The Supreme Court of South Carolina
Re: Digital Courtroom Recorder Project Pilot Program
ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER
Pursuant to the provisions of S.C. Const. art. V, §4,
IT IS ORDERED that a Pilot Program is established for the digital recording of court proceedings beginning on January 9, 2018. The Pilot Program, which began in Anderson County family court on January 9, 2018, Richland County circuit court on January 17, 2018, Sumter County circuit court on January 18, 2018, Greenville County family court on January 22, 2018, and Dorchester County family court on February 9, 2018, shall be expanded to family court in Darlington County, Pickens County, Spartanburg County and Richland County during the week of September 24, 2018. The transcribed paper copy remains the official record pursuant to Rule 607, SCACR. Attorneys should refer to the attached memorandum describing the process for ordering transcripts of proceedings recorded during this Pilot Program.
The Pilot Program will be expanded to other counties pursuant to future Orders of the Chief Justice.
s/Donald W. Beatty Donald W. Beatty Chief Justice of South Carolina |
Columbia, South Carolina
September 21, 2018
MEMORANDUM
TO: |
Circuit Court Judges Family Court Judges Clerks of Court Members of the Bar |
FROM: |
Chief Justice Donald W. Beatty |
RE: | Digital Courtroom Recorder Project Pilot Program Transcript Procedures |
DATE: | September 21, 2018 |
During the pendency of the Digital Courtroom Recorder Project Pilot Program, select courtrooms will begin digitally recording certain proceedings. Courtrooms employing digital recording technology will be clearly marked.
Requests for transcripts of proceedings recorded by digital technology must be submitted in writing to Desiree Allen, Program Manager, S.C. Court Administration, 1220 Senate Street, Suite 200, Columbia, SC 29201 or by email to transcripts@sccourts.org. A transcript may be ordered by utilizing the SCCA Form 800 – Transcript Request Form, which can be found on www.sccourts.org or by providing the date of the proceeding, the name of the judge, the county where the proceeding was heard, the name of the case, and the case number.
Regardless whether a proceeding is recorded by court reporter or digital technology, the official record remains the transcribed paper copy of the proceeding. To request a transcript of a proceedings recorded by a traditional court reporter, please refer to Rules 207 and 607, SCACR.