PREV | November 2004 | NEXT |
The summary below each case is prepared to offer lawyers and the public a general overview of what issues are included in a case which will be argued. The summary is not a limit on what issues a party to a case may present at oral argument.
Tuesday, November 9, 2004 | |
Courtroom I
(Court convenes at 9:30
a.m.)
|
|
9:30 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
12870 The State, Respondent v. Paris McLeod, Appellant. Acting Chief Attorney Joseph L. Savitz, III, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Henry D. McMaster, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Zelenka, Assistant Attorney General S. Creighton Waters, all of Columbia, and Solicitor Cecil Kelley Jackson, of Sumter, for Respondent. The appellant was convicted of murder and sentenced to thirty years imprisonment. The core issue is the efficacy of Rule 613(b), SCRE, and Rule 801(d)(1), SCRE, as applied by the trial judge in refusing to allow extrinsic evidence to impeach a police officer on whether he had an "agreement" with a non-testifying individual.
|
|
10:15 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
12867 The State, Respondent v. John Richard Wood, Appellant. Assistant Appellate Defender Robert M. Dudek, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Henry D. McMaster, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, and Special Assistant Attorney General Amie L. Clifford, all of Columbia, and Solicitor Druanne Dykes White, of Anderson, for Respondent. In this criminal appeal, the court analyzes whether the circuit court judge erred in allowng evidence of an "incident" involving appellant in Greenville County that occurred one to two hours prior to acts for which he was charged in Anderson County.
|
|
11:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
12916 The State, Respondent v. Harley L. Landis, Appellant. Jeffrey Falkner Wilkes, of Greenville, for Appellant. Attorney General Henry D. McMaster, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, Assistant Attorney General Deborah R. J. Shupe, all of Columbia,and Solicitor Robert M. Ariail, of Greenville, for Respondent. In this criminal appeal, the appellant contends the circuit court erred in failing to grant a directed verdict because of a failure of the State to comply with the provisions of S.C. Code Ann. Section 56-5-2953 requiring videotaping from the activation of the blue lights through arrest.
|
|
2:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
12518 Thomas M. Zaleski, Respondent v. Grazina Zaleski, Appellant. David A. Wilson, of Greenville, for Appellant. William G. Rhoden, of Gaffney, for Respondent. The issues in this family court appeal include alimony; the identification, valuation and division of marital property; and attorney's fees.
|
|
2:45 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
12826 The State, Respondent v. Johnny Phillip Sweat, Appellant. Assistant Appellate Defender Aileen P. Clare, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Henry D. McMaster, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, Senior Assistant Deputy Attorney General Norman Mark Rapoport, all of Columbia, and Solicitor Ralph E. Hoisington, of Charleston, for Respondent. In this criminal appeal, the court reviews whether the trial judge erred by allowing the State to introduce evidence that appellant was arrested for criminal domestic violence against his wife in October 2001, when appellant was being tried for breaking into the home where his wife was living and assaulting her and others on December 11, 2001.
|
|
3:30 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
12511 Diane Q. Brown, Appellant v. George C. Brown, Respondent. Thomas M. Neal, III, of Columbia, for Appellant. James C. Cothran, Jr., of Spartanburg, for Respondent. Michael Todd Thigpen, of Spartanburg, Guardian Ad Litem. In this domestic relations case, the court analyzes three issues: (1) custody of children; (2) efficacy of preferences of custody of the minor children; and (3) whether the custody award granted de facto custody to the paternal grandparents.
|
|
Wednesday, November 10, 2004 | |
Courtroom I
(Court convenes at 10:15
a.m.)
|
|
10:15 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
12766 The State, Respondent v. Olin Earl Young, Jr., Appellant. Jack B. Swerling, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Henry D. McMaster, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, Senior Assistant Attorney General Harold M. Coombs, Jr., all of Columbia, and Solicitor Robert M. Ariail, of Greenville, for Respondent. This appeal from two counts of felony driving under the influence involves several evidentiary issues.
|
|
11:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
12828 The State, Respondent v. Thurman O'Neil Smith, Jr., Appellant. Leland Bland Greeley, of Rock Hill, and Edward T. Hinson, Jr., of Charlotte, NC, for Appellant. Attorney General Henry D. McMaster, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, Assistant Attorney General David Spencer, all of Columbia, and Solicitor Thomas E. Pope, of York, for Respondent. Indicted for murder, the appellant was convicted of voluntary manslaughter. The questions presented are whether voluntary manslaughter was a proper verdict option, whether the evidence supports the verdict, and whether the trial court erred in excluding bad act evidence about the victim.
|
|
2:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
12486 John R. Chapman and Cynthia S. Chapman, Respondents v. Upstate RV & Marine, d/b/a Holiday Kamper & Boats-Piedmont and Tracker Marine, Inc., Defendants, Of whom Upstate RV & Marine, d/b/a Holiday Kamper & Boats-Piedmont is, Appellant. Donald E. Rothwell, of Irmo, for Appellant. Robert Scott Dover, of Pickens, for Respondents. The Chapmans brought the underlying action against Upstate R.V. for breach of warranties, breach of contract, and revocation in connection with the sale of a boat. The jury found for the Chapmans. Upstate R.V. appeals the trial judge's denial of its motion for directed verdict and the denial of its various post-trial motions.
|
|
2:45 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
12858 Amber E. Moring, Respondent v. James R. Moring, Appellant. Stephan Victor Futeral, of Mt. Pleasant, for Appellant. Susan Trout Kinard, of Mt. Pleasant, for Respondent. In this domestic litigation, the husband appeals numerous rulings of the family court including issues involving equitable distribution of marital debt, transmutation of property, payment of child care and private school tuition, determination of income, required anger management attendance, transfer of non-marital property, attorney's fees, and denial of a rule to show cause.
|
|
3:30 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
12765 The State, Respondent v. Kenneth E. Sowell, Appellant. Kenneth E. Sowell, of Greenville, pro se. Attorney General Henry D. McMaster, Chief Deputy Attorney General John M. McIntosh, Chief State Grand Jury Sherri A. Lydon, Assistant Attorney General Jennifer D. Evans, all of Columbia, for Respondent. Sowell, an attorney, appeals the circuit court order finding him in criminal contempt for releasing state grand jury information to an investigator.
|
Tuesday, November 16, 2004 | |
Greenville County Courthouse, Courtroom 8
(Court convenes at 9:30
a.m.)
| |
9:30 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
12515 Karen Marie Lowe, Respondent v. Robert Donald Lowe, Appellant. John B. Duggan, of Greer, for Appellant. William James Barnes, of Greenville, for Respondent.
|
|
10:15 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
12667 Phillip J. Donahue, Appellant v. Multimedia, Inc., Multimedia Entertainment, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., and Universal Television Enterprises, Inc., Respondents. Steven E. Farrar, Jack H. Tedards, Jr., and William B. Swent, of Greenville, for Appellant. Donald A. Harper, N. Ward Lambert, and Cynthia Buck Brown, of Greenville, for Respondent, Universal Television Enterprises, Inc.; Robert C. Bernius, of Washington, DC, for Respondent, Gannett Co., Inc.; Moffatt G. McDonald, of Greenville, for Respondents, Multimedia Ent. Inc., Multimedia Inc. & Gannett Co.
|
|
11:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
12439 Dorothy L. Sides and Arthur W. Sides, Appellants v. Greenville Hospital System, Rodgers Builders Inc., and F.T. Williams Co., Inc., Defendants, of whom Rodgers Builders Inc. and F.T. Williams Co., Inc. are Respondents. W. Grady Jordan, of Easley, for Appellants. N. Heyward Clarkson, III, of Greenville, for Respondent Rodgers Builders, Inc.; John P. Riordan, of Greenville, for Respondent F.T. Williams Company, Incorporated.
|
|
2:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
12406 Frances Debra Merritt, Respondent v. George Todd Merritt, Appellant. Jeffrey Falkner Wilkes, of Greenville, for Appellant. James C. Cothran, Jr., of Spartanburg, for Respondent. Joseph K. Maddox, Jr., of Spartanburg, Guardian Ad Litem.
|
|
2:45 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
12953 The State, Respondent v. Karl Wallace, Appellant. Everett P. Godfrey, Jr., of Greenville, for Appellant. Attorney General Henry D. McMaster, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, Senior Assistant Attorney General Harold M. Coombs, Jr., all of Columbia, and Solicitor Robert M. Ariail, of Greenville, for Respondent.
|
|
3:30 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
12614 Marcum Mace, Respondent v. Chevy Chase Bank, Appellant. Rivers S. Stilwell and Peter G. Siachos, of Greenville, for Appellant. Joseph A. Mooneyham, of Greenville, for Respondent.
|
|
Wednesday, November 17, 2004 | |
Greenville County Courthouse, Courtroom 8
(Court convenes at 9:30
a.m.)
| |
9:30 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
12799 The Cliffs at Keowee Community Association, Inc., Respondent v. Roger L. O'Donald, Lynne O'Donald and Cornerstone National Bank, Defendants, of whom Roger L. O'Donald and Lynne O'Donald are Appellants. James C. Alexander, of Pickens, for Appellants. R. Murray Hughes, of Pickens, for Respondent.
|
|
10:15 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
12797 J. Samuel Coakley, individually and as Trustee of a Special Needs Trust for Christian Coakley, Respondent v. Horace Mann Insurance Co., Scott Andrew Mitchell, Christopher N. Mitchell and Claudia Dee Dee Mitchell, Appellants. Phillip E. Reeves and Jennifer D. Eubanks, of Greenville, for Appellants. Benjamin C. Harrison and David H. Tyner, of Spartanburg, for Respondent.
|
|
11:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
12800 William Barry Chisholm, Appellant/Respondent v. Susan Elaine Chisholm, Respondent/Appellant. Timothy E. Madden, of Greenville, for Appellant-Respondent. Kenneth C. Porter and David Alan Wilson, both of Greenville, for Respondent-Appellant.
|
|
11:45 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10-10-5 ) |
12648 Jimmy Mantekas and Pete Mantekas, Respondents v. South Carolina Department of Transportation, Appellant. John Robert Devlin, Jr., of Greenville, and Beacham O. Brooker, Jr., of Columbia, for Appellant. H. W. "Pat" Paschal, Jr., of Greenville, for Respondents.
|
|
Cases to be Submitted Without Oral Argument | |
12442 |
South Carolina Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, Respondent v. Steven P. Moore, Tracey Lee Moore, Becky T. Smith and Barry Smith, Defendants, Of Whom Becky T. Smith and Barry Smith are the Appellants.
|
12490 |
Carolina Marine Handling, Inc.,Plaintiff v. Warren Frank Lasch; Duane Grantham; Jack C. Sprott; Richard Lee Tapp, R. Keith Summey, Douglas McKay, III, Robert N. King, Don J. Hayes; W. Kurt Taylor; Gussie C. Greene; Stephen R. Ayer; Samuel L. Hart; A.C. Mitchum; Charlotte Gillespie; Dorothy K. Williams; Phoebe Miller; F. Browne Gregg; City of North Charleston; Charleston Naval Complex Redevelopment Authority; South Carolina State Budget and Control Board; S.C. State Ports Authority; Charleston Shipbuilders, Inc.; Charleston International Projects, Inc.; Charleston International Ports, LLC, Opportunity Research, Inc., Defendants,and Charleston Shipbuilders, Inc., Third-Party Plaintiff v. Herbert R. "Jock" Stender, Third-Party Defendant, OF WHOM: Charleston Shipbuilders, Inc. is Appellant, and Carolina Marine Handling, Inc. and Herbert R. "Jock" Stender are Respondents.
|
12514 |
BB&T of South Carolina, a/k/a Branch Banking and Trust Company, Appellant v. Lisa Smith Kidwell and William Brian Kidwell, d/b/a Signature Residential Mortgage and John H. Franklin, Defendants, Of Whom John H. Franklin is the Respondent.
|
12519 |
Vernon C. Ballard, Respondent v. Alvin K. Benson, Rey's Jewlers, Henry Taylor d/b/a Taylor Electric, Bobby Mosley, United States of America and Joyce Equipment Company, Defendants, Of Whom Alvin K. Benson is Appellant, and Rey's Jewelers, Henry Taylor d/b/a Taylor Electric, Bobby Mosley, United States of America and Joyce Equipment Company are Respondents.
|
12532 |
Walker Investment Management Trust, Respondent v. Grandsouth Bank, B&B Development, LLC, Blasco Builders, Inc., and Carolina First Bank, Defendants, of whom Carolina First Bank is, Appellant.
|
12576 |
Paul E. Hill and Vera H. Hill, Respondents v. Charles A. Marsh and Carol P. Marsh, Appellants.
|
12618 |
Daniel Miles Stoddard, Appellant v. Selena Joanna Riddle, Respondent.
|
12665 |
Donald C. Bedford, Appellant v. Mercury Finance Company of South Carolina and Travelers Rest Cars-Trucks, LLC, Defendants, Of Whom Mercury Finance Company of South Carolina is the Respondent.
|
12730 |
Vickie F. Myers, Respondent v. Christopher Carlton Cosgrove, Appellant.
|
12750 |
Janice Elaine Garrett, Appellant v. Estate of Jerry Neill Marsh, Respondent.
|
12791 |
The State, Respondent v. Earnest Pressley, Appellant.
|
12798 |
St. Luke's Reformed Episcopal Church, Respondent v. Michael Dayse, individually, and D/B/A Hardy Construction Co., Appellant.
|
12801 |
Robert Knox and Beatrice Knox, Appellants v. Greenville Hospital System, Respondent.
|
12802 |
Benjamin K. Cantrell, Appellant v. SC Department of Public Safety, Respondent.
|
12807 |
Shannon Knox McKinney, Appellant/Respondent v. Larry A. McKinney, Respondent/Appellant.
|
12810 |
The State, Appellant v. Michael B. Cunningham, Respondent.
|
12815 |
The State, Respondent v. James Oscar Douglas, Jr., Appellant.
|
12818 |
The State, Respondent v. Nepolean Thompson, III, Appellant.
|
12824 |
The State, Respondent v. Bruce Franklin Mathis, Appellant.
|
12825 |
The State, Respondent v. Amy R. Workman, Appellant.
|
12833 |
The State, Respondent v. Wanda Kay Pruitt, Appellant.
|
12842 |
Christopher Davis, Appellant v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Respondent.
|
12845 |
The State, Respondent v. Linart Randolph, Appellant.
|
12852 |
The State, Respondent v. John Henry Chancy, Appellant.
|
12857 |
Gloria R. Owenby and John W. Owenby, Appellants v. Kyle F. Kiesau, M.D.; Auburn Woods, III, M.D.; Julian Williams, M.D.; Claude D. Woollen, M.D.; Robert A. Cochran, Jr., M.D.; David C. Hull, M.D.; Cole Blease Graham, III, M.D.; Neil H. Parnes, M.D.; Brian Baghdady, M.D.; Lawrence Warren, Jr., M.D.; Mark Monson, M.D.; Drs. Kiesau, Barrow & Davis, P.A.; Hull, Green, Woods, Cochran & Woollen, LLC; Spartanburg Radiological Associates, P.A.; and the Spartanburg Regional Medical Center, Defendants, of whom Spartanburg Regional Medical Center is, Respondent.
|
12859 |
James M. Wetzel and Shirley G. Wetzel, Appellants v. Woodside Development Limited Partnership, WSC Corp., Woodside Venture, LLC and Richard B. Steele, Defendants, of whom Richard B. Steele is the, Respondent.
|
12861 |
David Kaveh, Respondent v. Parton Land & Timber Company, Inc., and Custom Grading & Construction, Inc., d/b/a Carolina Earth Movers, Defendants, Of Whom Parton Land & Timber Company, Inc., is, Appellant.
|
12862 |
Ashley Villas Homeowners' Association, Inc., Appellant v. Geona Shaw Johnson et al., Respondents.
|
12863 |
The Anchor Bank, as Successor to First Atlantic Bank, Respondent v. Mac Babb, Appellant, and Mac Babb,Third Party Plaintiff, v. Thomas M. Crowley and J. Theron Floyd, Jr., Third Party Defendants.
|
12865 |
Victor L. Blue and Gail V. Blue, Respondents v. Larry Harrelson and Nancy Harrelson d/b/a Angle Construction Company, Appellants.
|
12868 |
The State, Respondent v. Donald Mathis, Appellant.
|
12890 |
Mid-South Management Company Incorporated and William C. Buchheit Trust A, as partners of Spartanburg Beach Cove Associates, a general partnership and a joint venturer of Beach Cove Associates Joint Venture, and Beach Cove Associates Joint Venture, Respondents v. Sherwood Development Corporation, a joint venturer of Beach Cove Associates Joint Venture; Coastal Financial Corporation, Coastal Federal Savings Bank; Coastal Mortgage Bankers and Realty Co., Inc.; John Doe, which represents unidentified shareholders of Sherwood Development Corporation; Michael C. Gerald and James T. Clemmons, Defendants, of whom, Sherwood Development Corporation, a joint venturer of Beach Cove Associates Joint Venture; Coastal Financial Corporation, Coastal Federal Savings Bank; Coastal Mortgage Bankers and Realty Co., Inc., Michael C. Gerald and James T. Clemmons are, Appellants.
|
12894 |
Lyman Campbell, Appellant v. Laura Caligiuri, Respondent.
|
12909 |
The State, Respondent v. George W. Gee, Appellant.
|
12911 |
The State, Respondent v. Thomas Mark Tucker, Appellant.
|
12942 |
Ex Parte: Christine A. Dunagin, Respondent, In Re: BB&T Bankcard Corporation, Appellant, v. Mike Simpson, Jr. and Eula L. Simpson, Defendants.
|
12948 |
Edward R. Flanary, Jr., Appellant v. Carolyn Virginia Flanary, Respondent.
|
13008 |
The State, Respondent v. Timothy Anderson, Appellant.
|
13010 |
The State, Respondent v. James Holmes, Jr., Appellant.
|
13016 |
The State, Respondent v. Charles Ford, Appellant.
|
13021 |
The State, Respondent v. Elvin Wayne Berry, Appellant.
|
13022 |
The State, Respondent v. Sakina Ferebee, Appellant.
|
13023 |
The State, Respondent v. Ronell R. Brown, Appellant.
|
13025 |
The State, Respondent v. Jonathon M. Johnson, Appellant.
|
13026 |
The State, Respondent v. Devin Jamaal Kershaw, Appellant.
|
13027 |
The State, Respondent v. Willie James Cheatham, Appellant.
|
13050 |
The State, Respondent v. Diamond Jack Harley, Appellant.
|
13051 |
The State, Respondent v. Larry Dorsey, Appellant.
|
13052 |
The State, Respondent v. Ronald Garrard, Appellant.
|
13054 |
The State, Respondent v. Kozales John Fulmore, Appellant.
|
13056 |
The State, Respondent v. Rodolfo A. Salinas, Appellant.
|
13057 |
The State, Respondent v. Jeremy Richard Tisdale, Appellant.
|
13060 |
The State, Respondent v. Randy Marchant, Appellant.
|
13061 |
The State, Respondent v. Donald Mack Oxendine, Appellant.
|
13062 |
The State, Respondent v. Antonio L. Perry, Appellant.
|
13063 |
The State, Respondent, v. Markeith Dwayne McQueen, Appellant.
|
13064 |
The State, Respondent v. Jeffery Allen Vaughn, Appellant.
|
13065 |
The State,Respondent v. Sarah Lee Washington, Appellant.
|
13071 |
The State, Respondent v. Arthur Garfield, Appellant.
|
13073 |
The State, Respondent v. Dean M. Johnston, Appellant.
|
13084 |
The State, Respondent v. Daniel Snider, Appellant.
|