PREV | October 2011 | NEXT |
The summary below each case is prepared to offer lawyers and the public a general overview of what issues are included in a case which will be argued. The summary is not a limit on what issues a party to a case may present at oral argument.
Monday, October 3, 2011 | |
Room 108
(Court convenes at 10:00
a.m.)
| |
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18572 Karen Elisabeth Fekete, Respondent, v. Richard Fekete, Appellant. James Wilson Tucker, Jr., of Rock Hill, for Appellant. Christina Brice Thompson, of Fort Mill, for Respondent.
|
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18517 The State, Respondent, v. Jomar Antavis Robinson, Appellant. Appellate Defender Elizabeth Franklin-Best, of South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, and Senior Attorney General Harold M. Coombs, of Office of the Attorney General, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18256 Cookie Tracey Medlock, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent. Appellate Defender M. Celia Robinson, of South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense, of Columbia, for Petitioner. Attorney General Alan Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, and Assistant Attorney General Christina J. Catoe, of Office of the Attorney General, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
12:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18535 Glenda Wilder, Respondent, v. Blue Ribbon Taxicab Corp. and Freddie Pryor, Jointly, Severally, or in the Alternative, Defendants, Of Whom Blue Ribbon Taxicab Corp. is the Appellant. James Mixon Griffin, of Columbia, for Appellant.Robert Daniel Dodson and J. Carlisle Oxner, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
2:20 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18174 Ralph Duane King, Jr., Appellant, v. International Knife and Saw - Florence, Employer, and Peerless Insurance Company c/o Montgomery Insurance, Respondents. Stuart Wesley Snow, of Florence, for Appellant. Weston Adams, III, and Helen F. Hiser, both of Columbia, for Respondents.
|
|
3:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18636 Sheila M. Robison, Respondent/Appellant, v. David McGill Robison, III, Appellant/Respondent. J. Falkner Wilkes, of Greenville, for Appellant-Respondent. Charles M. Black, Jr., Matthew E. Steinmetz, Max N. Picklesimer, and Carrie A. Warner, of Columbia, for Respondent-Appellant. Debra L. Walsh, of Greenville, for Guardian Ad Litem.
|
|
Tuesday, October 4, 2011 | |
Room 108
(Court convenes at 10:00
a.m.)
| |
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18260 Thomas Chad Heaton, Respondent, v. State of South Carolina, Petitioner. Attorney General Alan Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, and Assistant Attorney General Kaelon E. May, of Office of the Attorney General, of Columbia, for Petitioner. Ricky Keith Harris, of Spartanburg, for Respondent.
|
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18641 Latane S. Sanders, Appellant/ Respondent, v. Roy Sanders, Respondent/ Appellant. Joseph M. Ramseur Jr., of Greenville, for Appellant-Respondent. Kimberly F. Dunham, of Greenville, for Respondent-Appellant.
|
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18637 Nanette Middleton, Appellant, v. Christopher Mitchell, Respondent. Brian Robert Murphy, of Fort Mill, for Appellant. Diane Piazza DeWitt, of Beaufort, for Respondent.
|
|
12:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18620 The State, Respondent, v. Robert T. Carroll, Appellant. William Norman Epps III, of Anderson, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, and Senior Assistant Attorney General Harold M. Coombs, Jr., of Office of the Attorney General, of Columbia, and Solicitor Jerry W. Peace, of Greenwood, for Respondent.
|
|
Wednesday, October 5, 2011 | |
Room 108
(Court convenes at 10:00
a.m.)
| |
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18642 Baron L. McCaskill, III, and Blane O. Ruschak, Respondents, v. Leslie Roth, Southern Croth I, LLC, CBC Wood Products, Inc., Builders Source Direct, LLC, The Due South Development Group, Inc., Due South Development, Inc., Gale Contractor Services, S&T Roofing, LLC, Anything Electric, T&C Construction, LLC, Johnston Roofing, Absolute Home Services, LLC, H.L. Middleton Masonry, McGee Brothers, Inc., Sanchez Brothers Painting, Inc., Paver Creations, LLC, Conditioned Air, Agapito Hernandez, and Charleston Marble and Granite, LLC, Defendants, Of Whom Leslie Roth is the Appellant. Leslie Roth, of Woodbury, NY, for Appellant pro se. Ariail Bright, of Charleston, for Respondents.
|
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18709 Patricia D. Johnson, Employee, Appellant, v. BMW Manufacturing Corporation, LLC, Employeer, Respondent, and Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest and Specialty Risk Services, Inc., Carrier, Respondents. Albert V. Smith, of Spartanburg, for Appellant. Vernon F. Dunbar, of Greenville, for Respondents.
|
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18402 Henry Dinkins, Appellant, v. Lowe's Home Centers, Inc. - Sumter, SC and Specialty Risk Services, LLC, Respondents. Stephen Benjamin Samuels, of Columbia, for Appellant. Weston Adams, III, Helen F. Hiser, C. Edward Rawl, Jr., and M. McMullen Taylor, of Columbia, for Respondents.
|
|
12:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18188 Mark S. Kinsey, Respondent, v. Leecia B. Kinsey, Appellant. Thomas M. Neal, III, and Yulee E. Harrelson, of Columbia, for Appellant. C. Vance Stricklin, Jr., of West Columbia, and Katherine Carruth Goode, of Winnsboro, for Respondent.
|
|
Thursday, October 6, 2011 | |
Room 108
(Court convenes at 10:00
a.m.)
| |
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18550 Issac Wright, Respondent, v. Stevie Cartledge, Appellant. Michael C. Tanner, of Bamberg, for Appellant. James D. Mosteller, III, of Barnwell, for Respondent.
|
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18448 In The Interest of Jamal G., A Juvenile Under the Age of Seventeen, Appellant. Appellate Defender Robert M. Dudek, of South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Donald Zelenka, and Assistant Attorney General Alphonso Simon, Jr., of Office of the Attorney General, of Columbia, and Solicitor Scarlett Anne Wilson, of Charleston, for Respondent.
|
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18711 Patricia Carson Lewin, Respondent, v. Albert Read Lewin, Appellant. Gregory Samuel Forman, of Charleston, for Appellant. Susan Lynn Brach, of Hilton Head Island, and Blake A. Hewitt and John Nichols, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
12:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18599 Cheryl DiMarco, Respondent, v. Brian A. DiMarco, Appellant. J. Falkner Wilkes and Nathalie M. Morgan, of Greenville, for Appellant. Kim R. Varner, of Greenville, for Respondent.
|
|
Tuesday, October 18, 2011 | |
Room 108
(Court convenes at 10:00
a.m.)
| |
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18598 Arrow Bonding Company, Respondent, v. Jay Edward Warren, Appellant. Tara Dawn Shurling, of Columbia, for Appellant. G. Murrell Smith, Jr., of Sumter, for Respondent.
|
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18593 Sidney A. Brantley, Respondent, v. Nina Gaskin, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Harold Gaskin, Appellant. Thaddeus James Doughty, of North Charleston, for Appellant. R. Patrick Flynn, of Charleston, for Respondent.
|
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18622 The State, Respondent, v. Richard Kough, Appellant. Appellate Defender Lanelle Cantey Durant and Appellate Defender Breen R. Stevens, of South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Sally W. Elliott, and Assistant Attorney General Mark Farthing, of Office of the Attorney General, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
12:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18710 Ricky H. Foshee and Kyle W. Daniel, Appellants, v. Ginn-LA West End, Limited-Corp; Ginn LA West End. LTD., LLP; Ginn Financial Services. LLC; and Bahamas Sales Associate, LLC, Respondents. Gene McCain Connell, Jr., of Surfside Beach, for Appellants. John C. Moylan, III, Matthew T. Richardson, Alice W. W. Parham, of Columbia, and Jefferey K. Douglas, Richard P. Alpert, and John MacNaughton, of Atlanta, Georgia, for Respondents.
|
|
Wednesday, October 19, 2011 | |
Room 108
(Court convenes at 10:00
a.m.)
| |
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18513 The State, Respondent, v. Phillip Miller, Appellant. Appellate Defender Lanelle Durant, of South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, and Assistant Attorney General William Blitch, Jr., of Office of the Attorney General, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18255 Marcus Martin, Respondent, v. State of South Carolina, Petitioner. Attorney General Alan Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, and Assistant Attorney General Kaelon E. May, of Office of the Attorney General, of Columbia, for Petitioner. Deputy Chief Appellate Defender Wanda H. Carter, of South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18261 Robert Anthony James, Petitioner v. State of South Carolina, Respondent. Appellate Defender Elizabeth Franklin-Best, of South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense, of Columbia, for Petitioner. Attorney General Alan Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, and Assistant Attorney General Brian T. Petrano, of Office of the Attorney General, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
12:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18634 Sign N Ryde, LLC, Appellant, v. Preferred Automotive Group. LLC, and Larry King Chevrolet, LLC, Defendants, Of whom Larry King Chevrolet, LLC is the Respondent. William S.F. Freeman, of Greenville, for Appellant. Robert Lawrence Reibold, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
Thursday, October 20, 2011 | |
Room 108
(Court convenes at 9:45
a.m.)
| |
9:45 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18567 Norman M. McLean, James N. McLean, Marie McLean-Choi, Wiliam N. McLean, Robert L. McLean, and JL McLean Properties, LLC, Appellants, v. James B. Drennan, III, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elizabeth McLean Pence, James E. Brogdon, Sr. as Trustee of the Trust Agreement of Elizabeth McLean Pence dated May 28, 1999, Wachovia Bank National Association, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Elizabeth P. Pence, Wachovia Bank National Association, as Trustee of the Elizabeth P. Pence Trust, Marlboro Academy, Inc., Charles P. Thompson, Jr., Cheri (Cheryl) Brown Thompson, Money to Go, LLC, James J. Pence, Jr., as Personal Representative of the Estate of Stephen Pence, and Harry R. Easterling, Jr., Respondents. David Alexander, of Greenville, for Appellants. Matthew H. Henrikson, of Greenville, for Respondent James B. Drennan, III. Edward Bilbro Davis, of Charlotte, North Carolina, for Respondent Wachovia Bank, NA. J. Rene Josey and Jeffrey L. Payne, of Florence, for Respondent James E. Brogdon, Sr. John J. James, II, of Darlington, for Respondent Marlboro Academy, Inc. W. Cliff Moore, III, and Jenkins M. Mann, of Columbia, for Respondents Charles P. Thompson, Jr. and Cheri (Cheryl) B. Thompson. James Randall Davis, of Lexington, for Respondent Money to Go, LLC. Harry R. Easterling, Sr., of Bennettsville, for Respondents James J. Pence, Jr., and Harry R. Easterling, Jr.
|
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18146 Anthony J. Clark, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent. Appellate Defender Robert M. Pachak, of South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense, of Columbia, for Petitioner. Attorney General Alan Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, and Assistant Attorney General Brian T. Petrano, of Office of the Attorney General, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18356 Michael Jermaine Goins, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent. Deputy Chief Appellate Defender Wanda H. Carter, of South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense, of Columbia, for Petitioner. attorney General Alan Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, and Assistant Attorney General Karen C. Ratigan, of Office of the Attorney General, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
12:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18264 Marlon Jermaine Smith, Petitioner, v. State of South Carolina, Respondent. Appellate Defender M. Celia Robinson and Appellate Defender Breen Stevens, of South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense, of Columbia, for Petitioner. Attorney General Alan Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, and Assistant Attorney General Christina J. Catoe, of Office of the Attorney General, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
Tuesday, October 4, 2011 | |
Room 110
(Court convenes at 10:00
a.m.)
| |
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18735 B. Wells O'Brien and Carol G. O'Brien, individually and as Trustees of the O'Brien Family Trust, Respondents, v. Kalen J. Bowman, Blue Ridge Custom Builders, Inc., and CWK, LLC, Defendants, of whom Kalen J. Bowman is the Appellant. J. Falkner Wilkes, of Greenville, for Appellant. T. S. Stern, Jr., of Greenville, and V. Elizabeth Wright, of Greenville, for Respondents.
|
|
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18643 Peggy Ann Mullarkey, Respondent, v. David D. Mullarkey, Appellant. Peggy M. Infinger and Thomas R. Goldstein, of Charleston, for Appellant. Katherine Elizabeth Graham, of Beaufort, for Respondent.
|
|
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18630 The State, Respondent, v. Arthur Rivers, Appellant. Tara Dawn Shurling, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Alan Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, and Assistant Attorney General David Spencer, of Office of the Attorney General, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
12:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18545 James Emmett Sessions and Lousie Green Sessions, Respondents, v. Stephen Michael Platt, Appellant. Paul B. Ferrara, III, of North Charleston, and George J. Morris, of Charleston, for Appellant. Leonard R. Jordan, Jr., of Columbia, for Respondents.
|
|
Wednesday, October 5, 2011 | |
Room 110
(Court convenes at 10:00
a.m.)
| |
10:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18600 Matthew Campbell, Appellant/Respondent, v. Ashley Robinson, Respondent/Appellant. David Alexander, of Greenville, for Appellant/Respondent. Kenneth C. Porterfield, of Greenville, for Respondent/Appellant.
|
|
Wednesday, October 5, 2011 | |
Room 110
(Court convenes at 10:40
a.m.)
| |
10:40 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18357 Kareen Donyell Lee, Petitioner, v. The State, Respondent. Assistant Appellate Defender Kathrine H. Hudgins, of South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense, of Columbia, for Petitioner. Attorney General Alan Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, and Assistant Attorney General Karen Ratigan, of Office of Attorney General, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
Wednesday, October 5, 2011 | |
Room 110
(Court convenes at 11:20
a.m.)
| |
11:20 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18355 Joseph Walker, Respondent, v. State of South Carolina, Petitioner. Attorney General Alan Wilson, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, Assistant Attorney General Mary S. Williams, and Staff Attorney Robert D. Corney, of the Office of the Attorney General, of Columbia, for Petitioner. Appellate Defender Kathrine H. Hudgins, of South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
Wednesday, October 5, 2011 | |
Room 110
(Court convenes at 12:00
p.m.)
| |
12:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5) |
18564 Christopher Price, Claimant, v. Peachtree Electrical Services, Inc. and Builders Mutual Insurance Company, Employer/Carrier, Respondents, v. Bob Wire Electric, Inc., Self-insured Employer, through South Carolina Home Builders Association SIF, Appellants. Kirsten Leslie Barr, of Mt. Pleasant, for Appellants. Richard C. Detwiler, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
Cases to be Submitted Without Oral Argument | |
18021 |
Dr. Brad R Johnson, Appellant v. Lewis W Hall, Lewis V. Hall, LW Hall Enterprises, LLC, Cold Air AC Service, Inc., Respondents.
|
18054 |
Brenda R. Babb, Appellant, v. Susan S. Shaw, Cynthia S. Hattersley, and Jay Hattersley, Respondents.
|
18182 |
George Way, Appellant, v. Mary Way, Respondent.
|
18195 |
William Deans, # 204228, Appellant, v. South Carolina Department of Corrections, Respondent.
|
18214 |
The State, Respondent, v. Clarence Culbertson, Appellant.
|
18246 |
The State, Respondent, v. Donniel Woods, Appellant.
|
18268 |
Lisa Martin, Employee, Respondent, v. Michelin North America, Inc., Employer and Arch Insurance Company, Carrier, Appellants.
|
18275 |
Stephen Plough, Appellant, v. South Carolina Department of Corrections, Respondent.
|
18302 |
Charles Edward Deese, Jr., Appellant, v. Stephen Schmutz, Respondent.
|
18319 |
The State, Respondent, v. Johnny Ray Wilkins, Appellant.
|
18329 |
The State, Respondent, v. Mitchell Douglas Watts, Appellant.
|
18362 |
The State, Respondent, v. Eddie Evans, Appellant.
|
18364 |
The State, Respondent, v. Lamont Antwan Delaney, Appellant.
|
18389 |
Travis Self, Appellant, v. South Carolina Department of Corrections, Respondent.
|
18390 |
Tamira S. Smith, Claimant, Respondent, v. GLJ Inc. et al., Employer, and SC Uninsured Employers Fund, Defendants, Of Whom SC Uninsured Employers Fund is the Appellant.
|
18392 |
Brenda R. Babb, Appellant, v. Carey E. Graham, Southbridge Cable Television, LLC, and Cable Plus of Carolina, Inc, Defendants, Of Whom Carey E. Graham is the Respondent.
|
18393 |
Alan Burns, #143218, Appellant, v. South Carolina Department of Corrections, Respondent.
|
18407 |
The State, Respondent, v. Terrell Lynwood McCoy, Appellant.
|
18409 |
The State, Respondent, v. Jaques Jamar Sullivan, Appellant.
|
18410 |
The State, Respondent, v. Norris Hennesey Smith, Appellant.
|
18424 |
Ris'e D. Jackson, Sheena Sophia Jackson, and Joel Barry Jackson, II, Respondents, v. Michael Shawn Thomas, Alex J. Newton, Household Asset Co., Inc., of whom Michael Shawn Thomas and Household Asset Co., Inc. are Appellants.
|
18426 |
Leila Miriam Carroll, Appellant, v. Anderson Brothers Bank, Respondent.
|
18441 |
The State, Appellant, v. Joseph Leon Zoller, Respondent.
|
18443 |
The State, Respondent, v. Billy Jo Shirar, Appellant.
|
18445 |
The State, Respondent, v. Daniel J. Jenkins, Appellant.
|
18466 |
The State, Respondent, v. James P. Austin, Appellant.
|
18470 |
The State, Respondent, v. Norwood Lee Jordan, Appellant.
|
18475 |
The State, Respondent, v. Christopher Lee Deaner, Appellant.
|
18476 |
The State, Respondent, v. Mokeia Hammond, Appellant.
|
18478 |
The State, Respondent, v. Dorlisa T. Breazeal-Young, Appellant.
|
18482 |
The State, Respondent, v. Tyquan Cohen, Appellant.
|
18484 |
The State, Respondent, v. Roy Johnson, Jr., Appellant.
|
18514 |
In The Matter of The Care And Treatment of James Carl Miller, Appellant.
|
18519 |
The State, Respondent, v. Jermel Anthony Robinson, Appellant.
|
18520 |
The State, Respondent, v. Steven Lecroy, Appellant.
|
18527 |
The State, Respondent, v. Teron Hakeen Jackson, Appellant.
|
18538 |
The Estate of Phobe Weinberg, Respondent, v. Robert Laubshire, Appellant.
|
18539 |
Waccamaw Bank, Respondent, v. Myrtle Beach Smokestack Lightning, LLC, Ramsey Company, Inc., Athalia S. Ramsey, Jasper Ramsey, Bhupendra C. Patel, Wayne Faulk, Michael Bert Anderson, South Carolina Department of Revenue, United States of America acting by and through its agency, The Internal Revenue Service, Of whom Bhupendra C. Patel is the Appellant.
|
18582 |
Leila Miriam Carroll, Appellant, v. Travis Oliver Johnson and Alan Travis Johnson d/b/a Sonrise Planters, Respondents.
|
18610 |
The State, Respondent, v. Richard Bill Niles, Jr., Appellant.
|
18615 |
The State, Respondent, v. Alonzo Etheredge, Appellant.
|
18683 |
In The Matter Of The Care And Treatment Of Alton M. Chisolm, Appellant.
|
18694 |
The State, Respondent, v. Norwood Lee Jordan, Appellant.
|
18696 |
The State, Respondent, v. Bryan S. Doll, Appellant.
|
18708 |
Judy M. Joye, Appellant, v. Better Brands, Inc. & Worsley Companies, Defendants, Of Whom Worsley Companies is the Respondent.
|
18734 |
Rene McMasters now known as Rene McMasters Ronaghan, Respondent, v. H. Wayne Charpia a/k/a Howard W. Charpia and Jody E. Charpia, Defendants, Of Whom H. Wayne Chapia, a/k/a Howard W. Charpia, is the Appellant.
|
18761 |
The State, Respondent, v. James Clifford Cunningham, Appellant.
|
18776 |
The State, Respondent, v. Jason Phillips, Appellant.
|
18786 |
The State, Respondent, v. Johnnie W. Walker, Appellant.
|