PREV | December 2006 | NEXT |
The summary below each case is prepared to offer lawyers and the public a general overview of what issues are included in a case which will be argued. The summary is not a limit on what issues a party to a case may present at oral argument.
Monday, December 4, 2006 | |
Courtroom I
(Court convenes at 2:00
p.m.)
|
|
2:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14555 Stephen Anvar, M.D., Appellant, v. Greenville Hospital System, John R. Sanders, M.D., John Rowell, M.D., Tim Sullivan, M.D., Robin Kelley, M.D., and Fleming Mattox, M.D., Respondents. L. Henry McKellar, Christian Stegmaier, and Suzanne C. Boulware, of Columbia, for Appellant. Sally M. Purnell and Matthew P. Utecht, of Greenville, for Respondents. Appellant Stephen Anvar, M.D., appeals from an order of the circuit court granting summmary judgment to the Respondents, Greenville Hospital System and others, on his claim for civil conspiracy. The case arises out of Anvar's claim that he was wrongfully suspended and placed on probation after Respondents found he improperly used a medical device that was not approved for use on patients outside of an approved clinical trial.
|
|
2:45 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14565 The State, Appellant, v. Arthur Franklin Smith, Respondent. Attorney General Henry Dargan McMaster, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Salley W. Elliott, Senior Assistant Attorney General Norman Mark Rapoport, of Office of the Attorney General, of Columbia, and Solicitor I. McDuffie Stone, III, of Beaufort, for Appellant. Acting Chief Attorney Joseph L. Savitz, III, of South Carolina Commission on Indigent Defense, of Columbia, for Respondent. The State appeals from the grant of a new trial to Arthur Franklin Smith, whom the jury convicted of first-degree criminal sexual conduct. The State contends the trial court abused its discretion by granting Smith a new trial based on the alleged coaching of the victim when Arthur failed to object contemporaneously at the time the alleged coaching occurred.
|
|
3:30 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14622 Christopher Reid Bowyer, Respondent/Appellant, v. Kristi C. Bowyer, Appellant/Respondent. Richard H. Rhodes and M. Noel Turner, of Spartanburg, for Appellant-Respondent. William G. Rhoden, of Gaffney, for Respondent-Appellant. David Michael Collins, Jr., of Spartanburg, for Guardian Ad Litem. This is a cross-appeal from a divorce decree. The isssues on appeal concern the grounds for divorce, custody of the parties' children, alimony, attorney fees, and payment of the marital debts.
|
|
Tuesday, December 5, 2006 | |
Courtroom I
(Court convenes at 10:15
a.m.)
|
|
10:15 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14409 Ernest Bartlett Altman, Respondent, v. Vicky Griffith, Appellant. Donald Bruce Clark,of Charleston; J. Mark Taylor, of West Columbia; and Robert Rosen, of Charleston, for Appellant. John Graham Altman, III, of Hanahan, and D. Mark Stokes, of North Charleston, for Respondent. Graham Edward Hawkins, III, of Charleston, Guardian Ad Litem. Vicky Griffith (Mother) appeals the family court's order awarding Ernest Bartlett Altman (Father) custody of their minor child (Child). Mother argues the family court erred in: (1) awarding custody to Father without requiring him to prove a substantial change of circumstances; (2) awarding custody to Father absent a substantial change of circumstances; (3) awarding custody to Father even though Father repeatedly deceived the family court order about his drug use; (4) admitting Dr. Elizabeth Baker Gibbs' testimony on issues other than whether Father physically abused Child; (5) finding Mother and her family made repeated unfounded accusations and charges against Father; (6) punishing Mother for exercising her right to negotiate visitation through her attorney; (7) finding Father had a stronger focus on the daily welfare and care of Child; and (8) determining that awarding Father custody was in the best interest of Child.
|
|
11:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14617 The Vestry and Church Wardens of the Church of the Holy Cross, a South Carolina Corporation, Appellant, v. Orkin Exterminating Company, Inc., Respondent. Thomas S. Tisdale, Jr., and David Jay Parrish, of Charleston, for Appellant. J. Rutledge Young, III, of Charleston; Kenneth R. Young, Jr., of Sumter; and R. Wade Marionneaux, of Atlanta, GA, for Respondent.. This case presents the issue of whether a juror's admitted misconduct was so prejudicial that it deprived the parties of a fair and impartial jury trial.
|
|
11:45 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14597 South Carolina Department of Corrections, Appellant, v. Darrell Williams, Respondent. Lake Eric Summers, of Columbia, for Appellant. Douglas H. Westbrook, of Charleston, for Respondent. The Department of Corrections has a longstanding policy that an inmate's pending grievance is terminated upon his release from prison. The case questions whether constitutional due process considerations trump that policy and require the department to continue processing the grievance.
|
Tuesday, December 5, 2006 | |
Courtroom II
(Court convenes at 10:15
a.m.)
|
|
10:15 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14593 Richard Kimmer, Respondent, v. Murata of America, Inc. and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Appellants. Pope D. Johnson, III, of Columbia, for Appellants. Thomas H. Pope, of Newberry, for Respondent.
|
|
11:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14623 Deborah S. Davis, Respondent, v. James Kelly Davis, Appellant. Michael David Wood and Patricia O'Neill DeTreville, of Charleston, for Appellant. William J. Clifford, of North Charleston, for Respondent.
|
|
11:45 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14620 Alexander's Land Company, L.L.C.; Alexander's Restaurant Company, Inc.; Franz Auer; John Peterson, Jr., and Bruce O. Rossmeyer, Plaintiffs, Of Whom Alexander's Land Company, L.L.C.; Alexander's Restaurant Company, Inc. are the Appellants, v. M&M&K Corporation; IFBIFB Corporation, and Roger Keyes, Defendants, and M&M&K Corporation; IFBIFB Corporation, Respondents. C. Mitchell Brown, of Columbia; Richard A. Farrier, Jr., Walter T. Cox, III, and Andrea K. St. Amand, of Charleston; for Appellants. Stephen E. Carter, of Hilton Head Island, for Respondents.
|
Thursday, December 7, 2006 | |
Horry County Courthouse
(Court convenes at 9:30
a.m.)
| |
9:30 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14421 Mid-South Management Company Incorporated and William C. Buchheit Trust A, as partners of Spartanburg Beach Cove Associates, a general partnership and a joint venturer of Beach Cove Associates Joint Venture, and Beach Cove Associates Joint Venture, Appellants, v. Sherwood Development Corporation, a joint venturer of Beach Cove Associates Joint Venturer; Coastal Financial Corporation, Coastal Federal Savings Bank; Coastal Mortgage Bankers and Realty Co., Inc., John Doe, who represents unidentified shareholders of Sherwood Development Corporation; Michael C. Gerald and James T. Clemmons, Respondents. Michael Warner Battle, of Conway, and Michael B.T. Wilkes and D. Alan Lazenby, of Spartanburg, for Appellant Mid-South Management Company Inc. Robert E. Stepp and Amy Hills, of Columbia, for Respondents.
|
|
10:15 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14445 Inlet Harbour; a South Carolina General Partnership, Respondent v. The South Carolina Department of Parks Recreation and Tourism, Appellant, v. Inlet Harbour Property Owners Association, Inc., Respondent. Mark Andrew Nappier, of Myrtle Beach, and James B. Richardson, Jr., of Columbia, for Appellant. Dominic A. Starr, of Myrtle Beach, for Respondent Inlet Harbour.
|
|
11:00 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14394 James Alfred Goff, Appellant, v. Drenetha Dale Goff, Respondent. Irby E. Walker, Jr., of Conway, for Appellant. Joseph F. Singleton, of Conway, for Respondent.
|
|
2:00 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14842 Stella Sue Roland, Steven Roland, Charles Wright, Patricia Wright, Sea Turtles, LLC, Woods Brown, Jeanne Brown, Lois Glander, Jean King, Michael King, Joseph Lucas, Diane Lucas, Robert Boineau and Avian Golf Investments, LLC, and Lawrence Ridgeway, Respondents, v. Heritage Litchfield, Inc., Heritage Communities, Inc., and Build Star Corporation, Appellants, and Build Star Corporation, Third Party Plaintiff, v. Right Way Construction, Inc., Donovan Brothers Roofing and Restoration, Inc., and Sam's Drywall, Third Party Defendants. Eric G. Fosmire and Andrew N. Cole, of Collins & Lacy, of Columbia, for Appellants. Saul Gliserman, of Charleston, for Respondent Lawrence Ridgeway. William D. Britt, of Columbia, for Respondents Stella Roland, Steven Roland, et al.
|
|
2:45 p.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14614 St. Luke United Methodist Church by its Trustees, Mary Robinson, Sonia Dickey, Ivory Eaddy, Ronald Johnson, Lenora R. McAllister, Johnny McDowell, Julia McDowell, Syntheair Mack Hill, Beverly E. Smith, Appellants, v. Lynn Coker Browder, Mark B. Browder, Robert R. McGee and Patricia P. Coker, Respondents. D. Malloy McEachin, Jr., of Florence, for Appellant. Charles Craig Young, of Florence, for Respondents.
|
|
Friday, December 8, 2006 | |
Horry County Courthouse
(Court convenes at 9:30
a.m.)
| |
9:30 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14551 Sundown Operating Company, Inc., a South Carolina corporation; Sunrise Coin Company, Inc., a South Carolina corporation; and High Noon Properties, Inc., a South Carolina corporation; Respondents/Appellants, v. Intedge Industries, Inc., a New Jersey corporation; Quickie Food Stores of North Myrtle Beach, Inc., d/b/a Hardwick's Bar & Restaurant Supplies, a South Carolina corporation; BFPE International, Inc., f/k/a Atlantic Fire Systems, Inc., a Maryland corporation; Wormald Fire Systems, Inc., f/k/a Ansul Fire Systems, Inc., a Delaware corporation; and Ansul Incorporated, a Delaware corporation, Defendants, of whom BFPE International, Inc., f/k/a Atlantic Fire Systems, Inc., a Maryland corporation is Appellant/Respondent. Charles E. Carpenter, Jr. and Carmen V. Ganjehsani, of Columbia, and Michael S. Hopewell, of Florence, for Appellant-Respondent. Susan Corner Rosen, of Charleston; Daniel Francis Blanchard, III, of Charleston; and Peter Fredrick Asmer, Jr., of Charlotte, NC, for Respondents-Appellants.
|
|
10:15 a.m. | (Time Limits: 10 - 10 - 5 ) |
14571 The Sovereign Group, Inc., Appellant, v. Surfmaster Owners Association, Inc., Respondent. Stephen G. Morrison and Paul T. Collins, of Columbia, for Appellant. Arthur E. Justice, Jr., J. Jakob Kennedy, of Florence, and R. Hawthorne Barrett, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
Cases to be Submitted Without Oral Argument | |
14570 |
Donald J. Strable, Appellant, v. Estate of Kenneth Strable, Respondent.
|
14585 |
The State, Respondent, v. Eddie Pauling, Appellant.
|
14586 |
The State, Respondent, v. Roy Vance McElveen, Appellant.
|
14587 |
The State, Respondent, v. Curtis Jerome Mitchell, Appellant.
|
14588 |
The State, Respondent, v. Travis Whitmire, Appellant.
|
14594 |
K & K, a Limited Partnership, Respondent, v. E & C Williams Mechanical & Welding, Incorporated, Appellant.
|
14598 |
The State, Respondent, v. Antwan L. Donaldson, Appellant.
|
14600 |
Randall D. Collins and Ann Shalley Collins, Appellants, v. Barbara Griffin, individually and as Trustee of the Griffin Living Trust, Joe Ann Knox as Trustee of the Knox Living Trust and Oconee County, Defendants, Of Whom Barbara Griffin, individually and as Trustee of the Griffin Living Trust and Oconee County are the Respondents.
|
14601 |
Henry M. Cole, Appellant, v. Dennis A. Fried, M.D., and East Cooper Regional Medical Center, Respondents.
|
14602 |
Jean E. Cooksey, Appellant, v. Wachovia Bank, N.A., Respondent.
|
14603 |
Dutch Fork Development Group II LLC, & Dutch Fork Realty, LLC, Appellants, v. Sel Properties, LLC & Stephen E. Lipscomb, Respondents.
|
14613 |
Daisy Wallace Simpson, Respondent/Appellant, v. William Robert Simpson, individually and as shareholder/member of Simpson Farms, L.L.C. and William R. Simpson, Jr., as a shareholder/member of Simpson Farms, L.L.C., Appellants/Respondents.
|
14615 |
Traci Denise Scott, Appellant, v. South Carolina Department of Motor Vehicles, Respondent.
|
14618 |
James Byrd, Respondent, v. Delores Brown Byrd, Appellant.
|
14625 |
Julie W. Hewett, Respondent, v. Donnie Hewett, Appellant.
|
14626 |
Delores Holmes, Respondent, v. Samuel Holmes, Appellant.
|
14628 |
The State, Respondent, v. Charles LeRoy Dean, Appellant.
|
14629 |
The State, Respondent, v. James Michael Houston, Appellant.
|
14630 |
The State, Respondent, v. Walter Jenkins, Appellant.
|
14632 |
The State, Respondent, v. Willie Singletary, Appellant.
|
14633 |
In the Interest of Edward Franklin V., a Juvenile under the age of Seventeen, Appellant.
|
14635 |
The State, Respondent, v. Terry Mays, Appellant.
|
14668 |
South Carolina Department of Social Services, Respondent, v. Monique Maurrasse and Ricky Nichols, In RE:Latasha Nichols DOB 07/04/91; Catrina Maurrasse DOB 10/04/92; Rickey Nichols, Jr., DOB 10/17/95; A-Nyija Nichols DOB 02/09/97, Defendants, of whom Monique Maurrasse and Ricky Nichols are Appellants.
|
14694 |
Mary F. Graves, Respondent, v. William M. Graves, as Personal Representative, Appellant. In the Matter of: Estate of Lawrence B. Graves.
|
14414 |
MultiState Diversified Holdings, LLC and Aqua Investors, LLC, Appellants, v. Sand Hills Development & Construction, Inc. and Miracle Wells, LLC, Respondents.
|
14432 |
South Carolina Department of Social Services, Respondent, v. Charmaine Holley and John Doe, whose true name is unknown, Defendants, of whom Charmaine Holley is Appellant. In the interests of:Charnell N. Tynes (dob: 02/27/05)Minor(s) under the age of 18.
|
14498 |
Cathryn G. Gaither, Respondent, v. William C. Gaither, III, Appellant.
|
14526 |
South Carolina Department of Social Services, Respondent, v. Blake Moore,Appellant. In the Interests of: Andrew Moore, DOB: 08/23/93; Jacob Moore, DOB: 07/06/94; Savannah Moore, DOB: 07/11/97,Minors under the age of 18.
|
14544 |
The State, Respondent, v. Timothy E. Finley, Appellant.
|
14553 |
James Randy Todd, Appellant, v. James Ohara Brereton both Individually and as agent for VT, Inc., Respondent.
|
14761 |
South Carolina Department of Social Services, Respondent, v. Emmanuel Owens, Dion Morgan Owens and John Doe, In Re: Vanessa Patrice Owens: DOB: 12/10/1996 and Theresa Elizabeth Owens: DOB: 12/31/1997, Minor Children, Defendants, of whom Emmanuel Owens is Appellant.
|
14762 |
Charleston County Department of Social Services, Respondent, v. Gloria Hayward, Arnold Hayward, and John Doe, representing the unknown biological fathers, Ke'ierra Hayward, Shaquoria Mitchell, Tavveon Hayward, Shavon Hayward, Candace Hayward, and Antonio Mitchell Hayward, Antonio Mitchell,and Ke'ierra Hayward, a child, D/O/B 12/11/92, Shaquoria Mitchell, a child, D/O/B 11/05/93, Tavveon Hayward, a child, D/O/B 02/11/95, Shavon Hayward, a child, D/O/B 02/11/95, Candace Hayward, and Antonio Mitchell Hayward, a child, D/O/B 03/26/96, Antonio Mitchell, D/O/B 07/14/97, Defendants,of whom Arnold Hayward is Appellant.
|
14779 |
South Carolina Department of Social Services, Respondent, v. Georgia Bowie, Willie Reedy, Marcus Brown, and Briasia Reedy, DOB: 03/09/02; Demarco Brown, DOB: 12/22/00; Defendants, of whom Willie Reedy is Appellant.
|
14760 |
South Carolina Department of Social Services, Respondent, v. A. M., Jane Doe, John Doe, and M. B. (DOB: 05/30/02), Defendants, of whom Jane Doe is Appellant.
|
14554 |
Carol C. Shaw, Charles W. Shaw, III, J. Roth Snowden, and Delia S. Snowden, Respondents, v. Christopher M. Coleman, Appellant.
|