonis and Ryan D. Volonis, Respondents.

2019-000065    The State, Respondent, v. Samuel Jeremiah Jeter, Appellant.

2018-002205    Willie Gunter, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

2019-000643    Brandon James Littell, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

2019-000768    Tamarcus Long, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

2018-002243    John K. Massey, Jr., #305341, Appellant, v. South Carolina Department of Corrections, Respondent.

2019-000760    The State, Respondent, v. Ansel Bradley Wallen, Appellant.

2018-002092    The State, Respondent, v. Dorian Rosean Hopkins, Appellant.

2019-000204    In the Matter of the Care and Treatment of Kenneth Wright, Appellant.

2019-001558    Henry Oneal Dingle, Jr., Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

2020-000068    Jonathan Johnson, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

2018-001599    The State, Respondent, v. Keunte D. Cobbs, Appellant.

2018-000882    David J. Penn, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

2019-000084    The State, Respondent, v. Michael Anthony Sullivan , Appellant.

2019-001114    Stanley Ali Godbold, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.

2019-001797    The State, Respondent, v. William Zachary Newton, Appellant.

2019-000491    The State, Respondent, v. Charles Joseph Bunton, Appellant.

2019-001024    The State, Respondent, v. Ronnie LeShanon Bonner, Appellant.

2019-000664    Nathan F. Albertson, Respondent, v. Amanda M. Byfield, Appellant.

2018-001542    The State, Respondent, v. Clifton Curtis Boozer, Appellant.

2018-002106    State Ethics Commission, Respondent, v. Charles E. Houston, Jr., Appellant.