South Carolina Advance Sheet
(12/28/2022)
No Advance Sheet will be posted this week.
South Carolina Advance Sheet
(12/21/2022)
No Advance Sheet will be posted this week.
State of Georgia v. Mark Randall Meadows
(11/29/2022)
The Court has issued an unpublished opinion in State of Georgia v. Mark Randall Meadows.
Rules 413 and 502, SCACR, are amended to clarify the intent of a prior change involving service of a subpoena on a non-party in lawyer and judicial disciplinary matters.
This order requires that appeals in domestic relations actions involving child custody and visitation be expedited. A previous order required that appeals involving child custody in termination of parental rights proceedings, adoption proceedings, and any Department of Social Services actions involving the custody of a minor child be expedited.
South Carolina Advance Sheet
(11/16/2022)
No Advance Sheet will be posted this week.
The Supreme Court has created a pilot program to permit lawyers to designate secure leave periods during which they may be excused from being called for trials and hearings in the courts of this state. Unlike orders of protection, secure leave does not require court approval and applies to all courts in the Unified Judicial System. Lawyers may designate secure leave in the Attorney Information System (AIS), and a technical guide for lawyers is available in AIS. The pilot applies to the 2023 and 2024 calendar years and will be evaluated to determine whether it will be modified, extended, or rescinded.
Inclement Weather – Tropical Storm Nicole
(11/10/2022)
Inclement Weather – Tropical Storm Nicole
Supreme Court to Hear Oral Arguments in Orangeburg
(11/03/2022)
The South Carolina Supreme Court will hear oral arguments at South Carolina State University in Orangeburg on Tuesday, Nov. 15 and Wednesday, Nov. 16.
The Supreme Court has amended two rules within the Resolution of Fee Disputes Board Rules, which are found in Rule 416 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules, to add a provision stating members of the Board are immune from suit and to delete a provision allowing for the appointment of a Board member as counsel for a party in a fee dispute.
Posted Results of the July Bar Examination
(10/21/2022)
The results of the July 2022 Uniform Bar Examination were posted on the Bar Admissions Page at 4:00 p.m. on Friday, October 21, 2022.
Results of the July 2022 Uniform Bar Examination
(10/19/2022)
The results of the July 2022 Uniform Bar Examination will be posted on the Bar Admissions page at 4:00 p.m. on Friday, October 21, 2022.
South Carolina Advance Sheet
(10/18/2022)
No Advance Sheet will be posted this week.
Chief Justice Donald W. Beatty has authorized the Judicial Branch to establish the S.C. Courts Mental Health Initiative, a collaborative, statewide endeavor to improve the administration of justice for people affected by mental health issues.
The Supreme Court has issued an order regarding Hurricane Ian and the computation of time pursuant to Rule 611, SCACR.
Supreme Court to Hear Oral Arguments in Rock Hill
(10/06/2022)
The South Carolina Supreme Court will hear oral arguments at Winthrop University Coliseum on Tuesday, Oct. 25 and Wednesday, Oct. 26, starting at 10 a.m. each day.
Oral Arguments at the Court of Appeals
(10/03/2022)
Oral Arguments at the Court of Appeals
Limited Technical Failure of the E-Filing System
(10/03/2022)
Due to a payment processing outage, the South Carolina Judicial Branch has announced a Limited Technical Failure of the E-Filing System for September 29 through October 3, 2022, in accordance with Section 9(b) of the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines. This Technical Failure only affects E-Filings that require payment. E-Filers may utilize the provisions of Section 9(d) or (e) of the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines to submit filings or serve documents through available alternative procedures with respect to any document that was required to be filed or served September 29 through October 3, 2022.
COLUMBIA, S.C. (September 29, 2022) – Based on the planned closure of Richland County government offices, South Carolina Judicial Branch offices in the Brown, Calhoun, and Supreme Court buildings will be closed on Friday, September 30, 2022. Judicial Branch employees in these buildings are excused from work due to this inclement weather closure. State judicial officers and Judicial Branch employees should follow the decisions made by their respective county government officials regarding office delays or closings.
Amendments to South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
(09/28/2022)
The Supreme Court has amended the Rules for Lawyer Disciplinary Enforcement, which are found in Rule 413, SCACR; the Rules for Judicial Disciplinary Enforcement, which are found in Rule 502, SCACR; and the Rules of Professional Conduct, which are found in Rule 407, SCACR.
Inclement Weather Memorandum: Hurricane Ian
(09/28/2022)
Inclement Weather Memorandum: Hurricane Ian
CLE Credit for Volunteer Poll Workers
(09/27/2022)
The Supreme Court has issued an Order permitting lawyers to receive six hours of CLE credit if they volunteer to serve as poll workers for the November 8, 2022 election. A form has also been approved for lawyers to use to request credit from the CLE Commission.
Amendments to South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
(09/21/2022)
The Supreme Court has amended Rule 402(l) of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules to increase the number of members on the Committee on Character and Fitness.
Justices and Attorneys Commemorate Completion of Supreme Court Beautification Project
Chief Justice Donald W. Beatty encourages all South Carolina attorneys to participate in the Statewide Legal Needs Assessment, an online survey about the need for, and access to, civil legal representation in South Carolina.
South Carolina Judicial Branch Begins Live Testing of Technology Enhanced Courtroom (TEC) Project Courtrooms
(08/22/2022)
The South Carolina Judicial Branch has begun live testing of Technology Enhanced Courtroom (TEC) Project courtrooms during Circuit and Family Court proceedings in Greenville County.
The Supreme Court has issued an order in G. Murrell Smith Jr., in his official capacity as Speaker of the South Carolina House of Representatives, et al. v. Planned Parenthood South Atlantic and Greenville Women's Clinic.
South Carolina Advance Sheet
(07/27/2022)
No Advance Sheet will be posted this week.
In this matter, the Court disbars Respondent Richard Alexander Murdaugh.
Statutory provisions for the distribution of revenue generated by the circuit courts, and family courts; fees and related charges of the registers of deeds
Statutory provisions for the distribution of revenue generated by the magistrate courts and municipal courts
Fee Memorandum - County Treasurers
(06/30/2022)
Statutory provisions for the distribution of revenue generated by the circuit courts, family courts, magistrates courts and municipal courts; fees and related charges of the registers of deeds
Chief Judges for Administrative Purposes of the Summary Courts
The July 2022 South Carolina Bar Examination is scheduled to be conducted on July 26 and 27, 2022. The July 2022 Bar Examination will be conducted as a live, in-person examination. The purpose of this Order is to discuss the COVID-19 mitigation measures for the July 2022 Bar Examination, including requirements for applicants both before and during the Examination.
Technical Failure of the E-Filing System
(06/29/2022)
Due to a system-wide network outage, the South Carolina Judicial Branch has announced a Technical Failure of the E-Filing System for June 28, 2022, in accordance with Section 9(b) of the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines.
COLUMBIA, S.C. (June 28, 2022) – Charleston County defendants out on surety bonds or personal recognizance bonds who have not responded to recent notices to appear in court will get a friendly chance to reestablish connection with the court system during Get a Lawyer Week, Tuesday, July 5 – Friday, July 8.
On June 16, 2022, this Court issued an order directing Respondent to personally appear before this Court on Wednesday, June 22, 2022, to present legal argument on the question of whether Respondent should be disbarred from the practice of law in South Carolina based on his admitted professional misconduct.
The Supreme Court of South Carolina has issued an order In the Matter of Richard Alexander Murdaugh, Respondent.
Based on the adoption of Rules 613 and 614 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules, several provisions of the South Carolina Electronic Filing Policies and Guidelines have been amended.
South Carolina Advance Sheet
(05/18/2022)
No Advance Sheet will be posted this week.
Chief Justice Beatty Issues 2021 Judicial Branch Annual Report
Amended Order Regarding the Methods of Electronic Filing and Service Under Rule 262 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules
Pursuant to Rule 613 of the South Carolina Appellate Courts Rules, the Supreme Court has promulgated an order setting forth a uniform method for service by e-mail in the trial courts.
Rule Amendments
(05/02/2022)
Since ninety days have passed since submission without rejection by the General Assembly, the amendments contained in the referenced orders are effective immediately.
Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Comply with Continuing Legal Education Requirements
(04/29/2022)
Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Comply with Continuing Legal Education Requirements
Posted Results of the February Bar Examination
(04/22/2022)
The results of the February 2022 Uniform Bar Examination were posted on the Bar Admissions Page at 4:00 p.m. on Friday, April 22, 2022.
Results of the February 2022 Uniform Bar Examination
(04/20/2022)
The results of the February 2022 Uniform Bar Examination will be posted on the Bar Admissions page at 4:00 p.m. on Friday, April 22, 2022.
This order concerns the service of a special referee in foreclosure cases.
Inclement Weather
(04/05/2022)
Inclement Weather
South Carolina Advance Sheet
(03/23/2022)
No Advance Sheet will be posted this week.
This order directs the trial courts to increase the number of in-person proceedings and jury trials.
The Supreme Court has issued an administrative order suspending lawyers under Rule 419 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules for failing to pay their license fees.
Effective March 1, 2022, the order mandating the use of masks or other facial coverings in county and municipal courthouses, as well as two other orders concerning in-person proceedings in the various trial courts, are rescinded. Notwithstanding the rescission of these orders, anyone at risk or concerned about the dangers of COVID-19 may continue to wear a mask inside any courthouse, and court personnel and judges should continue to employ reasonable mitigation measures to guard against the dangers of COVID-19.
This Order Addresses Lawyer-Legislator Protection During the Legislative Session
South Carolina Advance Sheet
(02/16/2022)
No Advance Sheet will be posted this week.
Supreme Court Announces 2021 Pro Bono Honor Roll Recipients
Amendment to the South Carolina Bar Constitution
(02/04/2022)
The Court has approved an amendment to Article VII, Section 7.2 of the South Carolina Bar Constitution, which was submitted by the South Carolina Bar.
Judicial Elections
(02/03/2022)
Judicial elections were held February 2, 2022. Congratulations to the following judges who were elected by the South Carolina General Assembly
COVID-19 Mitigation Measures for the February 2022 South Carolina Bar Examination
Rule Changes Submitted to the General Assembly
(02/01/2022)
Rule Changes Submitted to the General Assembly
Statement from Chief Justice Donald W. Beatty on Assignment of Judges to Murdaugh Cases
(01/28/2022)
Contrary to innuendos and misinformation contained in recent news coverage, Judge Clifton Newman was never removed from, or “reassigned” to, the Murdaugh cases. Judge Newman was initially assigned primarily to handle search warrants requested by SLED, and he still has that responsibility. Subsequent to assigning Judge Verdin to handle the first batch of charges from the State Grand Jury, it became clear that the circumstances of all the charges indicted thus far were intertwined and included some of the same evidence. As a result, I concluded that the most efficient use of personnel and resources would result from assigning the known charges to one judge. Judge Newman's early involvement in the warrant requests put him in the best position to handle the trials. Other judges may be assigned to handle future indictments.
Extension of the Order Regarding the Operation of the Trial Courts During the Coronavirus Emergency
(01/28/2022)
The Supreme Court has issued an order extending the current Order Regarding the Operation of the Trial Courts During the Coronavirus Emergency until May 5, 2022.
Expanded Use of Remote Communication Technology to Conduct Guilty Pleas
Inclement Weather
(01/20/2022)
Inclement Weather
Inclement Weather
(01/13/2022)
Inclement Weather
This order rescinds the order of August 4, 2021 that provided protection for lawyer-legislators participating in public hearings and meetings related to redistricting and committee meetings on the American Rescue Plan Act. The order also supersedes a May 19, 2017 order with regard to lawyer-legislator protection during the legislative session generally.
Chief Judges for Administrative Purposes of the Summary Courts
Interest Rate on Money Decrees and Judgments
(01/06/2022)
Order issued regarding legal rate of interest on money decrees and judgments.