2022-09-12-01
The Supreme Court of South Carolina
RE: Rescission of Orders Regarding Certification of Compliance with the Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act in Evictions and Foreclosure Forms
ORDER
Pursuant to Article V, Section 4 of the South Carolina Constitution,
IT IS ORDERED that the
- May 6, 2020 Order titled RE: Certification of Compliance with the Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act in Evictions and Foreclosure Forms,
- May 12, 2020 Order titled RE: Certification of Compliance with the Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act in Foreclosures (SCCA Form 256A), and
- July 23, 2020 Order titled RE: Certification of Compliance with the Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act in Evictions (SCCA Form 256B)
are hereby rescinded.
s/Donald W. Beatty Donald W. Beatty Chief Justice of South Carolina |
Columbia, South Carolina
September 12, 2022