PREV | June 2005 | NEXT |
The summary below each case is prepared to offer lawyers and the public a general overview of what issues are included in a case which will be argued. The summary is not a limit on what issues a party to a case may present at oral argument.
Tuesday, June 7, 2005 | |
Courtroom I
(Court convenes at 10:15
a.m.)
|
|
10:15 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5 ) |
13489 Blind Tiger, LLC, Appellant v. City of Charleston, Respondent. James Lee Bell, of Charleston, for Appellant. Timothy A. Domin, and Charlton Desaussure, Jr., of Charleston, for Respondent. Blind Tiger, a restaurant in Charleston, appeals from the Board of Architectural Review's denial of its request to place a film on its restaurant windows. Blind Tiger argues (1) the circuit court erred in finding its appeal was untimely and (2) the Board of Architectural Review did not have jurisdiction to render a decision because the film was placed on the interior of the restaurant's windows.
|
|
11:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 15 - 15 - 5 ) |
13396 Joseph Mark Clark, Sr., Respondent v. Aiken County Government & South Carolina Property and Casualty Insurance Guaranty Association, formerly Legion Insurance Company, Appellants. Mark D. Cauthen and R. Daniel Addison, of Columbia, and Michael A. Farry and David A. Wilson, of Greenville, for Appellants. Franklin D. Beattie, Jr., of Georgetown, for Respondent. In this workers' compensation appeal, the employer challenges the Workers' Compensation Commission's finding that the employee sustained a change of condition for the worse that left him permanently and totally disabled.
|
|
2:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
13537 Mary S. Turbeville, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Edwin D. Turbeville, Sr., Appellant v. Thomas G. Wilson and Robert E. Turner, III, Respondents. Marvin P. Jackson, of Florence, for Appellant. Marian Williams Scalise, of Myrtle Beach, and Andrew F. Lindemann, of Columbia, for Respondents. In this medical malpractice case, the personal representative of Turbeville's estate appeals the trial court order granting summary judgment in favor of the treating physicians.
|
|
Tuesday, June 21, 2005 | |
Courtroom I
(Court convenes at 11:30
a.m.)
|
|
11:30 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
13447 South Carolina Department of Social Services, Respondent v. Bisa Noni Wilburn and Bruce Randall Miller, Defendants, of whom Bruce Randall Miller is the Appellant. Chace Damon Campbell, of Greenville, for Appellant. Vanessa Lynn Hartman, of Greenville, for Respondent. Russell Paul Reach, of Greenville, for guardian ad litem. The father appeals the family court's order terminating his parental rights on the ground of failure to support arguing his failure to support was not willful, as he earns no income while in prison.
|
|
2:15 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
13328 Tracey Lee Whitworth, Appellant v. Window World, Inc., and Insurance Corporation of New York, Respondents. Stephen B. Samuels, of Lexington, for Appellant. Edward P. Martin, Jr., of Columbia, for Respondents. In this workers' compensation action, the single commissioner, full commission, and circuit court all found claimant was not entitled to workers' compensation benefits because his injury occurred while he was on his way to work. Claimant appeals, arguing that our court should adopt the "required vehicle" exception to the "going and coming rule," or in the alternative, that the circumstances of his injury qualify for already recognized exceptions to the rule.
|
Tuesday, June 7, 2005 | |
Courtroom II
(Court convenes at 9:30
a.m.)
|
|
9:30 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
13568 Department of Social Services, Respondent v. Sheila Phillips, Ray Berry, and the minor children under the age of eighteen (18): Shonna Nichole Phillips, born 01/20/1987, Mick Cherokee Dayne Phillips, born 09/22/1995, and Brea Marie Phillips, born 07/15/1998, Defendants, Of whom Sheila Phillips is the Appellant. Ruth L. Cate and David M. Collins, Jr., of Spartanburg, for Appellant. Kenneth Philip Shabel, of Spartanburg, for Respondent Department of Social Services. Michael Todd Thigpen, of Spartanburg, for Guardian ad Litem.
|
|
10:15 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
12393 Michael P. Horger and Stanley V. Kiser, Appellants, In Re: Road Closing of whom Orangeburg County Fire Commission, Orangeburg Consolidated School District Three, Doug Shuler, Sr., and Catherine J. Breaker are, Respondents. Virgin Johnson, Jr., of Orangeburg, and Robert J. Thomas, of Columbia, for Appellants. D'Anne Haydel, of Orangeburg, for Respondent Orangeburg County Fire Commission. David S. Doty and Andrea E. White, of Columbia, for Respondent Orangeburg Consolidated School District Three. John G. Felder and Bates N. Felder, of St. Matthews, for Respondents Doug Shuler, Sr. and Catherine J. Breaker.
|
|
11:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
13535 Kevin Reid and Rebecca Reid, Respondents v. Maytag Corporation and Lynch Appliance Center, Inc., Defendants, of whom Maytag Corporation is the Appellant. William S. Brown and Elizabeth M. McMillan, of Greenville, for Appellant. Perry D. Boulier and William B. Darwin, Jr., of Spartanburg, for Respondents.
|
|
11:45 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
13518 The State, Respondent v. William Max Nicholson, Appellant. Larry C. Brandt, of Walhalla, for Appellant. Attorney General Henry Dargan McMaster, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, and Assistant Attorney General W. Rutledge Martin, of Columbia, and Solicitor Christina T. Adams, of Anderson, for Respondent.
|
Wednesday, June 15, 2005 | |
Horry County Government and Judicial Center
(Court convenes at 2:00
p.m.)
| |
2:00 p.m. Courtroom 3A | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
13179 Thomas Henry Stinecipher and Hipolita Viego Stinecipher, Appellants v. Thomas Ray Ballington and Christopher Austin Ballington, a minor under the age of ten (10) years, Respondents. Thomas M. Neal, III, of Columbia, and M. Gwyn DuBose-Schmitt, of Lexington, for Appellants. George W. Branstiter, of Lexington, for Guardian Ad Litem. James B. Richardson, Jr., of Columbia, for Respondents.
|
|
2:00 p.m. Courtroom 3B | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
13592 Stephen G. Ballentine, Appellant v. Norma M. Ballentine, Respondent. John Joseph Dodds, III, of Mt. Pleasant, for Appellant. H. Stanley Feldman and Donald Bruce Clark, of Charleston, for Respondent.
|
|
2:45 p.m. Courtroom 3B | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
13424 The State, Respondent v. Deral L. Stanley, Appellant. J. M. Long, III, of Conway, for Appellant. Attorney General Henry Dargan McMaster, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, and Assistant Attorney General Norman Mark Rapoport, of Columbia, and Solicitor John Gregory Hembree, of Conway, for Respondent.
|
|
2:45 p.m. Courtroom 3A | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
13440 Jenny C. Mishoe, Respondent v. QHG of Lake City, Inc., Appellant. Charles E. Carpenter, Jr. and S. Elizabeth Brosnan, of Columbia, and Douglas C. Baxter, of Myrtle Beach, for Appellant. W. E. Jenkinson, III, and Ronnie Alan Sabb, of Kingstree, for Respondent.
|
|
3:30 p.m. Courtroom 3B | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
13451 University of Southern California, Appellant v. Robert J. Moran, Jr., Personal Representative of the Estate of Alexia Lee Anderson, and Trustee of the Anderson Revocable Trust of 1990, dated the 15th day of September, 1991, Louis A. Chubiz and Michael J. Chubiz, Respondents. In Re: Louis A. Chubiz and Michael J. Chubiz, Petitioners, v. Robert J. Moran, Jr., Personal Representative of the Estate of Alexia Lee Anderson, and Trustee of the Anderson Revocable Trust of 1990, dated the 15th day of September, 1991, Respondent. Robert M. Kunes, of Charleston, for Appellant. Ronald Stewart Gaynor, of Pawleys Island, for Respondent Robert L. Moran, Jr. James B. Drennan, III, of Spartanburg, for Respondents Louis A. Chubiz and Michael J. Chubiz
|
|
3:30 p.m. Courtroom 3A | (Time Limits: 10-10-5 ) |
13604 Theresa Russell, Respondent v. Christopher Aumick, Appellant. Ronald R. Norton, of Conway, for Appellant. Kevin Michael Hughes, of North Myrtle Beach, for Respondent. Frederick L. Harris, of Myrtle Beach, Guardian Ad Litem.
|
|
4:15 p.m. Courtroom 3B | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
13563 Ernest Miller and Patricia Miller, Appellants v. Blumenthal Mills, Inc., Respondent. Chalmers Carey Johnson, of Charleston, for Appellants. Michael S. Thwaites, of Greer, for Respondent.
|
|
Thursday, June 16, 2005 | |
Horry County Government and Judicial Center
(Court convenes at 9:30
a.m.)
| |
9:30 a.m. Courtroom 3B | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
13483 Collins Music Co., Inc., Respondent v. IGT a/k/a IGT- North America, Appellant. Ronald E. Boston, of Columbia, and R. Wayne Byrd, Wilson S. Sheldon, and R. Heath Atkinson, of Florence, for Appellant. James R. Gilreath, of Greenville, James B. Van Osdell, Charles B. Jordan, Jr., and Cynthia Graham Howe, of Myrtle Beach, and Scott M. Mongillo, of Summerville, for Respondent.
|
|
10:15 a.m. Courtroom 3A | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
13485 Hope Hix Stillinger, Appellant-Respondent v. Tommy Mayfield Stillinger, Respondent-Appellant. J. Michael Taylor, of Columbia, for Appellant-Respondent. Charles H. Williams, of Orangeburg, and Gregory Samuel Forman, of Charleston, for Respondent-Appellant.
|
|
10:15 a.m. Courtroom 3B | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
13633 Primerica Life Insurance Company, Respondent v. Ray K. Ingram, Sr., Appellant. Michael M. Jordan, of Sumter, for Appellant. Robert H. Hood, Mary Agnes Hood Craig, D. Nathan Hughey, and Deborah H. Sheffield, of Charleston, for Respondent.
|
|
11:00 a.m. Courtroom 3A | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
13632 Gladys R. Myers, Appellant v. Joe O. Myers, Respondent. Cheryl Turner Hopkins, of Florence, for Appellant. John M. Ervin, III, of Darlington, and Stephanie P. McDonald, of Charleston, for Respondent.
|
|
Friday, June 17, 2005 | |
Horry County Government and Judicial Center
(Court convenes at 9:30
a.m.)
| |
9:30 a.m. Courtroom 3B | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
13603 Seabrook Island Property Owners' Association, Respondent v. Joseph A. Berger, Appellant. Paul A. James, of Mt. Pleasant, for Appellant. David B. Wheeler and Edward T. Fenno, of Charleston, for Respondent.
|
|
9:30 a.m. Courtroom 3A | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
13488 Dawn Brewer, Appellant v. Myrtle Beach Farms Company, Inc. d/b/a Myrtle Beach Pavilion and S&S Power, Inc. f/k/a Arrow Dynamics, Inc., Defendants, Of Whom Myrtle Beach Farms Company, Inc. d/b/a Myrtle Beach Pavilion is the Respondent. Sean K. Trundy, of North Charleston, and Thomas Hayden Hesse, of Summerville, for Appellant. Douglas M. Zayicek, of Myrtle Beach, for Respondent.
|
|
10:15 a.m. Courtroom 3A | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
13506 Russell B. Corbin, Respondent v. Bernard Thomas Carlin, Jr., and James E. Peterson, Defendants, Of Whom Bernard Thomas Carlin, Jr. is the Appellant. Mark H. Lund, III, of Bluffton, for Appellant. John J. Kerr, of Charleston, for Respondent.
|
|
10:15 a.m. Courtroom 3B | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
13452 Ashley Long Brunson, Respondent, v. Connie Long and S.C. Farm Bureau Insurance Companies d/b/a S.C. Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, Defendants, Of Whom Connie Long is a Respondent and S.C. Farm Bureau Insurance Companies d/b/a S.C. Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company is the Appellant. Louis David Nettles, of Florence, for Appellant. Timothy Matthew Ammons, of Dillon, for Respondent Ashley Long Brunson. Connie Long, of Latta, pro se.
|
|
11:00 a.m. Courtroom 3B | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
13461 Jennifer Gray Williams, Respondent v. Samuel Young Williams, Appellant. Toni Lee Tack Pennington, of Pawleys Island, for Appellant. Alice D. Potter, of Columbia, for Respondent. Louis Morant, of Georgetown, for Guardian Ad Litem.
|
|
Cases to be Submitted Without Oral Argument | |
13378 |
The State, Respondent v. Thomas Earl Clark, Appellant.
|
13392 |
The State, Respondent v. Jonathan Ray Filyaw, Appellant.
|
13402 |
Dennis Jenkins Graham, Appellant v. Edwin Steve Warren, II, Respondent.
|
13406 |
Vernon C. Cook, Appellant v. Wilma C. Kay, Respondent.
|
13414 |
The State, Respondent v. Terry Lee Davis, Appellant.
|
13428 |
The State, Respondent v. Phillip Woods, Appellant.
|
13435 |
The State, Respondent v. Kevin Grayson, Appellant.
|
13470 |
The State, Respondent v. James Winstead, Appellant.
|
13471 |
The State of South Carolina, Respondent v. Fulton C. Legette, Appellant.
|
13479 |
Dexter Cumbee, Appellant v. Georgetown County, Respondent.
|
13487 |
In the Matter of the Care and Treatment of John Phillip Corley, Appellant.
|
13490 |
Patricia Frierson, Appellant, v. Stone Ridge Apartments, Cornerstone Realty Income Trust, Defendants, Of whom Cornerstone Reality Income Trust is the Respondent.
|
13495 |
David A. Babb, Appellant v. Bettie Ann Scott, Pam LaHay-Orr, Linda Cancel, Laurens County Arts Council, and Todd Alexander, Defendents, Of Whom Bettie Ann Scott is Respondent.
|
13507 |
Frankie Bales and Sandra Bales, Respondents v. Robert Judelsohn, Appellant.
|
13519 |
The State, Respondent v. Gregory Tucker, Appellant.
|
13520 |
The State, Respondent v. Robert Taft Morris, Jr., Appellant.
|
13521 |
The State, Respondent v. Christopher James Reese, Appellant.
|
13526 |
Alexander and Etta Harris, individually and as parents, guardians, and next friends, of Anita Harris, Appellants v. Palmetto Pediatric Professional, Inc. Beverly Stewart, M.D. and Does A-Z, Respondents.
|
13527 |
First Sun Outplacement and Personnel Consultants, Inc., Plaintiffs, v. Debbie Williams and Jim Kirk, Defendants, Of whom First Sun Outplacement is the Appellant And Debbie Williams is the Respondent.
|
13528 |
Carolina First Bank, as Successor to Rock Hill Bank and Trust, Respondent v. I.G.W.T. Limousine, Inc. and Fundador Roman and Mary Susan Roman, Appellants.
|
13529 |
Cavalier Pools & Spas, Inc., Respondent v. The Fripp Company, Inc., Appellant.
|
13530 |
Hope Hollingsworth, individually and as natural parent and guardian for Heather Nicole Hollingsworth, Appellant v. Carolyn Mildred Wehman, Respondent.
|
13538 |
South Carolina Department of Social Services, Appellant v. Nathaniel Roberts, Respondent.
|
13543 |
The State, Respondent v. Doryan Jerriel Green, Appellant.
|
13544 |
The State, Respondent v. Jermaine Jordan, Appellant.
|
13549 |
The State, Respondent v. Nyikrenda Keith, Appellant.
|
13550 |
The State, Respondent v. Adrian Johnson, Appellant.
|
13551 |
The State, Respondent v. Derrick A. Mack, Appellant.
|
13552 |
The State, Respondent v. Donald Lee Robinson, Appellant.
|
13553 |
The State of South Carolina, Respondent v. Iceen Jamel Porcher, Appellant.
|
13555 |
The State, Respondent v. Vernard Jerome Mathis, Appellant.
|
13556 |
The State, Respondent v. Vincent Scott Noel, Appellant.
|
13557 |
The State, Respondent v. Julius Anthony Wilson, Appellant.
|
13558 |
The State, Respondent v. Willard Gasper, Appellant.
|
13560 |
The State, Respondent v. Herman Geathers, Appellant.
|
13561 |
The State, Respondent v. James Michael Hill, Appellant.
|
13562 |
Randy Johnson, Appellant v. State of South Carolina, Respondent.
|
13569 |
Robertha Harrison, Respondent v. Eddie L. Harrison, Sr., Appellant.
|
13570 |
Wanda Stanley, Appellant v. City of Columbia Animal Control Department a/k/a City of Columbia, Respondent.
|
13571 |
Michael L. Schneider, Appellant v. Teresa L. Cook Valentine f/k/a Teresa L. Cook-Schneider, Respondent.
|
13576 |
In the Matter of the Care and Treatment of Timothy Farmer, Appellant.
|
13578 |
Zepsa Construction, Inc., Appellant v. Phillip A. Randazzo and Virginia M. Randazzo, Respondents.
|
13579 |
The State, Respondent v. Charles Shannon Jordan, Appellant.
|
13580 |
The State, Respondent v. Quincey Chandler, Appellant.
|
13582 |
The State, Respondent v. Jimmivius Leatrone Jones, Appellant.
|
13595 |
Ray Ward, Appellant v. The Clarendon County Planning and Public Service Commission, Respondents.
|
13601 |
Keith D. Thomas, Claimant v. Bulldog Hiway Express, and TTC of Illinois, Inc, Respondents, and South Carolina Uninsured Employer's Fund, Appellant.
|
13605 |
The State, Respondent v. Misti Ann Haley, Appellant.
|
13606 |
The State, Respondent v. Lionel M. Cheatham, Appellant.
|
13607 |
The State, Respondent v. Darren Christopher Fowler, Appellant.
|
13609 |
The State, Respondent v. Donald Earl Eaddy, II, Appellant.
|
13611 |
The State, Respondent v. Keonakamerah Postell, Appellant.
|
13612 |
Englert, Inc., Respondent v. LeafGuard USA, Inc., Appellant.
|
13619 |
The State, Respondent v. Maurice Tyrone Porter, Appellant.
|
13621 |
The State, Respondent v. Nathan Demetrious Smith, Appellant.
|
13631 |
Robert Widdicombe, Respondent v. Rachel P. Tucker-Cales f/k/a DuPree, Appellant.
|