PREV | February 2015 | NEXT |
The summary below each case is prepared to offer lawyers and the public a general overview of what issues are included in a case which will be argued. The summary is not a limit on what issues a party to a case may present at oral argument.
Monday, February 2, 2015 | |
Courtroom I
|
|
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2010-175426 Robert Duncan McCall, Petitioner,
v.
State of South Carolina, Respondent. J. Falkner Wilkes, of Greenville, for Petitioner. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson and Senior Assistant Deputy Attorney General Karen Christine Ratigan, both of Columbia, for Respondent. Robert McCall was convicted of first-degree criminal sexual conduct (CSC) with a minor and lewd act upon a child. He appeals from the denial and dismissal of his application for post-conviction relief (PCR), arguing his trial counsel was ineffective in failing to properly prepare, present, raise, and preserve the issue of whether the victim should have received an independent psychological examination. |
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2011-193670 George Wigington, Petitioner,
v.
State of South Carolina, Respondent. Dayne C. Phillips, of Lexington, for Petitioner. Appellate Defender Laura Baer, of Columbia, for Petitioner. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson and Assistant Attorney General Suzanne Hollifield White, both of Columbia, for Respondent. In this post-conviction relief (PCR) action, George Wigington argues the PCR court erred in finding trial counsel was not ineffective for failing to properly argue to the trial court and preserve for appellate review whether he was entitled to an involuntary manslaughter jury charge. |
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2011-201588 Willis Weary, Respondent,
v.
State of South Carolina, Petitioner. Robert Daniel Corney of Gallivan, White & Boyd, PA, of Greenville, for Petitioner. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson, Senior Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, and Assistant Attoroney General Megan E. Harrigan, all of Columbia, for Petitioner. Appellate Defender Kathrine Haggard Hudgins, of Columbia, for Respondent. The State of South Carolina appeals the post-conviction relief court's order granting Respondent Willis Weary's application for post-conviction relief and remanding his case for sentencing on second-degree burglary. The State argues that the PCR court erred in determining that Weary's trial counsel provided ineffective assistance for failing to investigate and properly challenge two prior burglary convictions, which elevated Weary's charge from second-degree burglary to first-degree burglary. The State further argues that Weary's sentence was appropriately enhanced based on his three prior burglary convictions. |
|
Tuesday, February 3, 2015 | |
Courtroom I
|
|
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2012-212547 The State, Respondent,
v.
Kenneth Andrew Lynch, Appellant. Appellate Defender Susan Barber Hackett, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Senior Assistant Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Zelenka, and Assistant Attorney General J. Anthony Mabry, all of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor Donald V. Myers, of Lexington, for Respondent. Kenneth A. Lynch appeals his convictions of two counts of murder and one count of grand larceny, arguing the trial court erred in (1) denying his motion for a directed verdict because the State failed to present substantial circumstantial evidence of his guilt; (2) refusing to instruct the jury regarding how to use and evaluate circumstantial evidence; and (3) failing to suppress evidence seized during his arrest. |
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2012-212643 The State, Appellant,
v.
Woodrow Mozee, Respondent. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson and Assistant Attorney General William M. Blitch, Jr., both of Columbia, for Appellant. Pete Gus Diamaduros of The Diamaduros Law Firm, of Union, for Respondent. The State appeals the trial court's decision to vacate and dismiss Respondent's charges of driving under the influence (DUI), 1st and driving with an open container. The State argues that (1) the videotape produced fully complies with section 56-5-2953(A) of the South Carolina Code, (2) the Trooper validly marked the breath test as refused instead of incomplete, and (3) the Trooper presented sufficient evidence of the contents of the bottle to send the issue to the jury. |
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2012-213310 Bank of America, N.A. successor by merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP, Appellant,
v.
Charles M. Thompson, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. as nominee for E-Loan, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., as nominee for MidCountry Bank, Bridges Crossing Property Owners' Association, Inc., and SC Telco Federal Credit Union, and Oriole Properties, Inc., Defendants.
And
U.S. Bank, National Association, Respondent,
v.
Charles M. Thompson, E-Loan, Inc., and SC Telco Federal Credit Union, Defendants. Allen Mattison Bogan and Michael J. Anzelmo, both of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP, and Dean Anthony Hayes of Clarkson and Korn, LLC, all of Columbia, for Appellant. Thomas A. Shook of Finkel Law Firm LLC, of North Charleston, for Respondent. Bank of America, N.A., successor by merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP FKA Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, L.P. (BANA), appeals from the Master-in-Equity's denial of its motion for relief from judgment in this mortgage foreclosure action. BANA argues the master erred in (1) failing to hold BANA's mortgage remained unaffected by a prior order releasing the mortgage; (2) denying BANA's Rule 60(b)(4), SCRCP motion; and (3) holding previous proceedings, which led to the sale of the mortgaged property, were res judicata as to the purchaser. |
|
Thursday, February 5, 2015 | |
Courtroom I
|
|
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2013-001280 Hallenbeck Sisters, LLC, Appellant,
v.
Ronald D. Hall and Mary M. Scarborough, Solely in Their Capacities as Acting Delinquent Tax Collector and Delinquent Tax Collector, Respectively, for Charleston County, Respondents. Steven Michael Querin, Howard R. Kinard, and Shane W. Rogers, all of Johnson Smith Hibbard & Wildman, LLP, of Spartanburg, for Appellant. Bernard E. Ferrara, Jr., Joseph Dawson, III, Bradley Allen Mitchell, and Austin Adams Bruner, all of North Charleston, for Respondents. Hallenbeck Sisters, LLC appeals the circuit court's refusal to set aside a tax sale of commercial property for nonpayment of 2010 taxes, arguing the notices mailed prior to the sale did not strictly comply with statutory provision governing the procedure for notifying delinquent taxpayers that property will be sold in order to collect delinquent taxes. |
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2013-000022 Danny Abrams and Frances Abrams, Appellants,
v.
City of Newberry, Respondent. Christian Stegmaier and Claude Townsend Prevost, III, of Collins & Lacy, PC, of Columbia; and Amy Lynn Neuschafer of Collins & Lacy, PC, of Murrells Inlet, all for Appellants. David Leon Morrison and Kassi B. Sandifer, of Morrison Law Firm, LLC, of Columbia, for Respondent. Danny and Frances Abrams appeal the circuit court's order granting summary judgment in favor of the City of Newberry, arguing the circuit court erred in finding (1) the City did not owe a duty to inspect or otherwise maintain the sewer system in any particular fashion and (2) the City was not immunized from liability. |
|
12:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2013-000179 The State, Respondent,
v.
Venancio Diaz Perez, Appellant. Jason Scott Luck of The Seibels Law Firm, P.A., of Charleston, for Appellant. Chief Appellate Defender Robert Michael Dudek, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson and Special Assistant Attorney General Amie L. Clifford, both of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor Scarlett Anne Wilson, of Charleston, for Respondent. Perez appeals his convictions for lewd act upon a minor and assault and battery of a high and aggravated nature, arguing the trial court erred in: (1) admitting evidence of prior bad acts; (2) limiting the cross-examination of a witness; and (3) issuing a vindictive sentence. |
|
Tuesday, February 10, 2015 | |
Courtroom I
|
|
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2011-191687 Shanna Kranchick, Respondent,
v.
State of South Carolina, Petitioner. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson, Assistant Attorney General Megan E. Harrigan, Assistant Attorney General James Clayton Mitchell, III, and Assistant Attorney General Brian T. Petrano, all of Columbia, for Petitioner. Appellate Defender Kathrine Haggard Hudgins, of Columbia, for Respondent. The State of South Carolina appeals the post-conviction relief court's order granting Respondent Shanna M. Kranchick's application for post-conviction relief. The State argues that the PCR court erred in determining that Kranchick's trial counsel provided ineffective assistance for failing to object to a portion of the toxicologist's testimony at trial. The State further argues that Kranchick did not suffer any prejudice from her trial counsel's alleged deficiency, as there was overwhelming evidence of guilt and the testimony had no reasonable impact on the outcome of the case. |
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2013-000445 The State, Respondent,
v.
Lexie James Turner, Appellant. Christopher Shannon Leonard of Kendrick & Leonard, P.C., of Columbia, for Appellant. Chief Appellate Defender Robert Michael Dudek, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson, Assistant Deputy Attorney General David A. Spencer, and Assistant Attorney General Ian Parks Weschler, all of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor Kevin Scott Brackett, of York, for Respondent. Lexie James Turner appeals his conviction for possession with intent to distribute crack cocaine arguing the trial court erred in admitting unreliable expert testimony. |
|
Wednesday, February 11, 2015 | |
Courtroom I
|
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2013-001581 James W. Trexler, Appellant,
v.
The Associated Press, Barrington Broadcasting South Carolina Corp., Raycom TV Broadcasting, Inc., The Spartanburg Herald Journal, Inc. and the Pacific & Southern Co., Inc., Respondents. William H. Johnson of Law Office of William H. Johnson, LLC, of Manning, for Appellant. Matthew David Hamrick, of Mount Pleasant, for Appellant. Warren W. Wills, III, of Law Office of W. Westbrook Wills III, of Folly Beach, for Appellant. Jerry Jay Bender of Baker Ravenel & Bender, LLP, of Columbia, for Respondents. James Trexler appeals the circuit court's grant of summary judgment in favor of certain media entities (Respondents), arguing the circuit court erroneously found Trexler's claims were barred by the applicable statute of limitations. In addition, Trexler contends the circuit court erred in finding he was a public official and thus required to demonstrate actual malice and in concluding Respondents were immune from suit because the content of its publications were substantially true and also protected under the fair reporting privilege. |
|
Thursday, February 12, 2015 | |
Courtroom I
|
|
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2013-001339 The State, Respondent,
v.
William Joseph Phillips, Appellant. David Lee Paavola of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP, of Columbia, for Appellant. Chief Appellate Defender Robert Michael Dudek, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Senior Assistant Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Zelenka, and Assistant Attorney General Kaycie Smith Timmons, all of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor William Walter Wilkins, III, of Greenville, for Respondent. In connection with the shooting death of Charles Roberts, the State indicted William Joseph Phillips on the charge of accessory before the fact of murder. Phillips appeals his conviction, arguing the trial court erred in refusing to give a proposed jury charge concerning the mental state required for conviction. |
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2013-001342 The State, Respondent,
v.
Lamont Antonio Samuel, Appellant. Appellate Defender Robert M. Pachak, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Senior Assistant Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Zelenka, and Senior Assistant Attorney General W. Edgar Salter, III, of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor David Michael Pascoe, Jr., of Orangeburg, for Respondent. Appellant appeals his conviction for murder arguing the trial court erred in refusing to allow him to represent himself. |
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2013-000876 The State, Respondent,
v.
John Henry Smith, Appellant. Appellate Defender Kathrine Haggard Hudgins, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson and Assistant Attorney General John Benjamin Aplin, both of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor Jimmy A. Richardson, II, of Conway, for Respondent. Appellant John Henry Smith appeals the court's refusal to grant a directed verdict of acquittal for armed robbery when the State failed to introduce evidence of a weapon. |
|
Wednesday, February 25, 2015 | |
Courtroom I
|
|
10:00 a.m. | |
2014-000429 South Carolina Department of Social Services, Respondent,
v.
Patrecse Miller and Aqien Miller, Defendants.
Of Whom Patrecse Miller is the Appellant.
In the interest of a minor child under the age of eighteen.
|
|
2:00 p.m. | |
2014-000973 Grand Strand Regional Medical Center, LLC, Respondent,
v.
South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control, Respondent below.
Grand Strand Regional Medical Center, LLC, Respondent,
v.
South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control and Carolina Regional Cancer Center, Respondents below,
of whom Carolina Regional Cancer Center is the Appellant. Carolina Regional Cancer Center seeks a rehearing of this court's denial of its petition for supersedeas, arguing this court should stay the Administrative Law Court's decision to award a certificate of need to Grand Strand Regional Medical Center. Specifically, Carolina Regional argues section 44-7-220(B) of the South Carolina Code should be read to impose a mandatory stay, and the appeal bond required by the statute is unconstitutional unless a stay is granted. |
Tuesday, February 3, 2015 | |
Courtroom II
|
|
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2014-001394 South Carolina Department of Social Services, Respondent,
v.
In the Interest of Sidney Patten, a vulnerable adult, Appellant. Melinda Inman Butler of The Butler Law Firm, of Union, for Appellant. David E. Simpson, of Rock Hill, for Respondent. Ernest M. Spong, III, of Winnsboro, Guardian ad Litem. Sidney Patten appeals the family court's order finding him to be a vulnerable adult pursuant to sectionn 43-35-10(11) of the South Carolina Code. Patten contends the South Carolina Department of Social Services failed to prove by clear and convincing evidence that he suffers a physical or mental condition which substantially impairs him from adequately providing for his own care and protection. |
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2012-213672 The State, Respondent,
v.
Keith Letmon, Appellant. Chief Appellate Defender Robert Michael Dudek, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, and Senior Assistant Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Zelenka, all of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor Barry Joe Barnette, of Spartanburg, for Respondent. Keith Letmon appeals his conviction for murder, arguing the circuit court erred in allowing in-court identifications of Letmon where the photographic array impermissibly highlighted his photograph and the photographic lineups presented a legally unacceptable likelihood of misidentification under Neil v. Biggers. |
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2011-202946 Tri-County Development, Inc. and Melinda Holbrooks, Respondents,
v.
Christopher A. Pierce, Appellant.
Christopher A. Pierce, Third Party Plaintiff,
v.
Jeff Gray, Third Party Defendant.
AND
Tri-County Development, Inc. and Melinda Holbrooks, Respondents,
v.
Christopher A. Pierce, Appellant. Thomas Jefferson Goodwyn, Jr. and Rachel Gottlieb Peavy, both of Goodwyn Law Firm, LLC, of Columbia, for Appellant. Thomas Elihue Dudley, III of Kenison Dudley & Crawford, LLC, of Greenville, for Respondent. Respondents Tri-County Development, Inc. and Melinda Holbrooks brought this action in 2005 to enforce a mechanic's lien against Appellant Christopher A. Pierce. In 2011, the case was tried before a jury, which returned a verdict in Respondents' favor, after which the trial court awarded attorney's fees and costs to Respondents. Pierce appeals, arguing: (1) his directed verdict motion based on a statutory prohibition against an unlicensed home builder bringing an action to enforce a residential building contract should have been granted, or in the alternative, the issue of Tri-County's licensing credentials should have been submitted to the jury; (2) an entry of default against a third-party defendant should not have been set aside; and (3) summary judgment as to liability on Respondents' breach of contract claim was improper. Pierce further argues that if the underlying judgments are vacated by this court, he is entitled to have the award of attorney's fees and costs set aside. |
|
12:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2012-211980 The State, Respondent,
v.
Brenda Bratschi, Appellant. Appellate Defender David Alexander, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Senior Assistant Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Zelenka, and Assistant Attorney General Kaycie Smith Timmons, all of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor Edgar Lewis Clements, III, of Florence, for Respondent. Brenda Bratschi appeals her convictions of murder and burying a body without notice, arguing the trial court erred in failing to grant her a directed verdict. She also contends the trial court erred in admitting into evidence a 911 call. |
|
12:40 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2012-212092 Charles Ray Dean, Petitioner,
v.
State of South Carolina, Respondent. Appellate Defender David Alexander, of Columbia, for Petitioner. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson and Assistant Attorney General Christina Catoe Bigelow, of Columbia, for Respondent. In this post-conviction relief (PCR) matter, Petitioner Charles Ray Dean argues the PCR court erred in finding Dean's Sixth Amendment right to effective assistance of counsel was not violated. Specifically, Dean argues that plea counsel gave Dean erroneous advice regarding sentencing and Dean would have gone to trial, instead of pleading guilty, but for plea counsel's error. |
|
Wednesday, February 11, 2015 | |
Courtroom II
|
|
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2012-213602 The State, Respondent,
v.
Daniel Demond Griffin, Appellant. Appellate Defender LaNelle Cantey DuRant, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson and Assistant Attorney General John Benjamin Aplin, both of Columbia, for Respondent. Solicitor David Matthew Stumbo, of Greenwood, for Respondent. Appellant Daniel Demond Griffin contends the trial court erred in denying his motion to dismiss. He asserts that he was unlawfully stopped, seized, detained, and arrested by deputies who had not been duly qualified to serve as deputy sheriffs. |
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5) |
2012-213521 Jane Doe, as guardian for John Doe, Appellant,
v.
Boy Scout Troop 292, Spartanburg, SC; Palmetto Council of the Boy Scouts of America; St. Margaret's Episcopal Church; Shelby Culbreth; Jackie LaFontaine; Brandon Smith; Rob Green; Roy Cole; Bob Faulks; and Scott O'Neill, Respondents. Gregg E. Meyers of Jeff Anderson & Assoc. PA, of St Paul, Minnesota, for Appellant. William Harrell Foster, III, of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP, of Greenville, for Respondents. Allen Mattison Bogan and Miles Edward Coleman of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP, of Columbia, for Respondents. In this action for intentional infliction of emotional distress, Appellant Jane Doe, as guardian for John Doe, challenges the circuit court's granting of summary judgment to Respondents, Boy Scout Troop 292, Spartanburg SC (Troop 292); Palmetto Council of the Boy Scouts of America; St. Margaret's Episcopal Church; and other individuals. Appellant argues the circuit court erred in applying an adult standard to a developmentally disabled fourteen-year-old boy who was excluded from Troop 292 after reporting that he was sexually abused by his scoutmaster. Appellant also argues the circuit court erred in applying a heightened burden of proof to her claim. |
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-10-5-5) |
2010-167127 Sean D. Fay, as Personal Representative for the Estate of Kelly L. Fay, Deceased, Respondent/Appellant,
v.
Grand Strand Regional Medical Center, LLC, d/b/a South Strand Ambulatory Care Center and Stephen W. Law, D.O., Dr. Richard Young, M.D., and Grand Strand Urology, LLP, Defendants,
Of Whom Stephen W. Law, D.O. is also an Appellant,
And Of Whom Dr. Richard Young, M.D., and Grand Strand Urology, LLP, are Respondents. J. Boone Aiken, III, of Aiken Bridges Elliott Tyler & Saleeby, P.A., of Florence, for Appellant Stephen W. Law, DO. Andrew F. Lindemann of Davidson & Lindemann, PA, of Columbia, for Appellant Stephen W. Law, DO. John S. Nichols, of Bluestein Nichols Thompson & Delgado, LLC, of Columbia, for Respondent/Appellant, Sean Fay as Personal Representative for the Estate of Kelly Fay, Deceased. Ruskin C. Foster, Sr. of McGowan Hood & Felder, LLC, of Columbia, for Respondent/Appellant, Sean Fay as Personal Representative for the Estate of Kelly Fay, Deceased. Bradley Davis Hewett of Mike Kelly Law Group, LLC, of Columbia, for Respondent/Appellant Sean Fay, as Personal Representative for the Estate of Kelly Fay, Deceased. Carmen V. Ganjehsani, Marian Williams Scalise, and Lydia Lewis Magee, all of Richardson Plowden & Robinson, PA, of Columbia and Myrtle Beach, for Respondents Richard Young MD and Grand Strand Urology. In this cross-appeal from a medical malpractice action, Sean Fay argues the trial court erred in granting Dr. Richard Young's motion for a directed verdict on public policy grounds. In addition, Dr. Stephen Law argues the trial court erred in (1) denying his motion for a judgment notwithstanding the verdict, (2) excluding evidence of Fay's admitted extramarital affair, and (3) refusing to enroll the judgment against him using the jury's determination of six percent negligence on his part. |
|
12:20 p.m. | (Time Limits: 15-15-5) |
2012-213228 The State, Respondent,
v.
Ronasha Taylor, Appellant. Andrew Robert de Holl of Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLP, of Charleston, for Appellant. Chief Appellate Defender Robert Michael Dudek, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan McCrory Wilson and Assistant Attorneys General Bethany Bedenbaugh Miles, Christina J. Catoe, and Kelly Wilson Hall, all of Columbia, for Respondent. Following convictions for six counts of committing a lewd act on a minor involving six children, Ronasha Taylor appeals asserting the trial court erred in (1) allowing two forensic interviewers to give testimony that impermissibly vouched for the credibility of the six complaining children, (2) allowing the two forensic interviewers to give such testimony as expert witnesses, (3) admitting DVD recordings of out-of-court statements of four of the complaining children, because they did not have particularized guarantees of trustworthiness, and (4) allowing one of the children to testify by closed circuit television because the trial court failed to make the requisite findings for the procedure and there was insufficient evidence the procedure was necessary. |
|
Cases to be Submitted Without Oral Argument | |
2013-002739 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Travis Samuel Warren, Appellant.
|
2013-000543 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Jabriel L. Singleton, Appellant.
|
2013-000958 |
Billy Lisenby, Jr., #200273, Appellant,
v.
South Carolina Department of Corrections, Respondent.
|
2013-000493 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Gabriel Jon Rios, Appellant.
|
2013-000768 |
William Richard Burgess, Appellant,
v.
Rita G. Burgess, Respondent.
|
2014-000254 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Tammy Smathers, Appellant.
|
2013-000852 |
Billy Lisenby, Jr., #200273, Appellant,
v.
South Carolina Department of Corrections, Respondent.
In Re: L. D. H., a minor,
|
2012-210670 |
Christian Harris, Petitioner,
v.
State of South Carolina, Respondent.
|
2013-002169 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Patrick Gillis McAllister, Appellant.
|
2013-002260 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Steve Franklin Grayson, Appellant.
|
2013-001918 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Anthony C. Johnson, Appellant.
|
2013-002078 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Pandora Hardy, Appellant.
|
2011-204367 |
Joseph C. Sun, Appellant,
v.
Olesya Matyushevsky, Citizens Opposed to Domestic Abuse, Christine Varg, and Liling Sun, Respondents.
AND
Joseph C. Sun, Appellant,
v.
Olesya Matyushevsky, Citizens Opposed to Domestic Abuse, and Christine Varg, Respondents.
AND
Joseph C. Sun, Appellant,
v.
Olesya Matyushevsky, Citizens Opposed to Domestic Abuse, and Christine Varg, Respondents.
|
2013-000492 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Donald Eugene Peters, Appellant.
|
2013-002688 |
Beverley D. Wilson, Appellant,
v.
Stephen P. Williams, Respondent.
|
2013-000608 |
Irving T. Geddis, Jr., Harry M. Carroll, Barbara C. Stancil, & Joanne C. Wade, Respondents,
v.
Rebecca Geddis, Patricia Ann Geddis, Cleveland Geddis, John Henry Geddis, Herman Geddis, George Geddis, Patrice Geddis, Joenatham Geddis, Yvonne Geddis Bowens, Gwendolyn P. Spell, Harry P. Geddis, Catherine Goodwine a/k/a Catharine Goodwine, Jessie Goodwine, and any individual who may be claiming an interest in this action as an heir of these individuals, and MWV Community Development and Land Management, LLC, and John Doe and Jane Doe, ficticious names designating the unknown heirs, devisees, distributees, issue, executors, administrators, successors or assigns of the Defendants named above, and Richard Roe and Mary Roe, fictitious names designating infants and persons under any disability or incompetent, including those persons who might be in the Military Services within the meaning of The Soldier's and Sailor's Civil Relief Act of 1941, Title 50, United States Code, and any other person or legal entity who or which has or claims any right title, interest or lien in or to the real property described in this Complaint, Defendants,
Of whom Cleveland Geddis and Patrice Geddis are the Appellants.
|
2013-000494 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Gary Eugene Lott, Appellant.
|
2012-212890 |
Antoine Jermaine China, Petitioner,
v.
State of South Carolina, Respondent.
|
2014-000768 |
Perry Watford, #289215, Appellant,
v.
South Carolina Department of Corrections, Respondent.
|
2013-001357 |
Walters Construction, Inc., Respondent,
v.
Stanley J. Sledziona and Sharon Sledziona, Appellants.
|
2013-000456 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Reco Antonio Godbolt, Appellant.
|
2013-002175 |
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., as Trustee for WaMu Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2006-PR I Trust, Respondent,
v.
Marvin Smalley, Bay Club Homes Property Owners Association, Inc., Defendants,
Of whom Marvin Smalley is the Appellant.
|
2013-000766 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Joseph Walker, Appellant.
|
2011-201146 |
Thaddess Starks, Petitioner,
v.
State of South Carolina, Respondent.
|
2012-213617 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
William Pou, Appellant.
|
2014-000393 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Stevie Curtis Higgins, Jr., Appellant.
|
2014-000050 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Timothy Cromer, Appellant.
|
2013-002555 |
Melissa Jean Marks, Appellant,
v.
Old South Mortgage Corporation, John Does 1-100, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, Defendants,
Of whom Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, is the Respondent.
|
2012-210387 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Jabarrie Brown, Appellant.
|
2013-002018 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Christopher Lee Emmons, Appellant.
|
2014-000621 |
Joseph N. Grate, Appellant,
v.
Andrew J. Rodrigues, Respondent.
|
2013-002677 |
T. B. Patterson, Jr., Appellant,
v.
Justo Carmona Ortega, Respondent.
|
2013-002679 |
Lend Lease (US) Public Partnership LLC f/k/a Actus Lend Lease LLC, Respondent,
v.
Allsouth Electrical Contractors, Inc., Appellant.
|
2012-212882 |
Randy Bryant, Petitioner,
v.
State of South Carolina, Respondent.
|
2013-002017 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Thomas Raynes Marett, Appellant.
|
2013-002119 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
David Boyd, Appellant.
|
2013-000921 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Jeffrey Glenn McCoy, Appellant.
|
2013-002328 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Timothy R. Wirtz, Appellant.
|
2013-002436 |
Student #1 John Doe, Redacted Name of Student, Redacted Name of Mother of Student #1 John Doe, Appellants,
v.
Board of Trustees, Richland School District Two, Richland School District Two Superintendent, Dr. Katie Brochu, in her official capacity as School Superintendent, Respondents.
|
2013-002749 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Dyeshawn Foster, Appellant.
|
2013-000965 |
SCBT, NA, Respondent,
v.
Shelton Hoffman a/k/a Shelton L. Hoffman; South Carolina Department of Revenue; Baird Transport, Inc., Defendants,
Of whom Shelton Hoffman a/k/a Shelton L. Hoffman is the Appellant.
|
2014-000145 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Courtney Michelle Woodard, Appellant.
|
2012-206672 |
Vante R. Birch, Petitioner,
v.
State of South Carolina, Respondent.
|
2014-000588 |
The State, Respondent,
v.
Thomas Lockridge, Appellant.
|
2014-000930 |
Denica Powell, Appellant,
v.
Petsmart, Inc., and Phoenix Insurance Co., Respondents.
|
2012-212327 |
Felecia Dicks Wilson, Appellant,
v.
Cedar Fair Entertainment Company, Cedar Fair, LP d/b/a Carowinds Amusement Park, Respondents.
|