Chief Judges for Administrative Purposes of the Summary Courts”
Memo Regarding the Amended Order Regarding the Operation of the Trial Courts During the Coronavirus Emergency
(12/17/2020)
Memo Regarding the Amended Order Regarding the Operation of the Trial Courts During the Coronavirus Emergency
Amended Order Regarding the Operation of the Trial Courts During the Coronavirus Emergency
(12/16/2020)
Amended Order Regarding the Operation of the Trial Courts During the Coronavirus Emergency
Family Court to Use Virtual Courtrooms Platform
(12/15/2020)
Family Court to Use Virtual Courtrooms Platform
Selection of New Grand Jury Members
(12/09/2020)
I find that, in light of the ongoing increase in COVID-19 cases throughout South Carolina, and the expectation by the medical community and experts that the number of positive cases will continue to increase in the near future, it is appropriate to temporarily suspend the selection of new grand jury members.
Circuit Court Jury Trials
(12/04/2020)
Circuit Court Jury Trials
Summary Court Jury Trials
(12/04/2020)
Summary Court Jury Trials
Nov. 25, 2020 – Supreme Court of South Carolina Chief Justice Donald W. Beatty recently authorized the finalization of adoption hearings for families throughout South Carolina in conjunction with National Adoption Month. To ensure all parties, attorneys and staff involved were able to take appropriate COVID-19 safety precautions, Chief Justice Beatty authorized participating judges to hold hearings either in the courtroom or via remote hearings.
Webex Oral Argument at the South Carolina Court of Appeals
Electronic Filing Pilot Program in Charleston County Probate Court
Magistrate Jury Trial Observations During the COVID-19 Pandemic
Rule 403 Trial Experiences During the COVID-19 Pandemic
Posted Results of the July 2020 Bar Examination
(10/09/2020)
Posted Results of the July 2020 Bar Examination
Results of the July 2020 Uniform Bar Examination
(10/08/2020)
Results of the July 2020 Uniform Bar Examination
Chief Justice Sets Specific Court Terms for DSS Cases
Supreme Court Issues Opinion in Dr. Thomasena Adams, et al. v. Governor Henry McMaster, et al.
(10/07/2020)
Supreme Court Issues Opinion in Dr. Thomasena Adams, et al. v. Governor Henry McMaster, et al.
CLE Credit for Volunteer Poll Workers
(10/01/2020)
The Supreme Court has issued an Order permitting lawyers to receive six hours of CLE credit if they volunteer to serve as poll workers for the November 3, 2020 election. A form has also been approved for lawyers to use to request credit from the CLE Commission.
Recording of In-Person or Virtual Court Proceedings
(09/29/2020)
Recording of In-Person or Virtual Court Proceedings
Summary Court Operations
(09/25/2020)
Summary Court Operations
Court Operations
(09/14/2020)
Court Operations
Webex Oral Argument at the South Carolina Court of Appeals
Waiver of Distance Learning Limitations for Magistrates and Municipal Judges
Inclement Weather
(08/03/2020)
Inclement Weather
The number of COVID-19 infections in South Carolina is rapidly increasing and has reached an alarming positive test rate. In order to protect the health and safety of members of the public and judicial staff, and in order to maintain the operation of the South Carolina Unified Judicial System, I find it now necessary to issue this Order to effectuate a statewide mandate requiring a mask or other facial covering in county and municipal courthouses statewide.
South Carolina Advance Sheet
(07/27/2020)
No South Carolina Advance Sheet will be Posted this Week.
2020-07-23-01Certification of Compliance with the Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act in Evictions (SCCA Form 256B)
Family Court Benchmark
(07/24/2020)
Family Court Benchmark
Mandatory Survey regarding COVID-19
(07/23/2020)
The Supreme Court is requiring all bar applicants who are taking the July 2020 Bar Examination to respond to a survey regarding COVID-19 symptoms and precautionary measures. The Court is using SurveyMonkey to send the survey to each bar applicant. You will receive an email with a link to the survey. Please check your junk or spam email folders if you do not see an email in your inbox. Initial responses to the survey are due by 3:00 p.m. on Friday, July 24, 2020. You will be able to change your answers after this time if your situation changes.
Issuance of No-knock Search Warrants by Circuit and Summary Court Judges
COVID-19 Mitigation Measures for the July 2020 South Carolina Bar Examination
Chief Judges for Administrative Purposes of the Summary Courts
Scheduled Maintenance Notice
(06/23/2020)
The SC Judicial Branch will conduct network maintenance on Saturday, June 27, 2020, beginning at 8:00 AM affecting many of our systems, including AIS, CMS, JMS & E-Filing. It is expected that maintenance will be completed by 11:00 PM Saturday night. Anyone connected to any application or website hosted by SCJB will experience an interruption in service during this maintenance window.
This Order permits all newly admitted members admitted pursuant to Rule 402, SCACR, to complete a required Essentials Series course online for the 2020-2021 annual reporting year.
This Order waives the restrictions on the numbers of CLE credits that may be obtained through online or telephone courses for the 2020-2021 annual reporting year.
Amended Supplemental Guidance Regarding Lawyer and Judicial Disciplinary Matters During the Coronavirus Emergency
(06/15/2020)
Second Amended Order for Supplemental Guidance Regarding Lawyer and Judicial Disciplinary Matters During the Coronavirus Emergency
Suspension of unexecuted family court issued bench warrants for the non-payment of child support and alimony
(06/05/2020)
Suspension of unexecuted family court issued bench warrants for the non-payment of child support and alimony
Court Operations during the Seven-Week Period June 15 – July 31, 2020
July 2020 Bar Examination and the Coronavirus Pandemic
Amended Order Regarding the Operation of the Appellate Courts During the Coronavirus Emergency
(05/29/2020)
Amended Order Regarding the Operation of the Appellate Courts During the Coronavirus Emergency
County Grand Juries
(05/29/2020)
County Grand Juries
Use of Personal Protective Equipment in County Court Facilities
Pursuant to guidelines issued by the Chief Justice and the Supreme Court, the South Carolina Court of Appeals will hold oral arguments via Cisco WebEx for the months of May and June, 2020.
Certification of Compliance with the Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act in Foreclosures
(05/13/2020)
Certification of Compliance with the Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act in Foreclosures
Supreme Court to Conduct Arguments in Bailey v. Election Commission Using Cisco WebEx
Suspension of unexecuted family court issued bench warrants for the non-payment of child support and alimony
(05/08/2020)
Suspension of unexecuted family court issued bench warrants for the non-payment of child support and alimony
Resolution of Certain Summary Court Level Offenses During COVID-19 Outbreak
Certification of Compliance with the Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act in Evictions and Foreclosures Forms
Participation in Closings of Real Estate Transactions
Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Comply with Continuing Legal Education Requirements
(05/01/2020)
Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Comply with Continuing Legal Education Requirements
Pursuant to guidelines issued by the Chief Justice and the Supreme Court, the South Carolina Court of Appeals will hold oral arguments via Cisco WebEx on Tuesday, May 5, 2020. These will be the first full appellate arguments conducted by video means in our court. The roster of cases is available on sccourts.org. Requests to view oral argument may be emailed prior to the commencement of the argument to ctappfilings@sccourts.org.
Statewide Evictions and Foreclosures
(04/30/2020)
Statewide Evictions and Foreclosures
Video/Audio Conferencing Hearings Statewide
(04/30/2020)
Video/Audio Conferencing Hearings Statewide
Rule Amendments
(04/29/2020)
Since ninety days have passed since submission without rejection by the General Assembly, the amendments contained in the referenced orders are effective immediately.
Lawyer Mentoring Program and the Coronavirus Pandemic
Trial Court Video/Audioconferencing Consent Forms
(04/28/2020)
Trial Court Video/Audioconferencing Consent Forms
Court Operations During the Six Week Period, May 4 – June 12, 2020
Order Regarding Waiver of Distance Learning Limitations for Magistrates and Municipal Judges
(04/23/2020)
Order Regarding Waiver of Distance Learning Limitations for Magistrates and Municipal Judges
Amended Order Regarding Trial Court Operations During Coronavirus Emergency
Posted Results of the February 2020 Uniform Bar Examination
Results of the February 2020 Uniform Bar Examination
(04/16/2020)
Results of the February 2020 Uniform Bar Examination
Admission of Persons to Practice Law During the Coronavirus Emergency
This order amends sections (c)(5) and (c)(8) of the order filed on April 3, 2020.
Amended Supplemental Guidance Regarding Lawyer and Judicial Disciplinary Matters During the Coronavirus Emergency
(04/13/2020)
Amended Supplemental Guidance Regarding Lawyer and Judicial Disciplinary Matters During the Coronavirus Emergency
Suspension of arrests of unexecuted family court issued bench warrants for the non-payment of child support and alimony
Alternate Method of Submitting Filings to the Appellate Courts
Judicial Branch Moves to Remote Operations
(04/06/2020)
Effective Monday, April 6, 2020, the Supreme Court, John C. Calhoun and Edgar Brown Buildings, are closed to the public.
Operation of the Trial Courts During the Coronavirus Emergency
Statement on Evictions and Foreclosures from Chief Justice Beatty
S.C. Judicial Branch Coronavirus Web Page
(03/31/2020)
S.C. Judicial Branch Coronavirus Web Page
Supplemental Guidance Regarding Lawyer and Judicial Disciplinary Matters During the Coronavirus Emergency
(03/27/2020)
Supplemental Guidance Regarding Lawyer and Judicial Disciplinary Matters During the Coronavirus Emergency
Appellate Court Operations During Coronavirus Emergency
Mediation Settlement Conferences
(03/19/2020)
Mediation Settlement Conferences
Statewide Evictions and Foreclosures
(03/19/2020)
Statewide Evictions and Foreclosures
Statewide Family Court Order
(03/19/2020)
Statewide Family Court Order
Family Court Schedule and Judicial Travel
(03/19/2020)
Family Court Schedule and Judicial Travel
Circuit Court Schedule and Judicial Travel
(03/19/2020)
Circuit Court Schedule and Judicial Travel
Statewide Evictions
(03/17/2020)
Statewide Evictions
Waiver of Distance Learning Limitations for 2019-2020 Continuing Legal Education Reporting Year
(03/17/2020)
Waiver of Distance Learning Limitations for 2019-2020 Continuing Legal Education Reporting Year
Trial Courts Coronavirus Memo
(03/16/2020)
Trial Courts Coronavirus Memo
Summary Courts Coronavirus Memo
(03/16/2020)
Summary Courts Coronavirus Memo
Statewide Family Court Order
(03/16/2020)
Statewide Family Court Order
Kershaw County Family Court Proceedings
(03/14/2020)
Beginning Monday, March 16, 2020, until further notice, Kershaw Family Court will only hear emergency matters to include DSS Emergency Protective Custody, Juvenile Detentions, Bench Warrants and Emergency Petitions for Orders of Protection from Domestic Abuse.
Access to the Supreme Court Building
(03/13/2020)
Access to the Supreme Court Building
Court of Appeals Oral Argument
(03/13/2020)
In light of the COVID-19 pandemic, the Court of Appeals is implementing a policy that only attorneys, litigants, and necessary staff may attend oral argument. Spectators and visitors will not be permitted during court proceedings.
Richland County Family Court Proceedings
(03/12/2020)
Beginning Friday March 13, 2020, until further notice, Richland Family Court will only hear emergency matters to include DSS Emergency Protective Custody, Juvenile Detentions, Bench Warrants and Emergency Petitions for Orders of Protection from Domestic Abuse.
Richland County Administrative Order
(03/12/2020)
Richland County Administrative Order
Statement from Chief Justice Beatty
(03/12/2020)
“It was determined that someone in the Richland County Courthouse has had indirect contact with the Coronavirus. Therefore, out of an abundance of caution, I have ordered court operations at the Richland County Courthouse to be streamlined. I believe this decision to be in the best interest of litigants, attorneys, employees, and the public. The order shall remain in effect until further notice.”
Coronavirus (COVID-19) Preparation
(03/04/2020)
Coronavirus (COVID-19) Preparation
Supreme Court Releases Pro Bono Honor Roll for 2019
(02/27/2020)
Supreme Court Releases Pro Bono Honor Roll for 2019
South Carolina Advance Sheet
(02/26/2020)
No South Carolina Advance Sheet will be Posted this Week.
Richland County Family Court Update, Feb. 25, 2020
(02/25/2020)
Due to flooding, Richland County Family Court is temporarily operating on a limited basis. There is no court scheduled this week. Cases that were scheduled for court during the week of Feb. 24 – 28 are being rescheduled. Court will resume on Monday, March 2. The Family Court Administrative Offices are open, answering the phones, and accepting pleadings and other paperwork. Emergencies will be heard in Richland County Family Court on Wednesday, Feb. 26, Thursday, Feb. 27, and Friday, Feb. 28 at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 3F.
Richland County Family Court Hearings
(02/24/2020)
Due to flooding in a portion of the courthouse building, Richland County Family Court will be unable to hold hearings this week. However, emergency matters will be heard. Richland County Family Court will resume accepting filings tomorrow in the Clerk of Court’s Office. Please contact the Richland County Clerk of Court’s office at (803) 576-3326, (803) 576-3361, or (803) 576-1947 with any questions.
Administrative Suspensions for Failure to Pay License Fees Required by Rule 410 of the South Carolina Appellate Court Rules (SCACR)
Inclement Weather
(02/06/2020)
Inclement Weather
Judicial elections were held February 5, 2020
(02/05/2020)
Judicial elections were held February 5, 2020. Congratulations to the following judges who were elected by the South Carolina General Assembly
Rule Changes Submitted to the General Assembly
(01/30/2020)
Pursuant to Article V, § 4A of the South Carolina Constitution, the following rule changes were submitted to the South Carolina General Assembly on January 30, 2020.
Request for Written Comments
(01/22/2020)
The Supreme Court is accepting written comments concerning proposed amendments to Rule 9 of the South Carolina Court-Annexed Alternative Dispute Resolution Rules.
Interest Rate on Money Decrees and Judgments
(01/06/2020)
Order issued regarding legal rate of interest on money decrees and judgments.