Supreme Court Seal
Supreme Court Seal
South Carolina
Judicial Branch
Supreme Court Orders - 2020
Order No.  
Topic
Forms/Rules Affected
Newly Appointed or Nominated Magistrate Jury Trial Observations During the COVID-19 Pandemic
Rule 403 Trial Experiences During the COVID-19 Pandemic
Re: Continuing Legal Education Credit for Service as a Poll Worker
Recording of In-Person or Virtual Court Proceedings
Docketing of Cases for General Sessions Terms of Court
In the Matter of Theo Walker Mitchell
RE: Required Use of Protective Masks in County and Municipal Courthouses
Issuance of No-knock Search Warrants by Circuit and Summary Court Judges
COVID-19 Mitigation Measures for the July 2020 South Carolina Bar Examination
Waiver of Distance Learning Limitations for Continuing Legal Education Requirements
Completion of the Essentials Series by Newly Admitted Members
Amended Supplemental Guidance Regarding Lawyer and Judicial Disciplinary Matters During the Coronavirus Emergency
(Amends Order 2020-04-10-02)
Suspension of unexecuted family court issued bench warrants for the non-payment of child support and alimony
Operation of the Appellate Courts During the Coronavirus Emergency
(Amends Order 2020-03-20-01)
Use of Personal Protective Equipment in County Court Facilities
SCDSS v. Benjamin
Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Comply with Continuing Legal Education Requirements
Participation in Closings of Real Estate Transactions
Statewide Evictions and Foreclosures
(Supersedes Order 2020-03-18-01)
Lawyer Mentoring Program and the Coronavirus Pandemic
Amended Order Regarding Trial Court Operations During Coronavirus Emergency
(Amends Order 2020-04-14-01)
Admission of Persons to Practice Law During the Coronavirus Emergency
Operation of the Trial Courts During the Coronavirus Emergency (As Amended April 14, 2020)
(Amended by Order 2020-04-22-01)
(Amends Order 2020-04-03-01)
RE: Amended Supplemental Guidance Regarding Lawyer and Judicial Disciplinary Matters During the Coronavirus Emergency
(Amended by Order 2020-06-15-01)
(Amends Order 2020-03-26-01)
Suspension of arrests of unexecuted family court issued bench warrants for the non-payment of child support and alimony
(Superseded by Order 2020-05-07-02)
Operation of the Trial Courts During the Coronavirus Emergency
(Amended by Order 2020-04-14-01)
(Revokes Order 2020-03-18-04)
Supplemental Guidance Regarding Lawyer and Judicial Disciplinary Matters During the Coronavirus Emergency
(Amended by Order 2020-04-10-02)
Operation of the Appellate Courts During the Coronavirus Emergency
(Amended by Order 2020-05-29-02)
Mediation Settlement Conferences
Statewide Evictions and Foreclosures
(Superseded by Order 2020-04-30-02)
(Supersedes Order 2020-03-17-02)
Statewide Evictions
(Superseded by Order 2020-03-18-01)
Waiver of Distance Learning Limitations
Statewide Family Court Order
(Superseded by Order 2020-03-18-04)
Interest Rate on Money Decrees and Judgments