PREV | June 2002 | NEXT |
The summary below each case is prepared to offer lawyers and the public a general overview of what issues are included in a case which will be argued. The summary is not a limit on what issues a party to a case may present at oral argument.
Tuesday, June 11, 2002 | |
09:30 a.m. | |
3502 James L. Floyd, Jr., as parental guardian of James Leon Floyd, III, Ronald Dendy, as parental guardian of April B. Dendy, K. Wayne Nix, as parental guardian of Kenneth Lance Nix, Michael Wooten, as parental guardian of Erica Page Wooten, Dennis Springs, as parental guardian of Dennis Holmes Springs, Jr., David Williamson, Jr., as parental guardian of David Thomas Williamson, III, Richard Dean Swanson, as parental guardian of John David Swanson, Sherry Hill Ballard, as parental guardian of Jonathan Eric Ballard, Donald Stephen Lathrom, as parental guardian of Andrew Kirk Lathrom,Petitioners v. The Horry County School District,Respondent. J. Jackson Thomas and Emma Ruth Brittain, both of The Thompson Law Firm, of Myrtle Beach, for Petitioners. Kenneth L. Childs, John M. Reagle and Keith R. Powell, all of Childs & Halligan, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
10:00 a.m. | |
3503 The State, Respondent v. Timothy James Hammitt, Petitioner. James M. Griffin, of Simmons & Griffin, of Columbia, for Petitioner. Attorney General Charles M. Condon, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Robert E. Bogan, Chief, State Grand Jury and Tracey Colton Green, Assistant Attorney General, State Grand Jury, all of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
10:00 a.m. | |
3508 The State, Respondent v. Jose Gustavo Castineira, Petitioner. James M. Griffin, of Simmons & Griffin, of Columbia, for Petitioner. Attorney General Charles M. Condon, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Robert E. Bogan, Chief, State Grand Jury and Tracey Colton Green, Assistant Attorney General, State Grand Jury, all of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
10:30 a.m. | |
3513 The State, Respondent v. Johnny Harold Harris, a/k/a Johnny Harold Miller, Petitioner. Jack B. Swerling, of Columbia, for Petitioner. Attorney General Charles M. Condon, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Robert E. Bogan, Chief, State Grand Jury and Tracey Colton Green, Assistant Attorney General, State Grand Jury, all of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
Wednesday, June 12, 2002 | |
09:30 a.m. | |
3504 South Carolina Department of Social Services, Petitioner v. Scott Wilson and Sharon Zimmer, Defendants, of whom Scott Wilson is Respondent. In the interest of: A minor under the age of 18. Richard B. Ness and Michael C. Tanner, both of Early and Ness, of Bamberg; and South Carolina Department of Social Services, of Beaufort, for Petitioner. Kelley M. Braithwaite, of Columbia; and H. Stanley Feldman, of Charleston, for Respondent.
|
|
10:00 a.m. | |
3505 Leatrice Williams Collins, Respondent v. John Doe, Petitioner. Harry C. Wilson, Jr., of Lee, Erter, Wilson, James, Holler & Smith, of Sumter, for Petitioner. Ronnie Alan Sabb, of Kingstree, for Respondent.
|
|
10:30 a.m. | |
3506 The State, Respondent v. Larry Dean Dawkins, Appellant. Deputy Chief Attorney Joseph L. Savitz, III, of South Carolina Office of Appellate Defense, of Columbia, for Appellant. Deputy Director for Legal Services Teresa A. Knox, Legal Counsel Tommy Evans, Jr., and Legal Counsel J. Benjamin Aplin, all of South Carolina Department of Probation, Parole & Pardon Services, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
11:00 a.m. | |
3442 Dan B. Kennedy and Christine Marilyn Kennedy, Petitioners v. George C. Bedenbaugh, Respondent. Kenneth W. Ebener, of Moore, Taylor & Thomas, of West Columbia, for Petitioner. Joseph W. Hudgens, of Pope and Hudgens, of Newberry, for Respondent.
|
|
Thursday, June 13, 2002 | |
09:30 a.m. | |
3507 Gene Tony Cooper, Respondent v. State of South Carolina, Petitioner. Attorney General Charles M. Condon, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Zelenka and Senior Assistant Attorney General William Edgar Salter, III, of Columbia, for Petitioner. David I. Bruck, of Columbia; and Stuart M. Andrews, Jr., of Nelson, Mullins, Riley and Scarborough, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
10:00 a.m. | |
3509 The State, Appellant v. Dante Ricardo Scott, Respondent. Deputy Director for Legal Services Teresa A. Knox, Legal Counsel Tommy Evans, Jr., and Legal Counsel J. Benjamin Aplin, all of South Carolina Department of Probation, Parole & Pardon Services, of Columbia, for Appellant. Assistant Appellate Defender Tara S. Taggart, of South Carolina Office of Appellate Defense, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
10:30 a.m. | |
3510 In Re: Anthony Mabry, Appellant. Attorney General Charles M. Condon, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Zelenka, all of Columbia; and Sam Mitchell Slade, Jr., of Spartanburg, for Appellant. Robert A. Muckenfuss, of McGuire Woods, of Charlotte, North Carolina, for Respondent.
|
|
11:00 a.m. | |
3511 In the Matter of Terry A. Trexler, Respondent. Attorney General Charles M. Condon, Assistant Attorneys General James G. Bogle and Nathan Kaminski,all of Columbia, for the Office of Disciplinary Counsel. Richard Anthony Blackmon, of Sumter, for Respondent.
|
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2002 | |
09:30 a.m. | |
3512 The State, Respondent v. Edward Rothschild, Appellant. Thomas R. Goldstein, of Belk, Cobb, Infinger & Goldstein, of Charleston; and H. Louis Sirkin and Jennifer M. Kinsley, both of Sirkin, Pinales, Mizibov & Schwartz, of Cincinnati, Ohio, for Appellant. Attorney General Charles M. Condon, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Charles H. Richardson, Assistant Attorney General Melody J. Brown, all of Columbia; and Solicitor Warren Blair Giese, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
10:00 a.m. | |
3514 Auto Now Acceptance Corporation, Respondent v. Catawba Insurance Company, Petitioner. William P. Davis and Holly L. Palmer, both of Baker, Ravenel & Bender, of Columbia, for Petitioner. Joseph Gregory Studemeyer, of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
11:00 a.m. | |
3516 Dan Anthony Dearybury, Petitioner v. Wanda Kim Greene Dearybury, Respondent. Gloria Y. Leevy, of Leevy Law, of Columbia, for Petitioner. Richard H. Rhodes, of Burts, Turner, Rhodes & Thompson, of Spartanburg; and Michael L. Rudasill, of Spartanburg, for Respondent.
|
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2002 | |
09:30 a.m. | |
3517 The State, Respondent v. Margaret Brewer, Appellant. Richard A. Harpootlian, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Charles M. Condon, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Attorneys General Tracey Colton Green and Jennifer D. Evans, all of Columbia, for Respondent.
|
|
10:00 a.m. | |
3518 The State, Respondent, v. James R. Standard, Jr., Appellant. Katherine Carruth Link, of Columbia; and South Carolina Office of Appellate Defense, of Columbia, for Appellant. Attorney General Charles M. Condon, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Charles H. Richardson, Assistant Attorney General Melody J. Brown, all of Columbia; and Solicitor Druanne D. White, of Anderson, for Respondent
|
|
10:30 a.m. | |
3519 R&G Construction, Inc., Respondent v. Lowcountry Regional Transportation Authority, Petitioner. H. Fred Kuhn, Jr., of Moss & Kuhn, of Beaufort, for Petitioner. William B. Harvey, III, of Harvey & Battey, of Beaufort, for Respondent.
|
|
11:00 a.m. | |
3520 Gaylan and Catherine Williamson, Individually and as Guardians ad Litem for Cody Williamson, a minor, Respondents v. The South Carolina Insurance Reserve Fund and the Spartanburg County Health Services District, Inc., Appellants. Andrew F. Lindemann and William H. Davidson, II, both of Davidson, Morrison & Lindemann, of Columbia; and William U. Gunn and Ginger D. Goforth, both of Holcombe, Bomar, Gunn & Bradford, of Spartanburg, for Appellants. D. Michael Parham and A. Blakely Smith, both of Parham & Smith, of Greenville, for Respondents.
|
Cases to be Submitted Without Oral Argument | |
Shawn Paul Humphries, Petitioner v. State of South Carolina, Respondent. |
|
Deputy Chief Attorney Joseph L. Savitz, III, of South Carolina Office of Appellate Defense, of Columbia, for Petitioner. Attorney General Charles M. Condon, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh and Assistant Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Zelenka, all of Columbia, for Respondent. |
|
James C. Addison, Respondent v. State of South Carolina, Petitioner. |
|
Attorney General Charles M. Condon, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Zelenka, Assistant Deputy Attorney General B. Allen Bullard, Jr., and Assistant Attorney General Douglas E. Leadbitter, all of Columbia, for Petitioner. Assistant Appellate Defender Aileen P. Clare, of South Carolina Office of Appellate Defense, of Columbia, for Respondent. |
|
Ronald Tate, Petitioner v. State of South Carolina, Respondent |
|
Assistant Appellate Defender Robert M. Dudek, of South Carolina Office of Appellate Defense, of Columbia, for Petitioner. Attorney General Charles M. Condon, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General B. Allen Bullard, Jr., and Assistant Attorney General William Bryan Dukes, all of Columbia, for Respondent. |
|
Bobby Ray Gladden, Petitioner v. State of South Carolina, Respondent. |
|
Chief Attorney Daniel T. Stacey, of South Carolina Office of Appellate Defense, of Columbia, for Petitioner. Attorney General Charles M. Condon, Assistant Deputy Attorney General Donald J. Zelenka and Assistant Attorney General Kenneth P. Woodington, all of Columbia, for Respondent. |
|
Mark Bruce Williams, Petitioner v. State of South Carolina, Respondent. |
|
Senior Assistant Appellate Defender Wanda H. Haile, of South Carolina Office of Appellate Defense, of Columbia, for Petitioner. Attorney General Charles M. Condon, Chief Deputy Attorney General John W. McIntosh, Assistant Deputy Attorney General B. Allen Bullard, Jr., and Assistant Attorney General William Bryan Dukes, all of Columbia, for Respondent. |