Orders Section
A. | ||
Accounting | ||
Financial Accounting Order | 2017-10-26-01 | |
Alcoholic Beverage Control Commission | ||
Summons - Filing | 1978-09-13-01 | |
Summons - Retention Schedule | 1978-09-13-01 | |
Arrest Warrants | ||
Forms | 1978-08-25-01 | |
Multiple Defendants/Multiple Offenses | 1984-02-24-01 | |
B. | ||
Bail Bonds | ||
Acceptance by Judge | 1980-11-14-01 | |
Approval by Employees of the Court | 2009-06-10-01 | |
Monies Remittance to Treasurer | 1979-10-31-01 | |
On Call Roster | 2017-01-03-01 | |
Bank Accounts | ||
Report to Court Administration/Required Use of | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Bench Warrants | ||
Endorsements | 1980-11-14-01 | |
Bond Hearing Procedures | ||
Bond Hearings in Municipalities which Extend into More than One County | 2009-08-25-01 | |
Bonding Procedures | 2007-09-19-01 | |
Cash in Lieu of Recognizance | 2003-12-11-02 | |
Estreatments | 2002-11-14-02 | |
Municipal Judge Territorial Jurisdiction | 2008-01-31-01 | |
C. | ||
Cash Disbursements | ||
Prohibition of | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Cash in Lieu of Recognizance | ||
Deposits | 2003-12-11-02 | |
Cell Phones and Pagers | 2023-03-10-01 | |
Juror Use of Personal Communication Devices | 2009-07-20-01 | |
Checking Accounts | ||
Proper Use/Required Use | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Checklist for Magistrates and Municipal Judges | ||
Required Use/Retention Schedule | 2018-02-23-01 | |
Chief Judges for Administrative Purposes of Summary Courts | ||
Appointment | 2023-12-06-01 | |
Distribution of Cases | 2023-12-06-01 | |
Hold at Least Quarterly Meetings | 2023-12-06-01 | |
Report to Court Administration Information on Old Cases | 2023-12-06-01 | |
Reporting Changes in Judges to Court Administration | 2023-12-06-01 | |
Set Hours Magistrates Are to Be in Office | 2023-12-06-01 | |
Set Terms of Court | 2023-12-06-01 | |
Take Custody of Departing Judges Records | 2023-12-06-01 | |
Civil Cases | ||
Disposition of | ||
Concurrent Jurisdiction | ||
Judges Presiding Over Multiple Municipalities | 2005-06-17-01 | |
Magistrates and Municipal Courts | 1979-10-31-01 | |
Continuance of Summary Court Cases When Arresting Officer on Military Duty | 2007-08-27-01 | |
Continuing Legal Education | ||
Requirements | Rule 510 | |
Annual Mandatory Criminal Domestic Violence Training | 2008-01-31-02 | |
Court | ||
Hours of Operation | 2017-01-03-01 | |
Criminal Cases | ||
Disposition of | 2011-02-14-01 | |
D. | ||
Deposits | ||
Information that Must Be On Deposit Slips/Times When Deposits Must Be Made | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Disposition of Cases | ||
Time Limitations | 2011-02-14-01 | |
2011-02-14-02 | ||
E. | ||
Endorsements | ||
Bench Warrants | 1980-11-14-01 | |
Estreatments | ||
Distribution of Handling Fee | 2002-11-14-02 | |
F. | ||
Fees and Costs | ||
Reports to County Treasurer | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Filing | ||
Alcoholic Beverage Control Commission Summonses | 1978-09-13-01 | |
Uniform Traffic Ticket | 1978-09-13-01 | |
Wildlife and Marine Resources Department Summonses | 1978-09-13-01 | |
Acceptance of Filings | 2021-06-03-01 | |
H. | ||
Hours of Court | ||
Designated by Chief Summary Court Judge | 2017-01-03-01 | |
Hours of Full- and Part-Time Magistrates Statewide | 2021-11-08-01 | |
I. | ||
Interest | ||
Interest Rate on Money Decrees and Judgment | 2017-01-04-01 | |
Interpreters | ||
Appointment for Deaf Persons | 2004-05-20-01 | |
Appointment for Foreign Languages | 2006-08-03-01 | |
Telephonic and Remote Audio Foreign Language Interpreter Services | 2019-12-27-01 | |
J. | ||
Jurisdiction | ||
Bond Hearings in Municipalities which Extend into More than One County | 2009-08-25-01 | |
Magistrates | 1979-10-31-01 | |
Municipal Judges | 1979-10-31-01 | |
Municipal Judge Territorial Jurisdiction | 2008-01-31-01 | |
Jury Trial | ||
Demand by Defendant | 1985-04-17-01 | |
Juror use of Personal Communication Devices | 2009-07-20-01 | |
L. | ||
Lawyer/Legislator Protection | ||
Protection During the Legislative Session | 2022-02-17-01 | |
Legal Education, Continuing | ||
Requirements | Rule 510 | |
M. | ||
Magistrates | ||
Checks and Check Register | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Concurrent Jurisdiction with Municipal Judges | 1994-05-03-01 | |
Continuing Legal Education Requirements | Rule 510 | |
Deposits | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Disposition of Cases, Time Limits | 2011-02-14-02 | |
Judges Presiding Over Multiple Municipalities | 2005-06-17-01 | |
Municipal Judges, Serving as | 1982-06-30-01 | |
Newly Appointed or Nominated MagistrateMagistrate Jury Trial Observations During the COVID-19 Pandemic | 2020-10-22 | |
Receipts, Use of | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Reports to Treasurers | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Traffic Tickets, Sign Off | 2010-09-03-02 | |
Municipal Court Judges | ||
Bail Bonds - Monies -- Remittance to Treasurer | 1978-11-01-01 | |
Concurrent Jurisdiction with Magistrates | 1979-10-31-01 | |
Continuing Legal Education Requirements | Rule 510 | |
Disposition of Cases, Time Limits | 2011-02-14-02 | |
Judges Presiding Over Multiple Municipalities | 2005-06-17-01 | |
Magistrate Serving as | 1982-06-30-01 | |
Summary Monthly Report | 1982-06-25-01 | |
Traffic Tickets, Sign Off | 2010-09-03-02 | |
Municipal Judges | ||
Judges | 2005-06-17-01 | |
N. | ||
Notice to Public | ||
Numbered Receipts | ||
Notice to Public of Requirements/Required Use of | 2007-03-13-01 | |
O. | ||
On Call Roster | ||
On Call Roster | 2007-09-19-01 | |
P. | ||
Pretrial Diversion Programs | ||
Authorization to Establish | 2003-09-12-01 | |
Pretrial Detainees | 2010-10-28-01 | |
Priority Among Courts | ||
Priority Among Courts | SCACR 601 | |
R. | ||
Receipts | ||
Numbered, Required Use of | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Posting of Required Sign | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Recognizance Bonds | ||
(For Detailed Listing See Bail Bonds) | ||
Recordkeeping Procedures | ||
Account Maintenance - Alcoholic Beverage Control Commission Summonses | 1978-09-13-01 | |
Account Maintenance - Checklist for Magistrates and Municipal Judges | 2006-06-01-02 | |
Account Maintenance - Checks and Check Register | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Account Maintenance - Cross-training | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Account Maintenance - Deposits | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Account Maintenance - Numbered Receipts | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Account Maintenance - Receipts, Numbered | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Account Maintenance - Remittance to the Treasurer | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Account Maintenance - Uniform Traffic Tickets | 1978-09-13-01 | |
Account Maintenance - Wildlife and Marine Resources Department | 1978-09-13-01 | |
Retention Schedule/Account Maintenance | ||
Reports to County Treasurer | ||
Fees and Costs in Civil Cases | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Reports to Court Administration | ||
Bank Accounts | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Summary Monthly Reports | 1982-06-25-01 | |
Retention Schedules | ||
ABC Tickets | 1978-09-13-01 | |
Bank Statements | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Cancelled Checks | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Checklist for Magistrates and Municipal Judges | 2006-06-01-02 | |
Receipts | 2007-03-13-01 | |
Traffic Tickets | 1978-09-13-01 | |
Wildlife Tickets | 1978-09-13-01 | |
Rubber Stamps | ||
Signatures, Prohibited | 1989-03-01-01 | |
S. | ||
Search Warrants | ||
Forms | 1978-08-25-01 | |
Service | ||
Service by E-Mail In the Trial Courts | 2022-05-06-04 | |
Signatures | ||
Use of Rubber Stamps Prohibited | 1989-03-01-01 | |
Statewide Case Management System | 2009-09-15-01 | |
Summary Monthly Reports | ||
Filing | 1982-06-25-01 | |
Preparation | 1982-06-25-01 | |
T. | ||
Treasurer | ||
Bail Bond Monies, Remittance to | 1978-11-01-01 | |
U. | ||
Uniform Traffic Ticket | ||
Acceptance by Court | 2002-02-08-01 | |
Filing | 1978-09-13-01 | |
Retention by Court | 1978-09-13-01 | |
Sign Off | 1981-07-15-01 | |
2010-09-03-02 | ||
V. | ||
Videoconferencing | ||
Specified Criminal Proceedings | 2006-10-08-01 | |
Videoconferencing from Magistrate and Municipal Courts to Detention Facilities Statewide | 2008-08-29-01 | |
W. | ||
Warrants | ||
Arrest - Forms, Required Use of | 1978-08-25-01 | |
Arrest – Multiple Defendants/Multiple Offenses | 1984-02-24-01 | |
Bench - Endorsement of | 1980-11-14-01 | |
Search - Forms, Required Use of | 1978-08-25-01 | |
Wildlife and Marine Resources Department | ||
Summons - Filing | 1978-09-13-01 | |
Summons - Retention Schedules | 1978-09-13-01 |