PREV | November 2006 | NEXT |
The summary below each case is prepared to offer lawyers and the public a general overview of what issues are included in a case which will be argued. The summary is not a limit on what issues a party to a case may present at oral argument.
Monday, November 6, 2006 | |
Courtroom I
(Court convenes at 2:00
p.m.)
|
|
2:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14532 Law Firm of Paul L. Erickson, P.A., Appellant v. James R. Boykin and Mona S. Boykin, Respondents. Paul L. Erickson, of Asheville, NC, for Appellant. Carolyn R. Hills, of Myrtle Beach, for Respondents. Appellant claims the lower court erred in failing to give full faith and credit to a North Carolina judgment, accepting and entering an order drafted by the respondents' trial counsel, and failing to take judicial notice of additional filings from North Carolina and an affidavit from Paul L. Erickson.
|
|
2:45 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14576 The State, Appellant v. Craig Duval Davis, Respondent. Attorney General Henry Dargan McMaster, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, Assistant Attorney General Deborah R.J. Shupe, of Columbia, and Solicitor John Gregory Hembree, of Conway, for Appellant. John S. Nichols, of Columbia, for Respondent. Questions the propriety of the circuit court suppressing evidence seized pursuant to a search warrant based on an affidavit alleged to contain false information.
|
|
3:30 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14536 Thomas D. Jordan, Respondent v. Kelly Co, Inc., Employer/Appellant & Zenith Insurance Company, Carrier/Appellant. Edwin P. Martin, Jr., of Columbia, for Appellants. James L. Hills, of Myrtle Beach, and David James Canty, of Myrtle Beach, for Respondent. In this workers' compensation action, the appellants claim the circuit court erred in failing to find substantial evidence supported the Commission's finding that the claimant's heart attack was not compensable.
|
|
Tuesday, November 7, 2006 | |
Courtroom I
(Court convenes at 9:30
a.m.)
|
|
9:30 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14465 Marion L. Richardson, Appellant v. Colliers Keenan, Inc., Continental Of South Carolina, Inc. and John Doe, of whom Colliers Keenan, Inc. and Continental of South Carolina, Inc. are Respondents. Donald E. Jonas and William Neal Lacy, of Columbia, for Appellant. Charles E. Carpenter, Jr., Carmen V. Ganjehsani, and W. Cliff Moore, III, all of Columbia, for Respondents. Questions whether an enforceable contract for the sale of a parcel of real estate was entered into or whether a real estate agend violated his duties and prevented the making of the contract.
|
|
10:15 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14506 South Carolina Department of Social Services, Respondent v. David Goodson, Angela Goodson, Defendants, of whom David Goodson is Appellant. IN RE: Timothy Goodson, David Goodson, Jr., Angelica Goodson, Minor children under the age of eighteen. Robert E. Horner, of Columbia, for Appellant. Cherolyn Roselle Allen, of Columbia, for Respondent. Richland County CASA, of Columbia, for Guardian Ad Litem Jack Bonniville. In this child abuse action, the Appellant avers that the Family Court erred in finding that he physically abused his eldest son and posed a substantial risk of abuse to his two younger children. Appellant contends the testimony supports his version of the events and that his actions do not rise to the level of abuse.
|
|
11:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14596 Taylor, Cotton & Ridley, Inc., Respondent v. Okatie Hotel Group, LLC; The Devcon Group, Inc., SunTrust Bank, Savannah, N. A.; Capitol Materials of Savannah, Inc., Pro Slab, Inc. f/k/a OPP, Incorporated; Genco of Simpsonville, Inc., Imperial Marble Corporation; Turner Electrical of South Carolina, Inc., Cassidy of South Carolina, Inc., Cassidy O'Sullivan & Co.; Best Plumbing, Inc. and Malphrus Construction Company, Inc., Defendants, of whom Okatie Hotel Group, LLC is the Appellant. W. Duvall Spruill, of Columbia, for Appellant. Marvin H. Dukes, of Beaufort, and John S. Nichols, of Columbia, for Respondent. In this civil action, the Appellant argues that the Circuit Court erred in its disposition of the Respondent's action to enforce a mechanic's lien. Appellant further contends the Circuit Court erred in awarding attorney's fees and a specific percentage of interest to the Respondent.
|
|
11:45 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14574 Jeannie Stuart, Respondent v. William R. Stuart, Appellant. C. Rauch Wise and Ted Ben Wyndham, both of Greenwood, for Appellant. T. Preston Reid and David Alan Wilson, both of Greenville, for Respondent. In this divorce action, Husband claims the Family Court erred in finding a dental practice to be marital property, failing to give Husband credit for payments made on principal for marital property, awarding Wife attorney's fees, and awarding Wife alimony in the amount of $45,960 per year.
|
|
2:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14592 Annie Lee Jones, individually, and as Personal Representative Applicant for the Estate of Katherine Elaine Jones, deceased, and on behalf of her minor children and heirs Khadijah Jones, Keyia Sanders, Robert Canty and Da-Nayia Sailes, Appellant v. John or Jane Doe (unknown physician), Spartanburg Regional Medical Center, Respondents. Theo W. Mitchell, of Greenville, for Appellant. Perry D. Boulier, of Spartanburg, for Respondents. The plaintiff appeals a grant of summary judgment to the defendants in this medical malpractice case. The principal concerns in this appeal are (1) whether the trial court should have granted the plaintiff's motion for a continuance of the summary judgment hearing, and (2) whether the plaintiff presented sufficient admissible evidence to create a genuine issue of material fact as to whether the defendants deviated from the applicable standard of care.
|
|
Wednesday, November 8, 2006 | |
Courtroom I
(Court convenes at 11:00
a.m.)
|
|
11:00 a.m. En Banc Proceeding | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14667 Dan F. Williamson and Dan F. Williamson and Company, Respondents. v. Alfred C. Middleton, Petitioner. James C. Parham, Jr., Patricia S. Revenhorst, and Wallace K. Lightsey, all of Greenville, for Petitioner Alfred C. Middleton. Desa A. Ballard, of West Columbia, for Respondents Dan F. Williamson and Dan F. Williamson and Company. This is an En Banc review of Opinion Number 4135, filed July 10, 2006. Williamson argues that the circuit court erred in awarding attorney's fees to Middleton, or in the alternative, that the amount of fees awarded was unreasonable.
|
|
Thursday, November 9, 2006 | |
Courtroom I
(Court convenes at 9:30
a.m.)
|
|
9:30 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14564 The State, Appellant v. Kimberly Salters Mayzes and Charles T. Manley III, Respondents. Attorney General Henry Dargan McMaster, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, Senior Assistant Attorney General Harold M. Coombs, Jr., of Columbia, and Solicitor Donald V. Myers, of Lexington, for Appellant. Chief Attorney Joseph L. Savitz, III, of South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense, of Columbia, for Respondents. In this criminal action, the court analyzes whether the police improperly seized the defendants in violation of the Fourth Amendment.
|
|
10:15 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14457 York Printing & Finishing, Inc. and Bonnie Watts, Respondents, v. Springs Industries, Inc., Appellant. Benjamin A. Johnson and Stephen M. Cox, of Rock Hill, for Appellant. James A. Stuckey, Jr., and Christopher L. Murphy, of Charleston, for Respondents. Springs Industries Inc. ("Springs") appeals a jury verdict for York Printing & Finishing, Inc. and Bonnie Watts (collectively "York Printing"). Springs argues the trial court erred in denying its motion for directed verdict and JNOV because (1) Springs owed no duty of care to York Printing and (2) York Printing put forth no evidence demonstrating Springs' negligent misrepresentation proximately caused York Printing's business failure. Springs also argues the trial court erred in denying its unclean hands defense.
|
|
11:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14561 Kay P. Curry, Appellant v. Andrew Manigault d/b/a Manigault Estate Corporation, LLC, Respondent. Mark W. McKnight, of Charleston, for Appellant. Morris A. Ellison, of Charleston, for Respondent. Kay Curry appeals the master's order dismissing her foreclosure action against Andrew Manigault, d/b/a Manigault Estate Corporation, LLC, and denying her unjust enrichment claim. Curry argues the master erred in (1) refusing to admit a copy of a promissory note based on the "best evidence rule"; (2) finding Curry was not entitled to enforce a promissory note because she was not the "owner" of the note under the Uniform Commercial Code; and (3) denying Curry's unjust enrichment claim.
|
Thursday, November 9, 2006 | |
Courtroom II
(Court convenes at 9:30
a.m.)
|
|
9:30 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14548 N. Eugene Graham, Employee/Claimant, Respondent v. Avery Dennison, Employer, and Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Co., Carrier, Appellants. Clarke W. McCants, III, of Aiken, for Appellants. Kathryn Williams, of Greenville, for Respondent.
|
|
10:15 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14560 Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc., Appellant v. J.C. Faw, Appellant, and Denny's Inc., Respondent. Thomas L. Stephenson and Brian T. Price, of Greenville, for Appellants. William B. Darwin, Jr. and Robert M. Barrett, of Spartanburg, for Respondent.
|
|
11:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14423 Samuel W. Rhodes, Jr. and Piedmont Promotions, Inc., Respondent, v. Marion L. Eadon, d/b/a C&B Fabrication, Appellant. Charles E. Carpenter, Jr., Carmen V. Ganjehsani, and Catharine Garbee Griffin, of Columbia, for Appellant. Creighton B. Coleman, of Winnsboro, and Hoover C. Blanton, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
2:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14550 Danny K. Wright, Respondent, v. Ralph C. Craft d/b/a Craft Auto Mart, Inc., Appellant. Timothy G. Quinn, of Columbia, for Appellant. C. Steven Moskos, of Charleston, for Respondent.
|
|
2:45 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14477 Donna Holcombe-Burdette, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles A. Burdette, Appellant v. Bank of America, successor by merger to Farmer's Bank of Simpsonville, and Bertha B. Bozeman, as Co-Trustees of Trust U/W/O Bernie W. Burdette fbo Helen B. Peters, Bertha B. Bozeman, Individually, Robert McPherson Burdette, Alice Diane Kervin, and George Benjamin Peters, Respondents.In Re: Last Will and Testament of Bennie W. Burdette James B. Drennan, III, of Spartanburg, for Appellant. Laurel R. S. Blair, of Greenville, for Respondent Bank of America. R. O'Neil Rabon, of Greenville, for Respondents Robert Burdette, Alice Kervin, and George Peters. Bertha Bozeman, of Lexington, VA, Individually & Co-trustee of trust, pro se.
|
Cases to be Submitted Without Oral Argument | |
14442 |
Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Appellant, v. Michael F. Parrott, Lenise M. Parrott, and Regions Bank, Respondents.
|
14469 |
The State, Respondent, v. Randy W. Joye, Appellant.
|
14473 |
Jack (NMN) Knight, Jr., Appellant, v. Debra Ann McAbee Knight, Respondent. In Re:Debra M. Knight,Plaintiff v. Jack Knight, Jr.,D efendent.
|
14475 |
Linda James and David James, individually and as parent and natural guardian of Meredith James, a minor under the age of 14, Respondents, v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of South Carolina, Appellant.
|
14497 |
Mark A. and Karyn M. Brinkley, Respondents, v. Gregory K. Martin, ASL, Inc., a'k'a All Saints Landing, a Corporation; Wayne Hucks, Danny T. and Deborah Carroll, and Ron Teague, Defendants, Of Whom Gregory K. Martin is the Appellant.
|
14499 |
James Floyd, Appellant, v. State Budget and Control Board, Respondent.
|
14500 |
Delphine Mitchell, Appellant, v. Florence County School District #1, Employer, and South Carolina School Board Insurance Trust, Carrier, Respondents.
|
14516 |
Brian Lancaster, d/b/a Lancaster Construction, Respondent, v. Launeil Sanders, Janneth E. Sanders and Founders Federal Credit Union, Defendants,of whom Launeil Sanders and Janneth E. Sanders are Appellants.
|
14517 |
Hattie O. Gordon, Appellant, v. William R. Tillman and Dan L. Tillman & Sons, Inc., Respondents.
|
14518 |
Henry Claude Dismuke, Jr., Respondent, v. South Carolina Department of Motor Vehicles, Appellant.
|
14519 |
Brendalee Ables, Appellant, v. Michael Gladden, Respondent.
|
14525 |
Khalid A. Muhammad, Respondent, v. Emerald M. Muhammad, Appellant.
|
14529 |
David Rhoad, Appellant, v. The State, Respondent.
|
14534 |
Timothy Murray,Claimant/Respondent, v. Avondale Mills, Employer/Appellant.
|
14535 |
J.H. Seale and Son, Inc., Respondents, v. Rhett Munn, individually, and Rhett Munn d/b/a Carolina Entertainment, Appellant.
|
14549 |
James Herbert Holliday, Appellant, v. Tiffany M. Holliday, Respondent.
|
14563 |
Brenda Jones, Appellant, v. Lake Daley, Respondent.
|
14566 |
The State, Respondent, v. Tony T-juan Sweet, Appellant.
|
14568 |
Gary Lee Willard, Claimant, Appellant, v. ASCO Valve Manufacturing, Employer, and Emerson Electric Company, Carrier, Respondents.
|
14569 |
Suzette Roberts Sladek, Appellant, v. Gerard Robert Sladek, Respondent.
|
14575 |
The State, Respondent, v. John H. Garvin, Appellant.
|
14579 |
The State, Respondent, v. Derek J. Brown, Appellant.
|
14580 |
The State, Respondent, v. Corey McKenzie Shelton, Appellant.
|
14582 |
The State, Respondent, v. James Pondesta White, Appellant.
|
14583 |
The State, Respondent, v. Scottie Robinson, Appellant.
|
14644 |
South Carolina Department of Social Services, Respondent, v. Valerie Vanessa Mathis Bell, Ronald Bell,and Hector Manuel Lopez, Jr. 02/27/91, Veronica Lee Bell 02/01/95, Defendants, of whom Valerie Vanessa Mathis Bell is Appellant.
|
14645 |
South Carolina Department of Social Services, Respondent, v. Melissa Dull and Henry Turner,and Christian Michael Turner, DOB: 10/30/92, James Henry Turner, DOB: 11/26/96, Defendants, of whom Melissa Dull is Appellant.
|